Thomas, et al. v. Amazon.com Services, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Colleen E McLaughlin and Savon Thomas
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc. and Amazon.com Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01696
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Referring Judge: Dan Aaron Polster
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order. Case management conference to be held on 10/23/2019 at 01:30 PM at Chambers 16A. Signed by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 09/04/2019. (Attachments: #1 Report parties planning)(W,RA)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (W,RA)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Amazon.com Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., filed on behalf of Savon Thomas, Colleen E McLaughlin Related document(s) #2 . (W,CM)
August 9, 2019 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case, Judge Dan Aaron Polster terminated. (Y,A)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order of Recusal. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another judge. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 8/9/2019. (K,K)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Savon Thomas, Colleen E McLaughlin. Amazon.com Services, Inc. waiver sent on 8/2/2019, answer due 10/1/2019; Amazon.com, Inc. waiver sent on 8/2/2019, answer due 10/1/2019 filed on behalf of Savon Thomas; Colleen E McLaughlin (Nilges, Hans)
July 30, 2019 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Amazon.com, Inc. placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70190160000057922827. (W,Jo)
July 30, 2019 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Amazon.com Services, Inc. placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70190160000057922834. (W,Jo)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Amazon.com Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Consent Form) (Y,A)
July 25, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (Y,A)
July 25, 2019 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case, (Y,A)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 Class Action Complaint against Amazon.com Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc. Filing fee paid $400. Receipt number 0647-9435700. Filed by Savon Thomas, Colleen E McLaughlin. (Attachments: #1 Summons Amazon.com, Inc., #2 Summons Amazon.com Services, Inc., #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Nilges, Hans)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas, et al. v. Amazon.com Services, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen E McLaughlin
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Savon Thomas
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?