Bojarski v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Keith Bojarski
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv01713
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Referring Judge: Jonathan D Greenberg
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by Personal service executed upon US Attorney on 8/16/2019, by FedEx upon the US Attorney General on 8/19/2019, upon the Commissioner of Social Security by FedEx on 8/20/2019 filed on behalf of Keith Bojarski Related document(s) #6 . (Lebron, Michael)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 Original Summons and USM-285 issued to U. S. Marshal on 8/12/2019 for service upon Attorney General, U.S. Attorney, and Commissioner of Social Security. (S,S)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (S,S)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 8/12/2019. (S,S)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting plaintiff's Motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Related Doc #2 ). Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 8/12/2019. (S,S)
July 29, 2019 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge John R. Adams on 7/29/2019. (B,R)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (B,R)
July 29, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (B,R)
July 29, 2019 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case, (B,R)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Keith Bojarski. (Goodwin, Paula)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Keith Bojarski. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 USM-285, #6 USM-285, #7 USM-285) (Goodwin, Paula)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bojarski v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Ruchi Vikram Asher
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Bojarski
Represented By: Paula Goodwin
Represented By: Louise H. Mosher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?