Whitehead v. Nelnet, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Aja Whitehead
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Nelnet, Inc. and Nelnet Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01721
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Nelnet Diversified Solutions, LLC for Nelnet Servicing, LLC. filed by Nelnet Servicing, LLC. (VanSlyke, David)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order. Case management conference to be held on 10/22/2019 at 02:30 PM at Chambers 16A. Signed by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 09/03/2019. (Attachments: #1 Report parties planning)(W,RA)
September 3, 2019 Filing 12 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (W,RA)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #10 Defendant Equifax Information LLC's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Equifax Information Services, LLC. Answer due 10/3/2019. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 9/3/2019.(L,Ja)
August 30, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services LLC, filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Wallace, David)
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 Motion for extension of time to answer until October 3, 2019 filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Wallace, David)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #9 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Nelnet, Inc.'s answer due 10/3/2019. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 8/30/2019.(L,Ja)
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 Motion for extension of time until 10/03/2019 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Nelnet, Inc.. (Related document(s) #1 ). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (VanSlyke, David)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service by Process Server executed upon Nelnet, Inc. on 8/13/2019, filed on behalf of Aja Whitehead (Volheim, Nathan)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service by Process Server executed upon Equifax Information Services, LLC on 8/13/2019, filed on behalf of Aja Whitehead (Volheim, Nathan)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Equifax Information Services, LLC and Nelnet, Inc. (S,KM)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Aja Whitehead. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Volheim, Nathan)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Equifax Information Services, LLC and Nelnet, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (Y,A)
July 30, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (Y,A)
July 30, 2019 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case, (Y,A)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 Attorney Appearance by Taxiarchis Hatzidimitriadis filed by on behalf of Aja Whitehead. (Hatzidimitriadis, Taxiarchis)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 Attorney Appearance by Nathan C. Volheim filed by on behalf of Aja Whitehead. (Volheim, Nathan)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Equifax Information Services, LLC and Nelnet, Inc. Filing fee paid $400. Receipt number 0647-9443401. Filed by Aja Whitehead. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Volheim, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitehead v. Nelnet, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Tyler K. Ibom
Represented By: David A. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelnet, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelnet Servicing, LLC
Represented By: David L. VanSlyke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aja Whitehead
Represented By: Nathan C. Volheim
Represented By: Taxiarchis Hatzidimitriadis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?