Chapman v. Richland County Courthouse
Petitioner: Dwaine J. Chapman, Sr.
Respondent: Richland County Courthouse
Case Number: 1:2019cv01757
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey J Helmick
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254) filed by Dwaine J. Chapman, Sr. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Summons Richland County Courthouse, #2 USM-285 Richland County Courthouse)(W,Jo)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Petitioner Dwaine J. Chapman, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Prisoner, #2 Resident Account Summary)(W,Jo)
August 6, 2019 Copy of #3 Order mailed to Dwaine J. Chapman, Sr. at 73 East 2nd Street, Mansfield, Ohio 44902. (S,HR)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order requiring Petitioner to either pay the full fee of $5.00, or to complete and submit the accompanying Financial Application and Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis within 30 days of the date of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of this action without further notice. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 8/6/19. (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #2 Financial Application)(S,HR)
August 2, 2019 Remark by Clerk: This case was assigned and processed without the filing of a Civil Cover Sheet, which is required by Local Rule 3.13(a). Copy of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254), #2 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order, and a blank civil cover sheet mailed to Dwaine J. Chapman Sr #35059 at 73 East 2nd Street, Mansfield, OH 44902 on 8/2/19. Related document(s) #1 , #2 . (Y,A)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (Y,A)
August 2, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (Y,A)
August 2, 2019 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case, (Y,A)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 Petition under 28 USC 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a person in state custody. Filing fee not paid. Filed by Dwaine J. Chapman, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Resident Account Summary, #2 Memorandum In Support, #3 Letter from Son) (Y,A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chapman v. Richland County Courthouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Richland County Courthouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dwaine J. Chapman, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?