Primrose Retirement Communities, L.L.C., et al. v. Omni Construction Company, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Primrose Retirement Communities, L.L.C. and Jefferson City Retirement, L.L.C.
Defendant: Richard L. Stone, Suzanna L. Stone, Omni Construction Company, Inc. and Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland
Case Number: 1:2019cv01771
Filed: August 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Christopher A Boyko
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order referring case to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker for mediation to be conducted at a date scheduled by the Magistrate Judge and convenient with all parties, no later than December 16, 2019. The Parties shall file a joint status report one-week following the conclusion of the Mediation proceeding. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 10/28/2019. (D, I)
October 23, 2019 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Christopher A. Boyko. Case Management Conference held on 10/23/2019. Case is assigned to the standard track. Representatives for all parties in attendance. Case is assigned to the standard track. No dates set at this time. Rather, the Court will refer this matter for Mediation with Magistrate Judge Parker by separate Order. (Court Reporter: None.) Time: 15 minutes. (D, I)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] withdrawing Defendants' Motion for judgment on the pleadings (Related Doc #16 ); and granting Defendants' Motion for leave to have parties attend the case management conference by phone (Related Doc #20 ). Parties shall be available by phone. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 10/18/2019.(D, I)
October 14, 2019 Filing 21 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings with State of Ohio Certificate filed by Omni Construction Company, Inc., Richard L. Stone, Suzanna L. Stone. (Related document(s) #16 ) (Wargo, Leslie). Modified on 10/24/2019 to add description of exhibit filed as part of main document (H,SP).
October 14, 2019 Filing 20 Motion to Attend Case Management Conference by Telephone, with memorandum in support filed by Omni Construction Company, Inc., Richard L. Stone, Suzanna L. Stone. (Wargo, Leslie)
October 11, 2019 Filing 19 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Primrose Retirement Communities, L.L.C.. (Kirby, Tami)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Jefferson City Retirement and Primrose Retirement Communities' Motion to Allow Mark W. McNeary, General Counsel and Representative for Plaintiffs, to Attend Case Management Conference by Telephone (Related Doc #18 ). Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 10/10/19.(S,HR)
October 4, 2019 Filing 18 Motion for Mark W. McNeary, General Counsel to Attend Case Management Conference by Telephone, with memorandum in support filed by Jefferson City Retirement, L.L.C., Primrose Retirement Communities, L.L.C.. (Kirby, Tami)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's Motion to have party representative available by telephone for the Case Management Conference set for 10/23/2019 at 2:00 PM (Related Doc #13 ). Counsel for defendant must be present in person. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 10/3/2019.(D, I)
October 2, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc., Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Company Ltd., Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Group, Ltd., Corporate Parent Zurich American Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Zurich American Insurance Group for Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland filed by Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland. (Bryan, Jonathan)
October 2, 2019 Filing 16 WITHDRAWN per order dated 10/18/2019. Motion for judgment on the pleadings with memorandum in support filed by Omni Construction Company, Inc., Richard L. Stone, Suzanna L. Stone. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ohio Secretary of State Business Search Results) (Wargo, Leslie)
October 2, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Omni Construction Company, Inc.. (Wargo, Leslie)
September 30, 2019 Filing 14 Answer to #1 Complaint, filed by Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland. (Brewer, Lee)
September 30, 2019 Filing 13 Motion to attend Case Management Conference by telephone filed by Defendant Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland. (Bryan, Jonathan)
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Omni Construction Company, Inc., Richard L. Stone, Suzanna L. Stone. (Wargo, Leslie)
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 Attorney Appearance by Mark W. McNeary filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (McNeary, Mark)
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 Attorney Appearance by Ronald J. Hall filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Hall, Ronald)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland's Motion for leave until 9/30/2019 to move or plead (Related Doc #8 ); and granting Defendants Richard L. Stone, Suzanna L. Stone and Omni Construction Company, Inc.'s Motion for leave until 9/30/2019 to move, plead or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Related Doc #9 ). Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 8/29/2019.(D, I)
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed Motion for leave to Move, Plead or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint, with memorandum in support filed by Omni Construction Company, Inc., Richard L. Stone, Suzanna L. Stone. (Wargo, Leslie)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 Motion for leave to Move or Plead with memorandum in support filed by Defendant Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland. (Bryan, Jonathan)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motions for appearance pro hac vice by attorneys Mark W. McNeary and Ronald J. Hall for Jefferson City Retirement, L.L.C. and Primrose Retirement Communities, L.L.C.. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 8/26/2019.(D, I)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 Motion for attorney Mark W. McNeary to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9481116, filed by Plaintiff Primrose Retirement Communities, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Mark W. McNeary )(Kirby, Tami)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 Motion for attorney Ronald J. Hall to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9479446, filed by Plaintiff Primrose Retirement Communities, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Ronald J. Hall )(Kirby, Tami)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Case Management Conference with case management conference to be held on 10/23/2019 at 2:00 PM in Chambers 15B. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 8/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Report of the Parties' Planning Meeting, #2 Consent Package)(D, I)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland, Omni Construction Company, Inc., Richard L. Stone, Suzanna L. Stone. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Magistrate Consent Form) (Y,A)
August 5, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (Y,A)
August 5, 2019 Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case, (Y,A)
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Primrose Retirement Communities, L.L.C.. (Kirby, Tami)
August 5, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Jefferson City Retirement, L.L.C.. (Kirby, Tami)
August 5, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $400. Receipt number 0647-9454257. Filed by Primrose Retirement Communities, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Payment Bond, #2 Exhibit B - General Indemnity Agreement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland, #5 Summons Suzanna L. Stone, #6 Summons Richard L. Stone, #7 Summons OMNI Construction Company, Inc.) (Kirby, Tami)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Primrose Retirement Communities, L.L.C., et al. v. Omni Construction Company, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard L. Stone
Represented By: Leslie E. Wargo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanna L. Stone
Represented By: Leslie E. Wargo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omni Construction Company, Inc.
Represented By: Leslie E. Wargo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland
Represented By: Jonathan M. Bryan
Represented By: Lee M. Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Primrose Retirement Communities, L.L.C.
Represented By: Tami Hart Kirby
Represented By: Rebecca Kucera Fischer
Represented By: Mark W. McNeary
Represented By: Ronald J. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jefferson City Retirement, L.L.C.
Represented By: Tami Hart Kirby
Represented By: Rebecca Kucera Fischer
Represented By: Mark W. McNeary
Represented By: Ronald J. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?