Noco Company v. McDonough
Plaintiff: Noco Company
Defendant: Frank McDonough
Case Number: 1:2019cv01790
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Christopher A Boyko
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Frank McDonough on 8/17/2019, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website. Filed on behalf of Noco Company. Related document(s) #3 . (W,Jo)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order approving #5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Each party to bear its own attorney's fees and court costs. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 8/20/2019. (D, I)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Noco Company. (Malone, Sean)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Case Management Conference with case management conference to be held on 10/24/2019 at 3:00 PM in Chambers 15B. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 8/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Report of the Parties' Planning Meeting, #2 Consent Package)(D, I)
August 9, 2019 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Frank McDonough placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70183090000032267886. (B,R)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Frank McDonough. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (S,SR)
August 7, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (S,SR)
August 7, 2019 Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case, (S,SR)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Noco Company. (Pinney, Jon)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Frank McDonough. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9458065.. Filed by Noco Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reseller Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Defendant's Sales on eBay, #3 Exhibit C - Cease and Desist Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons) (Pinney, Jon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noco Company v. McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noco Company
Represented By: Sean P. Malone
Represented By: David R. Posteraro
Represented By: Jon J. Pinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?