Rhoades, Zulu v. PNC Bank, NA et al
Plaintiff: Maurice Rhoades, Zulu
Defendant: David Zhou and PNC Bank, NA
Case Number: 1:2019cv01821
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 10 Defendants' Certification Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(f) for Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by All Defendants. (Zulandt, David)
October 9, 2019 Filing 9 Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by All Defendants. (Zulandt, David)
October 1, 2019 Filing 8 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(f) filed by Maurice Rhoades, Zulu. Related document(s) #7 .(S,AN)
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 Motion of Objection and Move to Strike Defendants' Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. Civ. P. 12(B)(1) and 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(B) filed by Plaintiff Maurice Rhoades, Zulu. Related document(s) #5 . (S,AN)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 Certification Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(f) filed by All Defendants. (Zulandt, David)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction with memorandum in support filed by PNC Bank, NA, David Zhou. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Screenshots of Ohio Supreme Court Webpage, Vexatious Litigators Under R.C. 2323.52 at p. 7, #2 Exhibit B - A copy of the state court's Journal Entry and Opinion, #3 Exhibit C - A copy of this Court's April 1, 2019 Memorandum of Opinion and Order, #4 Exhibit D - Affidavit of David Zhou) (Zulandt, David)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 Attorney Appearance by David A. Zulandt , Nita L. Hanson, and the law firm of Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP filed by on behalf of David Zhou. (Zulandt, David)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 Attorney Appearance by David A. Zulandt and Nita Hanson filed by on behalf of PNC Bank, NA. (Zulandt, David)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Maurice Rhoades, Zulu. (B,R)
August 12, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (B,R)
August 12, 2019 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case, (B,R)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint for Negligence and Breach of Written Contract against PNC Bank, NA, David Zhou. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Maurice Rhoades, Zulu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Letter Dated 9/25/2018, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 USM-285) (B,R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rhoades, Zulu v. PNC Bank, NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Zhou
Represented By: Nita L. Hanson
Represented By: David A. Zulandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Bank, NA
Represented By: David A. Zulandt
Represented By: Nita L. Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Rhoades, Zulu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?