Robinson, et al vs Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Plaintiff: Kadian D. Robinson and Ruby D. Slaughter-Robinson
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01834
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 17 Answer to #1 Complaint,, filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Fontanazza, Melany)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Case Management Conference Plan/Order. Case is assigned to the standard track. Parties to be Joined and Pleading Amendments due by 10/31/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 4/30/2020. Status Conference set for 3/20/2020 at 02:00 PM in Chambers 16A. IMPORTANT: The parties are advised to carefully read this Order and to familiarize themselves with the deadlines imposed as not all deadlines are contained in the text of this docket entry. . Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 10/2/2019. (L,Ja)
October 2, 2019 Filing 15 Minutes of proceedings before Judge Pamela A. Barker. Case Management Conference conducted. Separate Case Management Conference Order to issue. (Court Reporter: None.)Time: 15 mins. (L,Ja)
October 1, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Fontanazza, Melany)
September 27, 2019 Filing 12 Preliminary Estimate/Budget of Amount of Fees and Expenses filed by Kadian D. Robinson, Ruby D. Slaughter-Robinson. (Horton, Whitney)
September 17, 2019 Filing 11 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - the parties do not consent to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Fontanazza, Melany) Modified text on 10/7/2019 (S,SR).
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] Granting #10 Stipulation of Leave to Plead. Defendant Nationstar Mortgage, LLC's to answer, plead, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint by October 8, 2019. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 9/5/2019. (L,Ja)
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 Proposed Stipulation of Leave to Plead filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Fontanazza, Melany)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order. Case management conference to be held on 10/2/2019 at 01:30 PM at Chambers 16A before Judge Pamela A. Barker. Signed by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 08/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Report parties planning)(W,RA)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (W,RA)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 Attorney Appearance by James W. Sandy filed by on behalf of Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Sandy, James)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 Attorney Appearance by Melany Kotlarek Fontanazza filed by on behalf of Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Fontanazza, Melany)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Nationstar Mortgage, LLC on 8/20/2019, filed on behalf of Kadian D. Robinson; Ruby D. Slaughter-Robinson Related document(s) #1 . (Horton, Whitney)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (H,SP)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Supplement to Complaint,, - Civil Summons, filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #1 . (Horton, Whitney)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons issued or provided. (D,TM)
August 13, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (D,TM)
August 13, 2019 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case. (D,TM)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Nationstar Mortgage, LLC dba Mr. Cooper. Filing fee paid $400, Receipt number 0647-9466167.. Filed by Kadian D. Robinson, Ruby D. Slaughter- Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Loan, #3 Exhibit Mtg Statement, #4 Exhibit Modification, #5 Exhibit Mtg Statement, #6 Exhibit Mtg Statements, #7 Exhibit RFI, #8 Exhibit RFI Tracking, #9 Exhibit Resp to RFI, #10 Exhibit NOE 1, #11 Exhibit NOE 1 Tracking, #12 Exhibit NOE 2, #13 Exhibit NOE 2 Tracking, #14 Exhibit Resp to NOE 2, #15 Exhibit CFPB Complaints) (Horton, Whitney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson, et al vs Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: James W. Sandy
Represented By: Melany Kotlarek Fontanazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kadian D. Robinson
Represented By: Whitney P. Horton
Represented By: Marc E. Dann
Represented By: Daniel M. Solar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby D. Slaughter-Robinson
Represented By: Whitney P. Horton
Represented By: Marc E. Dann
Represented By: Daniel M. Solar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?