Noco Company v. Kottman
Plaintiff: Noco Company
Defendant: Steve Kottman
Case Number: 1:2019cv01947
Filed: August 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Christopher A Boyko
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Steve Kottman on 8/31/2019, filed on behalf of Noco Company (Related document(s) #3 ) (Y,A)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order granting Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal with prejudice (Related doc #4 ), each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs.. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 9/16/2019. (W,CM)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Noco Company. (Malone, Sean)
August 28, 2019 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Steve Kottman placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70183090000032251663. (B,R)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Steve Kottman. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (Y,A)
August 26, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (Y,A)
August 26, 2019 Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case, (Y,A)
August 25, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Noco Company. (Pinney, Jon)
August 25, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Steve Kottman. Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9487747. Filed by Noco Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reseller Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Defendant's sales on eBay, #3 Exhibit C - Cease and Desist Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons) (Pinney, Jon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noco Company v. Kottman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noco Company
Represented By: Sean P. Malone
Represented By: David R. Posteraro
Represented By: Jon J. Pinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Kottman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?