Pinecrest Apartments, Ltd. v. Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC et al
Plaintiff: Pinecrest Apartments, Ltd.
Defendant: CIBA Insurance Services of California, Inc., Commercial Industrial Building Owners and Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) SE
Case Number: 1:2019cv01953
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] Defendants' #10 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 11-15-19 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint. CIBA Insurance Services of California, Inc. answer due 11/15/2019; Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) SE answer due 11/15/2019. Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 10/11/2019.(K,K)
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 11-15-19 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint filed by CIBA Insurance Services of California, Inc., Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) SE. (Wilson, Holly)
October 1, 2019 Filing 9 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) SE on 9/4/2019, filed on behalf of Pinecrest Apartments, Ltd. Related document(s) #3 . (Truax, Philip)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Munich Reinsurance Company for Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) SE filed by Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) SE. (Wilson, Holly)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Commercial Industrial Building Owners Alliance, Inc. for CIBA Insurance Services of California, Inc. filed by CIBA Insurance Services of California, Inc.. (Wilson, Holly)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order granting #5 Defendant's Motion for extension of time until October 18, 2019 to answer. CIBA Insurance Services of California, Inc. answer due 10/18/2019; Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) SE answer due 10/18/2019. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/20/2019.(W,CM)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 Motion for extension of time until October 18, 2019 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint filed by CIBA Insurance Services of California, Inc., Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) SE. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Wilson, Holly)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon CIBA Insurance Services of California, Inc. on 8/30/2019, filed on behalf of Pinecrest Apartments, Ltd. Related document(s) #3 . (Truax, Philip)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon CIBA Insurance Services of California, Inc., Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) SE, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) SE, et al c/o Thomas M. Dawson. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (B,R)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Pinecrest Apartments, Ltd.. (Truax, Philip)
August 26, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (B,R)
August 26, 2019 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case, (B,R)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand For Declaratory Judgment, Breach of Contract, And Bad Faith against CIBA Insurance Services of California, Inc., Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) SE. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9489426. Filed by Pinecrest Apartments, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Commercial Lines Declarations Page, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3Summons, #4 Supplement Corporate Disclosure Statement(to be refiled) (Truax, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pinecrest Apartments, Ltd. v. Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIBA Insurance Services of California, Inc.
Represented By: Holly M. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commercial Industrial Building Owners
Represented By: Holly M. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) SE
Represented By: Holly M. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pinecrest Apartments, Ltd.
Represented By: Malorie A. Alverson
Represented By: Philip J. Truax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?