International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Transportation Division v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Petitioner: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Transportation Division
Respondent: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv02001
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Christopher A Boyko
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Case Management Conference with case management conference to be held on 12/17/2019 at 3:00 PM in Chambers 15B. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 10/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties Planning Meeting, #2 Consent Package)(S,HR)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Transportation Division. National Railroad Passenger Corporation waiver sent on 9/3/2019, answer due 11/4/2019 filed on behalf of International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Transportation Division (Diehl-Gibbons, Erika)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (Y,A)
August 30, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (Y,A)
August 30, 2019 Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case, (Y,A)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 Petition to Enforce Public Law Board Award under the Railway Labor Act against National Railroad Passenger Corporation (AMTRAK). Filing fee paid $400. Receipt number 0647-9499757. Filed by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Transportation Division. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Lynch Award, #2 Exhibit B - Peeples Award, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons) (Diehl-Gibbons, Erika)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Transportation Division v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Transportation Division
Represented By: Kevin C. Brodar
Represented By: Erika A. Diehl-Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?