International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Transportation Division v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Petitioner: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Transportation Division
Respondent: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv02002
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 First Amended complaint against Union Pacific Railroad Company. Filed by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Transportation Division. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Monjaras Award, #2 Exhibit B - Arroyo Award, #3 Exhibit C - Coles Award) (Diehl-Gibbons, Erika)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Transportation Division. Union Pacific Railroad Company waiver sent on 9/3/2019, answer due 11/4/2019 filed on behalf of International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Transportation Division (Diehl-Gibbons, Erika)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (Y,A)
September 3, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (Y,A)
September 3, 2019 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, (Y,A)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Union Pacific Railroad Company. Filing fee paid $400, Receipt number 0647-9499901. Filed by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Transportation Division. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Monjaras Award, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Arroyo Award, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons) (Diehl-Gibbons, Erika)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Transportation Division v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Transportation Division
Represented By: Erika A. Diehl-Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?