USA v. NGM Insurance Company, et al.
Plaintiff: United States of America for use and benefit of Vector Corrosion Technologies, Inc.
Defendant: CECOS Group, LLC and NGM Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv02007
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Marginal Entry Order granting voluntary case dismissal without prejudice under FRCP 41(a)(1) (A)(i). (Related Doc. #4 ). Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 9/12/2019. (L,Ja)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) (A)(i) filed by United States of America. (Hassel, Christina)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon CECOS Group, LLC, NGM Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Consent Form) (Y,A)
September 3, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (Y,A)
September 3, 2019 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case, (Y,A)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by United States of America for use and benefit of Vector Corrosion Technologies, Inc.. (Hassel, Christina)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against CECOS Group, LLC, NGM Insurance Company. Filing fee paid $400, receipt number 0647-9500146. Filed by United States of America for use and benefit of Vector Corrosion Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - Payment Bond, #2 Ex. 2 - Subcontract Agreement, #3 Ex. 3 - Claim on Payment Bond, #4 Summons to NGM Insurance Company, #5 Summons to Cecos Group, LLC, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hassel, Christina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. NGM Insurance Company, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America for use and benefit of Vector Corrosion Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Christina T. Hassel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CECOS Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NGM Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?