United States of America v. Novelis Inc. et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Aleris Corporation and Novelis, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02033
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Christopher A Boyko
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:25
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 33 Attorney Appearance by Karey E. Werner filed by on behalf of Novelis, Inc.. (Werner, Karey)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Allyson M. Maltas for Novelis, Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #32 ). Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 10/28/2019.(D, I)
October 25, 2019 Filing 32 Motion for attorney Allyson M. Maltas to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9593735, filed by Defendant Novelis, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Allyson M. Maltas)(Barry, Jennifer)
October 16, 2019 Filing 31 Answer to #1 Complaint filed by Aleris Corporation. (Dettelbach, Steven)
October 16, 2019 Filing 30 Answer to #1 Complaint filed by Novelis, Inc.. (Wall, Daniel)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] Joint Motion for entry of proposed scheduling order is moot (Related Doc #24 ). Revised Scheduling Order (Doc. #29 ) has been approved. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 10/11/2019.(D, I)
October 11, 2019 Filing 29 Stipulation & Scheduling Order. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 10/11/2019. (D, I)
October 9, 2019 Filing 28 Joint Proposed Stipulation Regarding Scheduling Order filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Joint Stipulated Case Management and Scheduling Order)(Musallam, Samer)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order re #24 . The date for the close of fact discovery shall be January 10, 2020. The Court sets the number of interrogatories for all parties at twenty-five. Fed.R.Civ.P. 33. In the Motion, Plaintiff argues that it is commonplace to exclude from the privilege log communications between counsel for the United States and counsel for other executive branch agencies. Plaintiff shall file a brief, of no more than five pages, discussing the applicable law in support of Plaintiff's position. Plaintiff's brief shall be filed by Wednesday, October 9, 2019 at 12:00 noon EST. Defendants may respond by October 16, 2019 at 12:00 noon EST. The Court will issue its ruling as soon as possible thereafter. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 10/8/2019. (D, I)
October 8, 2019 Filing 26 Stipulated Protective Order regarding confidential documents with acknowledgment page. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 10/8/2019. (D, I)
October 4, 2019 Filing 25 Notice of Case Management Conference with case management conference to be held on 12/18/2019 at 11:00 AM in Chambers 15B. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 10/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties Planning Meeting, #2 Consent Package)(S,HR)
October 2, 2019 Filing 24 Joint Motion Entry of [Proposed] Stipulated Scheduling Order and [Proposed] Stipulated Protective Order filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - [Proposed] Stipulation and Scheduling Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - [Proposed] Stipulated Protective Order)(Musallam, Samer)
September 30, 2019 Filing 23 Stipulation & Order regarding deadline for filing answers to complaint. Novelis's and Aleris's date to Move or Answer shall be 10/16/2019. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 9/30/2019. (D, I)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motions for appearance pro hac vice by attorneys John Todd Garcia, Jr., Aleksandr Livshits, George Wolfe for Aleris Corporation. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Docs. #19 , #20 , #21 ). Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 9/30/2019.(D, I)
September 25, 2019 Filing 22 Proposed Stipulation Regarding Deadline for Filing Answers to Complaint filed by Novelis, Inc.. (Barry, Jennifer)
September 24, 2019 Filing 21 Motion for attorney George Wolfe to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9540343, filed by Defendant Aleris Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Good Standing in Support of Motion for Admission of George Wolfe Pro Hac Vice)(Dettelbach, Steven)
September 24, 2019 Filing 20 Motion for attorney Aleksandr Livshits to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9540342, filed by Defendant Aleris Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Good Standing in Support of Motion for Admission of Aleksandr Livshits Pro Hac Vice)(Dettelbach, Steven)
September 24, 2019 Filing 19 Motion for attorney John Todd Garcia Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9540341, filed by Defendant Aleris Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Good Standing in Support of Motion for Admission of John Todd Garcia Jr. Pro Hac Vice)(Dettelbach, Steven)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Nathaniel Asker, Stephen M. Juris, Justin J. Santolli for Aleris Corporation. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #15 , #16 , #17 ). Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 9/13/2019.(W,CM)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorneys Daniel M. Wall, Amanda P. Reeves, Lawrence E. Buterman, Marguerite M. Sullivan, Lindsey S. Champlin, Farrell J. Malone for Novelis, Inc.. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #4 , #5 , #6 , #7 , #8 , #9 ). Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 9/13/2019.(W,CM)
September 11, 2019 Filing 18 Attorney Appearance by Douglas L. Shively filed by on behalf of Aleris Corporation. (Shively, Douglas)
September 11, 2019 Filing 17 Motion for attorney Justin J. Santolli to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9518307, filed by Defendant Aleris Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Good Standing in Support of Motion for Admission of Justin J. Santolli Pro Hac Vice)(Dettelbach, Steven)
September 11, 2019 Filing 16 Motion for attorney Stephen M. Juris to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9518305, filed by Defendant Aleris Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Good Standing in Support of Motion for Admission of Stephen M. Juris Pro Hac Vice)(Dettelbach, Steven)
September 11, 2019 Filing 15 Motion for attorney Nathaniel Asker to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9518304, filed by Defendant Aleris Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Good Standing in Support of Motion for Admission of Nathaniel Asker Pro Hac Vice)(Dettelbach, Steven)
September 11, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Oaktree Capital Management, L.P., Corporate Parent Apollo Management, L.P. for Aleris Corporation filed by Aleris Corporation. (Dettelbach, Steven)
September 11, 2019 Filing 13 Attorney Appearance by Steven M. Dettelbach filed by on behalf of Aleris Corporation. (Dettelbach, Steven)
September 11, 2019 Filing 12 Attorney Appearance by Blake Rushforth filed by on behalf of United States of America. (Rushforth, Blake)
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 Explanation of Plan to Refer this Matter to Arbitration filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit [REDACTED] Arbitration Term Sheet)(Musallam, Samer)
September 8, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Hindalco Industries, Ltd. for Novelis, Inc. filed by Novelis, Inc. (Barry, Jennifer)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 Motion for attorney Farrell J. Malone to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9509009, filed by Defendant Novelis, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Farrell J. Malone)(Barry, Jennifer)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 Motion for attorney Lindsey S. Champlin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9508019, filed by Defendant Novelis, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Lindsey S. Champlin)(Barry, Jennifer)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 Motion for attorney Marguerite M. Sullivan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9507994, filed by Defendant Novelis, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Marguerite M. Sullivan)(Barry, Jennifer)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 Motion for attorney Lawrence E. Buterman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9507960, filed by Defendant Novelis, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Lawrence E. Buterman)(Barry, Jennifer)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 Motion for attorney Amanda P. Reeves to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9507914, filed by Defendant Novelis, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Amanda P. Reeves)(Barry, Jennifer)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 Motion for attorney Daniel M. Wall to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9507814, filed by Defendant Novelis, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Daniel M. Wall)(Barry, Jennifer)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 Attorney Appearance by Jennifer L. Barry filed by on behalf of Novelis, Inc.. (Barry, Jennifer)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons were not provided and were not issued. (B,R)
September 4, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (B,R)
September 4, 2019 Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case, (B,R)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against All Defendants.. Filing fee exempt. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Musallam, Samer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Novelis Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aleris Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novelis, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer L. Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Samer M. Musallam
Represented By: Lowell R. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?