Markel Insurance Company v. Industrial Realty Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Markel Insurance Company
Defendant: Brenda Hast, Frederick Hast, III, IRG Lorain, LLC, Industrial Realty Group, LLC, Statewide Construction Company, IRG Realty Advisors, LLC and Ohio Bureau of Workers' Compensation
Case Number: 1:2019cv02049
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 13 Stipulated Motion for leave to Plead filed by IRG Lorain, LLC, IRG Realty Advisors, LLC, Industrial Realty Group, LLC. Related document(s) #1 . (Greenfelder, Justin)
October 29, 2019 Filing 12 Attorney Appearance by Justin S. Greenfelder and Jude B. Streb filed by on behalf of IRG Lorain, LLC, IRG Realty Advisors, LLC, Industrial Realty Group, LLC. (Greenfelder, Justin)
October 18, 2019 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Markel Insurance Company. Ohio Bureau of Workers' Compensation waiver sent on 9/5/2019, answer due 11/4/2019 filed on behalf of Markel Insurance Company (Miller, Brant)
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon IRG Realty Advisors, LLC on 10/8/2019, filed on behalf of Markel Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Miller, Brant)
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon IRG Lorain, LLC on 10/8/2019, filed on behalf of Markel Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Miller, Brant)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon IRG Lorain, LLC, IRG Realty Advisors, LLC, Industrial Realty Group, LLC, Ohio Bureau of Workers' Compensation, Statewide Construction Company. (D,TM)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Markel Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons Industrial Realty Group Summons, #2 Summons IRG Lorain Summons, #3 Summons IRG Realty Advisors Summons, #4 Summons Ohio WC Summons, #5 Summons Statewide Construction Summons)(Miller, Brant)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Markel Insurance Company. Brenda Hast waiver sent on 9/5/2019, answer due 11/4/2019 filed on behalf of Markel Insurance Company (Miller, Brant)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Markel Insurance Company. Frederick Hast, III waiver sent on 9/5/2019, answer due 11/4/2019 filed on behalf of Markel Insurance Company (Miller, Brant)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons were not provided and were not issued. (B,R)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 Supplement to Complaint - Amended Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Markel Insurance Company. Related document #1 . (Miller, Brant)
September 5, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (B,R)
September 5, 2019 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, (B,R)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Markel Corporation for Markel Insurance Company filed by Markel Insurance Company. (Miller, Brant)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand for Declaratory Judgment against Brenda Hast, Frederick Hast, III, IRG Lorain, LLC, IRG Realty Advisors, LLC, Industrial Realty Group, LLC, Ohio Bureau of Workers' Compensation, Statewide Construction Company. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action, 1:17cv01952-PAG Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9507635.. Filed by Markel Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - 2019.Hast Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - MIC Policy, #4 Exhibit C - IRG Answer to Hast, #5 Exhibit D - 7.9.2019 Order) (Miller, Brant)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Markel Insurance Company v. Industrial Realty Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Hast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick Hast, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IRG Lorain, LLC
Represented By: Justin S. Greenfelder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Realty Group, LLC
Represented By: Justin S. Greenfelder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Statewide Construction Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IRG Realty Advisors, LLC
Represented By: Justin S. Greenfelder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Bureau of Workers' Compensation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Markel Insurance Company
Represented By: Brant T. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?