Berry et al v. Doe et al
Plaintiff: Marlesha Berry
Defendant: LM General Insurance Company and John Doe
Case Number: 1:2019cv02053
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Marginal Entry Order approving Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) (Related Document #7 ). Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 9/12/2019. (L,Ja)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Zaffiro, Thomas)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 10/30/2019 at 02:30 PM at Chambers 16A. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 9/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting)(L,Ja)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Consent Package Issued by Courtroom Deputy (L,Ja)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order: This matter was removed to this Court on September 6, 2019. For the convenience of the Court, and by no later than September 20, 2019 the parties are directed to refile herein any motions that were previously filed in state court and which remained pending at the time of removal. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 9/9/2019. (L,Ja)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (B,R)
September 6, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (B,R)
September 6, 2019 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case, (B,R)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by LM General Insurance Company. (Carson, Frank)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV 19 919388 Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9509004.. Filed by LM General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Lower court filings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Carson, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berry et al v. Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LM General Insurance Company
Represented By: Frank S. Carson
Represented By: William M. Harter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlesha Berry
Represented By: Thomas J. Zaffiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?