Barney v. HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mitchell Barney
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., Jill Kinsell, Hildalyn Gonzalez Rosado, Caliber Home Loans, Inc., Alyssa Salyers, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Intervale Mortgage Corporation, Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, Ashlee Lawson and HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02059
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James S Gwin
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 Return of Service by Clerk unexecuted upon Mortgage Eletronic Registration Systems Inc. Service attempted by Certified Mail on 10/18/19 filed on behalf of Mitchell Barney Related document(s) #1 . (Y,A)
October 11, 2019 Copy of #8 Certified Mail Receipt and Notice of Electronic Filing mailed to Mitchell Barney at 2485 Newbury Drive, Cleveland, OH 44118 on 10/16/2019. Related document(s) #8 . (S,AN)
October 11, 2019 Filing 8 Certified mail receipt returned without signature or date, for a service package addressed to Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. s/c CT Corporation System. (S,AN)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service by Clerk unexecuted upon U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. Service attempted by Certified Mail on 9/19/2019 filed on behalf of Mitchell Barney Related document(s) #1 . (L,MI)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service by Clerk unexecuted upon Alyssa Salyers, #70190700000022506740, Jill Kinsell, #70190700000022506702, Hildalyn Gonzalez Rosado, #70190700000022506719, and Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, #70190700000022506696. Service attempted by Certified Mail on 9/14/19 filed on behalf of Mitchell Barney Related document(s) #1 . (Y,A)
September 11, 2019 Copy of #4 Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Order on Motion for preliminary injunction, and #5 Judgment mailed to Mitchell Barney at 2485 Newbury Drive Cleveland, Ohio 44118 on 9/11/2019. (S,KM)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 Judgment Entry signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 9/11/2019. The Court having entered its Opinion and Order, denies the plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order and dismisses this case. The Court further certifies, pursuant to 28 USC 1915(a)(3),that an appeal from this decision could not be taken in good faith. (S,KM)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Opinion and Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 9/11/2019. The Court for the reasons set forth in the order denies plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for preliminary injunction. The Court further certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that an appeal from this decision could not be taken in good faith. (Related Doc #3 )(S,KM)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for temporary restraining order, Motion for preliminary injunction filed by Plaintiff Mitchell Barney. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support, #2 Exhibit A Examiner's Opinion, #3 Proposed Order)(B,R)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued over the counter for service upon Caliber Home Loans, Inc., Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., Intervale Mortgage Corporation, Jill Kinsell, Ashlee Lawson, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Hildalyn Gonzalez Rosado, Alyssa Salyers, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (B,R)
September 9, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (B,R)
September 9, 2019 Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case, (B,R)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint for Money Damages, Declaratory, Injunctive, and other relief with jury demand against Caliber Home Loans, Inc., Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC, HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., Intervale Mortgage Corporation, Jill Kinsell, Ashlee Lawson, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Hildalyn Gonzalez Rosado, Alyssa Salyers, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. Filing fee paid. $400.00. Receipt # 14660117142. Filed by Mitchell Barney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Adjustable Rate Note, #2 Exhibit B Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C Corporate Assignment of Mortgage HSBC, #4 Exhibit D Assignment of Mortgage Caliber Home Loans, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (B,R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barney v. HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Kinsell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hildalyn Gonzalez Rosado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alyssa Salyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intervale Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Decision One Mortgage Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashlee Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell Barney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?