Shrieves v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Frank G. Shrieves
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv02114
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Case Management Conference Plan/Order. Case is assigned to the standard track. Parties to be Joined and Pleading Amendments due by 1/31/2020. Discovery due by 3/31/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 6/30/2020. Expert discovery shall be completed by 6/15/2020. The party initially seeking to introduce expert testimony shall exchange his or her Expert Report on or before 4/30/2020. Responsive Expert Reports shall be exchanged on or before 5/29/2020. Status Conference set for 2/19/2020 at 01:30 PM in to be held telephonically, dial-in instructions to be sent in a separate email. IMPORTANT: The parties are advised to carefully read this Order and to familiarize themselves with the deadlines imposed as not all deadlines are contained in the text of this docket entry. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 11/4/2019. (L,Ja) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2019: #1 Case Management Order) (L,Ja).
November 4, 2019 Filing 10 Minutes of proceedings before Judge Pamela A. Barker. Case Management Conference held on 11/4/2019. Separate Case Management Conference Order to be issued. (Court Reporter: None.)Time: 20 mins. (L,Ja)
October 30, 2019 Filing 9 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Jansky, David)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Collins, Gregory)
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 Certified copy of state court documents received from Lorain County Common Pleas Court. (W,CM)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order. For the convenience of the Court, and by no later than 14 days from the date of the filing of the Notice of Removal for new cases the parties are directed to refile herein any motions that were previously filed in state court and which remained pending at the time of removal. Signed by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 09/17/2019. (W,RA)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order. Case management conference to be held on 11/4/2019 at 02:00 PM at Chambers 16A. Signed by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 09/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Report parties planning)(W,RA)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (W,RA)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (Y,A)
September 13, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (Y,A)
September 13, 2019 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case, (Y,A)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand (Related Doc #1 ) filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Collins, Gregory)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Lorain County, case number 19CV198887 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $400, receipt number 0647-9522269. Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 FILING ERROR, Counsel advise to file using correct event) (Collins, Gregory) Modified text on 10/7/2019 (S,SR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shrieves v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank G. Shrieves
Represented By: David J. Jansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Gregory H. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?