Brede v. Apple Computer, Inc.
Plaintiff: Edward Brede
Defendant: Apple Computer, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02130
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James S Gwin
Referring Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2661
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Apple Computer, Inc. on 11/4/2019, filed on behalf of Edward Brede Related document(s) #7 . (B,R)
October 31, 2019 Service by Clerk. Summons and Amended Complaint addressed to Apple Computer, Inc. placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70180680000051532343. (B,R)
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 Original Summons issued for service upon Apple Computer, Inc. (M,TL)
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Edward Brede. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 First Amended Complaint)(Sabo, Rachel)
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 First Amended complaint against Apple Computer, Inc.. Filed by Edward Brede. (Sabo, Rachel)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 9/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List) (B,R)
September 17, 2019 Random Reassignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (B,R)
September 17, 2019 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case, Judge James S. Gwin terminated. (B,R)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order of Recusal signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 9/17/2019. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another judge. (S,KM)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons were not provided and were not issued. (B,R)
September 16, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (B,R)
September 16, 2019 Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case, (B,R)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Apple Computer, Inc.. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9524950.. Filed by Edward Brede. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Sabo, Rachel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brede v. Apple Computer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Computer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Brede
Represented By: Rachel A. Sabo
Represented By: Peter G. Friedmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?