Accel Schools, LLC et al v. Thorson
Plaintiff: Pansophic Learning US LLC and Accel Schools, LLC
Defendant: Erik A Thorson
Case Number: 1:2019cv02144
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Termination of case by clerk on October 28, 2019. See plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i). (Doc. No. #24 ). (D,N)
October 10, 2019 Filing 24 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) (A)(i) without prejudice filed by Accel Schools, LLC, Pansophic Learning US LLC. (Roberts, Michael)
October 1, 2019 Filing 23 Marginal Entry Order granting Joint Motion to continue (Related Doc #22 ). The Court adopts the parties' proposed briefing schedule. Judge Sara Lioi on 10/1/2019.(D,N)
September 30, 2019 Filing 22 Agreed Motion to Adjourn Preliminary Injunction Hearing and Set Schedule filed by Accel Schools, LLC, Pansophic Learning US LLC. Related document #2 (Pinney, John)
September 27, 2019 Filing 21 Motion to dismiss for lack of capacity to sue filed by Defendant Erik A Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Screenshots of Secretary of State website search, #2 Declaration)(Berger, Chelsea) ).
September 27, 2019 IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] The Telephone Conference scheduled for 9/27/2019 at 4:00 PM is canceled. (D,N)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order granting plaintiffs' #17 motion for leave to amend complaint. The parties shall participate in a conference call with the Court on September 27, 2019 at 4:00 p.m. to discuss the implications of this motion on the upcoming preliminary injunction hearing. The Telephone Conference will be initiated by plaintiff's counsel. After all counsel are on line, plaintiff's counsel is to place the call to the Chambers of the Honorable Sara Lioi at (330) 252-6060. Judge Sara Lioi on 9/26/2019. (D,N)
September 26, 2019 Filing 19 Attorney Appearance as Co-Counsel for Defendant by Chelsea Berger filed by on behalf of Erik A Thorson. (Berger, Chelsea)
September 25, 2019 Filing 18 Supplement to Motion for leave to Add John Veard as Party and for Leave to File First Amended Complaint - Attachment (2) Exhibit 1 Offer of Employment, filed by Accel Schools, LLC, Pansophic Learning US LLC. Related document(s) #17 . (Roberts, Michael)
September 24, 2019 Filing 17 Motion for leave to Add John Veard as Party and for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Accel Schools, LLC, Pansophic Learning US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1 Offer of Employment, #3 Exhibit 2 Agreement, #4 Exhibit 3 Linked In Profile)(Roberts, Michael)
September 23, 2019 Filing 16 Proposed Stipulated Protective Order filed by Erik A Thorson. (Jodka, Sara)
September 20, 2019 IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 10/1/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 530 before Judge Sara Lioi. (D,N)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery, ECF No. #3 , is granted because Plaintiffs' requested discovery in preparation for the preliminary injunction hearing is reasonably proportionate. Within 7 days of this Order, counsel for both parties are expected to provide each other the necessary discovery. The Court expects counsel for both parties to converse about their respective discovery needs and supply requested discovery that is proportionate to both sides' needs. Counsel should consult L.R. 37.1 regarding any potential discovery disputes. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 9/19/2019. (JLG)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Having considered the factors set forth herein and finding that, on balance, a temporary restraining order is not appropriate, Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (ECF No. #2 ) is denied. A hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction will be held on a date agreed upon by counsel and the assigned judge in the courtroom of the Honorable Sara Lioi, Courtroom 526, John F. Sieberling Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, Two South Main Street, Akron, Ohio 44308. Lead counsel and decision-makers are required to attend. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 9/19/2019. (JLG)
September 19, 2019 Filing 13 Supplement Exhibit 1 to Verified Complaint, filed by Accel Schools, LLC, Pansophic Learning US LLC. Related document(s) #1 . (Roberts, Michael)
September 19, 2019 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Benita Y. Pearson. Telephonic Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (ECF No. #2 ) held on 9/19/2019. Present were Attorneys John B. Pinney and Michael A. Roberts as counsel for Plaintiffs; and Attorneys Jonathan R. Secrest, Sara H. Jodka, and Chelsea Berger as counsel for Defendant. Also present were Christopher Ryan on behalf of Plaintiffs and Defendant Erik A. Thornson. The parties presented their respective positions to the Court. Following argument, the Court denied Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. The Court also granted Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery (ECF No. #3 ). The parties are expected to notify the Court by 12:00 p.m. tomorrow, 9/20/2019, regarding the agreed upon date and time of the preliminary injunction hearing. Orders addressing both motions will issue. (Court Reporter: Mary Uphold); Time: 1 hour and 20 minutes. (JLG)
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 Proof of Service of Court's Order of September 17, 2019 filed by Accel Schools, LLC, Pansophic Learning US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, email #2 Exhibit B, Email with counsel)Related document(s) #7 .(Roberts, Michael)
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Erik A Thorson. Related document(s) #2 . (Jodka, Sara)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 Jurisdictional Statement Supplementing Complaint, filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #8 , #1 . (Pinney, John)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 Attorney Appearance of Jonathan R. Secrest and Sara H. Jodka by Jonathan R. Secrest filed by on behalf of Erik A Thorson. (Secrest, Jonathan)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order For the reasons set forth herein, by 3:30 p.m tomorrow, 9/18/2019, Plaintiffs are directed to file a jurisdictional statement establishing the citizenship of each of Plaintiffs' members such that the Court can be assured that complete diversity exists among all parties. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 9/17/2019. (JLG)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order (ECF No. #2 ) shall come on for a telephonic hearing on the record on Thursday, 9/19/2019, at 9:30 a.m. before Judge Benita Y. Pearson. This case was assigned by random draw to United States District Judge Sara Lioi. Due to the unavailability of Judge Lioi, pursuant to Local Rule 3.11, Judge Lioi arranged for the undersigned to handle matters requiring urgent and immediate attention in her absence. Each side shall be prepared to voice its position regarding the motion. Counsel for Plaintiffs is to set up the conference call and contact Chambers directly at 330-884-7435 with all participants on the line. Defendant shall serve and file a memorandum in opposition to the motion on or before Wednesday, 9/18/2019, at 3:30 p.m. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall immediately serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant or his counsel and file a proof of service. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 9/17/2019. (JLG)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 9/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A Witness List, #2 Appendix B Exhibit List) (B,R)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Erik A Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (B,R)
September 17, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (B,R)
September 17, 2019 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case, (B,R)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 First Set of Discovery filed by Accel Schools, LLC, Pansophic Learning US LLC. Related document(s) #3 . (Roberts, Michael)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Expedited Discovery with memorandum filed by Accel Schools, LLC, Pansophic Learning US LLC. (Roberts, Michael)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 Motion for temporary restraining order and Preliminary Injuction filed by Accel Schools, LLC, Pansophic Learning US LLC. (Roberts, Michael)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint Verified Complaint against Erik A Thorson. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9527247. Filed by Accel Schools, LLC, Pansophic Learning US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1; Non-Competition Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2; Non-Solicitation Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3; LinkedIn Profile, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons) (Roberts, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Accel Schools, LLC et al v. Thorson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pansophic Learning US LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Roberts
Represented By: John B. Pinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Accel Schools, LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Roberts
Represented By: John B. Pinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik A Thorson
Represented By: Chelsea Berger
Represented By: Jonathan R. Secrest
Represented By: Sara Hutchins Jodka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?