Davis v. North Coast Container, LLC
Plaintiff: Leon U Davis
Defendant: North Coast Container, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02248
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2661
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 Marginal Order approving #5 Proposed Stipulated Notice of Dismissal with Prejudice. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 11/6/2019. (JLG)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Stipulated Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) with prejudice filed by Leon U Davis. (Karst, Michael)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with Telephonic Case Management Conference to be held on 12/11/2019 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Benita Y. Pearson. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference call and contact Chambers directly at 330-884-7435, with all participants on the line. The Court requires personal participation of parties at the Case Management Conference, even when the conference is telephonic. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 10/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment No. 1, #2 Attachment No. 2, #3 Attachment No. 3, #4 Attachment No. 4, #5 Attachment No. 5) (JLG)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by North Coast Container, LLC. North Coast Container, LLC waiver sent on 10/3/2019, answer due 12/2/2019 filed on behalf of North Coast Container, LLC (Drozdowski, James)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon North Coast Container, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (R,Ke)
September 27, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (R,Ke)
September 27, 2019 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (R,Ke)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against North Coast Container, LLC. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9545943.. Filed by Leon U Davis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Karst, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. North Coast Container, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon U Davis
Represented By: Jarrett J. Northup
Represented By: Michael P. Karst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Coast Container, LLC
Represented By: James M. Drozdowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?