Tatum v. Department of Veteran Affairs Cleveland Medical Center
Plaintiff: Kara M. Tatum
Defendant: Department of Veteran Affairs Cleveland Medical Center
Case Number: 1:2019cv02262
Filed: September 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 Original Summons and USM-285 issued to U. S. Marshal for service upon Department of Veteran Affairs Cleveland Medical Center. (L,Ja)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Kara M. Tatum. Related document(s) #1 ,. (Attachments: #1 USM-285 US Attorney, #2 Summons US Attorney, #3 USM-285 US Attorney NDOH, #4 Summons US Attorney NDOH, #5 USM-285 Dept of VA Chief Legal Counsel, #6 Summons Dept of VA Chief Legal Counsel)(Cortes, Julie)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 Original Summons reissued and USM-285 US Marshal Form to U. S. Marshal for service upon Department of Veteran Affairs Cleveland Medical Center. (L,Ja)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (L,Ja)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 Original Summons issued to Counsel for service upon Department of Veteran Affairs Cleveland Medical Center. (L,Ja)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's Motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Related Doc #2 ). Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 9/30/2019.(L,Ja)
September 30, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (S,SR)
September 30, 2019 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case, (S,SR)
September 28, 2019 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Kara M Tatum. Related document(s) #1 . (Cortes, Julie)
September 28, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Department of Veteran Affairs.. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Kara M Tatum. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 USM-285 US Marshal Form, #4 Exhibit A-mail receipt, #5 Exhibit B-email, #6 Exhibit C-email, #7 Exhibit D-email, #8 Exhibit E-letter, #9 Exhibit F-email, #10 Exhibit G-pay record, #11 Exhibit H-1-pay record, #12 Exhibit H-2-pay record, #13 Exhibit H-3-pay record, #14 Exhibit I-1-pay record, #15 Exhibit I-2-bank reocrd, #16 Exhibit J-pay record, #17 Exhibit K-pay record, #18 Exhibit L-bank record, #19 Exhibit M-email, #20 Exhibit N-email, #21 Exhibit O-pay record) (Cortes, Julie) Modified text on 9/30/2019 (S,SR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tatum v. Department of Veteran Affairs Cleveland Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Veteran Affairs Cleveland Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kara M. Tatum
Represented By: Julie Clutter Cortes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?