Baldwin v. Boeing Company
Plaintiff: Heidi M Baldwin
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Square D Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Ford Motor Company, Boeing Company, United Technologies Corporation, General Electric Corporation, Ericsson, Inc., Genuine Parts Company, Honeywell International, Inc., Northrop Grumman Corporation, FCA US LLC, Rockwell Automation, Viacom, Curtis-Wright Corporation, John Does, Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rexnord Corporation Stearns Division, Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, Pneumo Abex Corporation, Volkswagaen Group of America, Inc., ArvinMeritor, Inc., BMW of North America, LLC, Peugeot, S.A., Eaton Corporation, Schneider Electric U.S.A., Inc. LLC and Rexnord Industries, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02400
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Referring Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 51 Amended Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Patton, Edward)
December 10, 2019 Filing 50 Attorney Appearance by James M. Lyons, Jr filed by on behalf of Ericsson, Inc.. (Lyons, James)
December 6, 2019 Filing 49 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Meritor, Inc. for ArvinMeritor, Inc. filed by ArvinMeritor, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-02400-PAB, 1:19-cv-02407-PAB(Alexandersen, Kevin)
December 6, 2019 Filing 48 Attorney Appearance by Kevin C. Alexandersen , Daniel J. Michalec and Brooke L. Hamilton filed by on behalf of ArvinMeritor, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-02400-PAB, 1:19-cv-02407-PAB(Alexandersen, Kevin)
December 2, 2019 Filing 47 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company. (Doran, Perry)
November 21, 2019 Filing 46 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Ford Motor Company. (Box, Susan)
November 21, 2019 Filing 45 Attorney Appearance by Susan Squire Box filed by on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (Box, Susan)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant Lockheed Martin Corporation's Motion for leave to Amend Answer (Related Doc #44 ). Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 11/12/2019.(L,Ja)
November 8, 2019 Filing 44 Motion for leave to Amend Answer filed by Defendant Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Amended Answer, #2 Exhibit B Entry of Appearance and Short Form Answer)Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-02400-PAB, 1:19-cv-02407-PAB(Patton, Edward)
November 8, 2019 Filing 43 Separate Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Boeing Company. (O'Connell, Matthew)
November 8, 2019 Filing 42 Separate Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Curtis-Wright Corporation. (O'Connell, Matthew)
November 8, 2019 Filing 41 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Blackrock Inc. for Curtis-Wright Corporation filed by Curtis-Wright Corporation. (O'Connell, Matthew)
November 8, 2019 Filing 40 Attorney Appearance by Matthew C. O'Connell and Nathan F. Studeny filed by on behalf of Curtis-Wright Corporation. (O'Connell, Matthew)
November 6, 2019 Filing 39 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Bayerische Motoren Werke AG (Germany), Corporate Parent Bayerische Motoren Werke AG (Germany) for BMW of North America, LLC, BMW of North America, LLC filed by BMW of North America, LLC. (O'Connell, Matthew)
November 6, 2019 Filing 38 Separate Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand and Answer to All Past, Pending, or Future, Crossclaim filed by BMW of North America, LLC. (O'Connell, Matthew)
November 6, 2019 Filing 37 Attorney Appearance by Matthew C. O'Connell and Nathan F. Studeny filed by on behalf of BMW of North America, LLC. (O'Connell, Matthew)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Order This matter was removed to this Court on October 15, 2019. For the convenience of the Court, and by no later than November 20, 2019, the parties are directed to refile herein any motions that were previously filed in state court and which remained pending at the time of removal. (Related Document #1 ). Entered Judge Pamela A. Barker on 11/6/2019. (L,Ja)
November 5, 2019 Filing 35 Separate Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Volkswagaen Group of America, Inc.. (O'Connell, Matthew)
November 5, 2019 Filing 34 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Volkswagen AG for Volkswagaen Group of America, Inc. filed by Volkswagaen Group of America, Inc.. (O'Connell, Matthew)
November 5, 2019 Filing 33 Attorney Appearance by Matthew C. O'Connell and Nathan F. Studeny filed by on behalf of Volkswagaen Group of America, Inc.. (O'Connell, Matthew)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant Boeing Company's Motion for leave to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint Instanter (Related Doc #31 ). Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 11/4/2019.(L,Ja)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Order The complaint in the above captioned case and Case No. 1:19-cv-02407 Baldwin v. Lockheed Martin Corporation, et al., involve common issues of fact and law. In accordance with Rule 42(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court exercises its discretion to consolidate the above captioned case with Case No. 1:19-cv-02400 in the interest of convenience of the parties and economy in judicial administration. All future filings shall be made in Case No. 1:19-cv-02400. LEAD CASE DESIGNATION. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 11/1/2019. (L,Ja)
October 31, 2019 Filing 31 Motion for leave to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, and Answer to all past, pending or future Cross-Claims Instanter filed by Defendant Boeing Company. (Attachments: #1 Pleading Separate Answer of Defendant The Boeing Company)(O'Connell, Matthew) Modified text on 11/22/2019 (D,TM).
October 31, 2019 Filing 30 Separate Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Rexnord Corporation Stearns Division. (O'Connell, Matthew)
October 31, 2019 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Rexnord Corporation for Rexnord Corporation Stearns Division filed by Rexnord Corporation Stearns Division. (O'Connell, Matthew)
October 31, 2019 Filing 28 Attorney Appearance by Matthew C. O'Connell filed by on behalf of Rexnord Corporation Stearns Division. (O'Connell, Matthew)
October 31, 2019 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Eaton Corporation PLC for Eaton Corporation filed by Eaton Corporation. (Studeny, Nathan)
October 31, 2019 Filing 26 Separate Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand to Plaintiff's Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, and Answer to all Past, Pending or Future Cross-Claims filed by Eaton Corporation. (Studeny, Nathan)
October 31, 2019 Filing 25 Attorney Appearance by Nathan F. Studeny and James L. McCrystal filed by on behalf of Eaton Corporation. (Studeny, Nathan)
October 25, 2019 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate GE Capital Equity, Other Affiliate GE Capital Australia Funding Pty. Ltd., Other Affiliate GE Capital Canada Funding Company, Other Affiliate GE Capital, Other Affiliate GE Capital European Funding, Other Affiliate GE Capital Franchise Finance Corporation, Other Affiliate GE Capital International Funding Company, Other Affiliate GE Capital UK Funding, Other Affiliate GE Capital Treasury Services (U.S.) LLC, Other Affiliate Security Capital Group Incorporated, Other Affiliate SUSA Partnership, L.P. for General Electric Corporation filed by General Electric Corporation. (Doran, Perry)
October 24, 2019 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Westinghouse Electric Corporation. (Doran, Perry)
October 22, 2019 Filing 22 Answer to Complaint and #15 Answer to Crossclaim , Present and Future and Third Party Claims filed by Square D Company. (Novak, Jenifer)
October 22, 2019 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate Schneider Electric Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Schneider Electric Industries, SAS, Other Affiliate Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Other Affiliate Schneider Electric Holding Amerique du Nord, Other Affiliate Schneider Electric SE for Square D Company filed by Square D Company. (Novak, Jenifer)
October 22, 2019 Filing 20 Attorney Appearance by Jenifer E. Novak filed by on behalf of Square D Company. (Novak, Jenifer)
October 22, 2019 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Genuine Parts Company. (Emerson, Julian)
October 22, 2019 Filing 18 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand And to Any Cross-Claims Filed or to be Filed filed by Genuine Parts Company. (Emerson, Julian)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant Honeywell's Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Melanie M. Irwin for Honeywell International, Inc.,Melanie M. Irwin for Honeywell International, Inc.,Melanie M. Irwin for Honeywell International, Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #17 ). Judge Pamela A. Barker on 10/22/2019.(L,Ja)
October 22, 2019 Filing 17 Motion for attorney Melanie M. Irwin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9587533, filed by Defendant Honeywell International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Good Standing Certificate)(Blackmer, Steven)
October 22, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Blackmer, Steven)
October 22, 2019 Filing 15 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand , Crossclaim against All Defendants filed by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Blackmer, Steven)
October 22, 2019 Filing 14 Attorney Appearance by Steven G. Blackmer filed by on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc.. (Blackmer, Steven)
October 22, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Northrop Grumman Corporation. (Norman, Matthew)
October 22, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of removal and joinder to the notice of removal of Lockheed Martin Corporation and the Boeing Company filed by Northrop Grumman Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A summons/complaint, #2 Exhibit B disclosure)(Norman, Matthew)
October 22, 2019 Filing 11 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Northrop Grumman Corporation. (Norman, Matthew)
October 22, 2019 Filing 10 Attorney Appearance by Matthew T. Norman filed by on behalf of Northrop Grumman Corporation. (Norman, Matthew)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order This matter was removed to this Court on 10/15/2019. For the convenience of the Court, and by no later than November 4, 2019, the parties are directed to refile herein any motions that were previously filed in state court and which remained pending at the time of removal. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 10/21/2019. (L,Ja)
October 21, 2019 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case, Judge James S. Gwin terminated. (Y,A)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order of Recusal signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 10/21/2019. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another judge. (S,KM)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by United Technologies Corporation. (Manno, Joseph)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 Motion United Technologies Corporation's Joinder in Defenant the Boeing Company's Notice of Removal of Action filed by Defendant United Technologies Corporation. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Original Complaint, #2 Exhibit B Answer of Defendant United Technologies Corporation to Plaintiff's Complaint, #3 Exhibit C Preliminary Product Identification and Work History Disclosure, #4 Exhibit D Declaration of John C. Sumner in Support of Defendant United Technologies Corporation's Notice of Joinder in Defendant's Notice of Removal of Action, #5 Exhibit E, Declaration of William P. Ringo PH.D., CIH, in Support of Defendant United Technologies Corporation's Notice of Joinder in Defendant's Notice of Removal of Action)(Manno, Joseph) Modified text on 11/5/2019 (K,AR).
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 Attorney Appearance by Joseph A. Manno filed by on behalf of United Technologies Corporation. (Manno, Joseph)
October 16, 2019 Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case, Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr terminated. (B,R)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order of Recusal. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another judge. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 10/16/2019. (R,Sh)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate State Street Bank & Trust Company, Other Affiliate State Street Corporation for Boeing Company filed by Boeing Company(Successor-in-Interest and/or Liability to The Douglas Aircraft Company). (O'Connell, Matthew)
October 15, 2019 Notice by Clerk that Boeing Company failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (Y,A)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (Y,A)
October 15, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (Y,A)
October 15, 2019 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, (Y,A)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Common Pleas, case number CV-19-921269 Filing fee paid $400, receipt number 0647-9574206. Filed by Boeing Company, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Preliminary Product ID and Work History Disclosure, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (O'Connell, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baldwin v. Boeing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: Richard D. Schuster
Represented By: Perry W. Doran, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Square D Company
Represented By: Jenifer E. Novak
Represented By: Colleen C. Murnane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation
Represented By: Edward O. Patton
Represented By: Samuel R. Martillotta
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Embleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: David E. Oeschger
Represented By: Susan Squire Box
Represented By: Patrick M. Hanley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boeing Company
Represented By: Matthew C. O'Connell
Represented By: Nathan F. Studeny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Technologies Corporation
Represented By: Joseph A. Manno
Represented By: Daniel M. Finer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Corporation
Represented By: Richard D. Schuster
Represented By: Perry W. Doran, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ericsson, Inc.
Represented By: Tiffany L. Poirier
Represented By: James M. Lyons, Jr.
Represented By: R. Brian Borla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Represented By: Julian T. Emerson
Represented By: Thomas R. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Melanie M. Irwin
Represented By: Steven G. Blackmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrop Grumman Corporation
Represented By: Matthew T. Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Automation
Represented By: Sarena M. Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom
Represented By: Richard D. Schuster
Represented By: Perry W. Doran, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis-Wright Corporation
Represented By: Matthew C. O'Connell
Represented By: Nathan F. Studeny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Automation, Inc.
Represented By: Sarena M. Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rexnord Corporation Stearns Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company
Represented By: Richard D. Schuster
Represented By: Perry W. Doran, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex Corporation
Represented By: Christopher J. Caryl
Represented By: Ryan T. Winkler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkswagaen Group of America, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew C. O'Connell
Represented By: Nathan F. Studeny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ArvinMeritor, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J. Michalec
Represented By: Kevin C. Alexandersen
Represented By: Brooke L. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW of North America, LLC
Represented By: Matthew C. O'Connell
Represented By: Nathan F. Studeny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peugeot, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Represented By: Nathan F. Studeny
Represented By: James L. McCrystal, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider Electric U.S.A., Inc. LLC
Represented By: Jenifer E. Novak
Represented By: Colleen C. Murnane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rexnord Industries, LLC
Represented By: Matthew C. O'Connell
Represented By: Nathan F. Studeny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidi M Baldwin
Represented By: Brian P. Kelley
Represented By: Brian R. Herberth
Represented By: John M. Murphy
Represented By: Joyce Chambers Reichard
Represented By: Shawn M. Acton
Represented By: Edward J. Kelley, III
Represented By: William D. Mason, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan J. Cavanaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?