Bolyard et al v. Shiva Shakti Two Corporation, et al.
Plaintiff: Pamela Sheppard, Meranda Wilder, Christopher Bolyard, Jelanne Shukry, Audrey Hundley and Mario Paschall
Defendant: Nehal Petal, Shiva Shakti Two Corporation and Hetal Patel
Case Number: 1:2019cv02402
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Donald C Nugent
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15:1938
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Utility Event set/reset motion deadlines as to Motion for class certification (Conditional FLSA Class Certification) pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216 (b). Replies due by 1/3/2020. Related document(s) #8 . (M,S)
December 13, 2019 Filing 17 Marginal Entry Order granting Plaintiffs #13 Motion for extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion for Conditional FLSA Class Certification until 01/03/2020. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 12/13/2019.(M,S)
December 13, 2019 Filing 16 Minutes of proceedings before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 12/13/2019. Case is assigned to the standard track. Discovery due by 6/1/2020. IMPORTANT: Status Conference set for 2/19/2020 at 09:30 AM in Chambers 15A before Judge Donald C. Nugent. (Court Reporter: None.) Time: 15 minutes. (M,S)
December 12, 2019 Filing 15 Defendant Shiva Shakti Two Corporation's Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , Counterclaim against Christopher Bolyard, Mario Paschall, Pamela Sheppard, Meranda Wilder filed by Shiva Shakti Two Corporation. (Horwitz, Thomas)
December 12, 2019 Filing 14 Defendants Hetal Patel and Nehal Patel Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Hetal Patel, Nehal Petal. (Horwitz, Thomas)
December 12, 2019 Filing 13 Motion for extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion for Conditional FLSA Class Certification until 01/03/2020 filed by Christopher Bolyard, Audrey Hundley, Mario Paschall, Pamela Sheppard, Jelanne Shukry, Meranda Wilder. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Dyer, Carrie)
December 11, 2019 Filing 12 Opposition to #8 Motion for class certification (Conditional FLSA Class Certification) pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216 (b) filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1-Nehal Patel Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2-Yon-Cha Mees Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3-Janet Noseworthy Affidavit, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4A-Red-lined Notice Modifications, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4B-Notice Modifications, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5-ND Ohio Counsel Index)(Horwitz, Thomas)
December 3, 2019 Filing 11 Marginal Entry Order granting #9 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #8 Motion for class certification (Conditional FLSA Class Certification) pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216 (b). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 12/3/2019.(W,CM)
December 2, 2019 Filing 10 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Christopher Bolyard, Audrey Hundley, Mario Paschall, Pamela Sheppard, Jelanne Shukry, Meranda Wilder. (Dyer, Carrie)
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 Motion for extension of time until December 11, 2019 to file response/reply to #8 Motion for class certification (Conditional FLSA Class Certification) pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216 (b) filed by Hetal Patel, Nehal Petal, Shiva Shakti Two Corporation. Related document(s) #8 . (Horwitz, Thomas)
November 20, 2019 Filing 8 Motion for class certification (Conditional FLSA Class Certification) pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216 (b) filed by Christopher Bolyard, Audrey Hundley, Mario Paschall, Pamela Sheppard, Jelanne Shukry, Meranda Wilder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Notice to Class, #2 Exhibit B - Bolyard Declaration, #3 Exhibit C - Sheppard Declaration, #4 Exhibit D - Wilder Declaration, #5 Exhibit E - Paschall Declaration, #6 Exhibit F - Hundley Declaration, #7 Exhibit G - Proposed Reminder Email to Class)(Mansell, Gregory)
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 Attorney Appearance by Michael K. Rieke filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Rieke, Michael)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to attend 12/13/2019 Case Management Conference by Telephone. (Related Doc #6 ). Counsel is instructed to initiate conference call and then contact the Court. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 11/5/2019. (M,S)
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed Motion to attend CMC by telephone filed by Christopher Bolyard, Audrey Hundley, Mario Paschall, Pamela Sheppard, Jelanne Shukry, Meranda Wilder. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mansell, Gregory)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 12/13/2019 at 10:30 AM at Chambers 15A before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 11/1/2019. (M,S)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Defendants. All Defendants filed on behalf of All Defendants (Horwitz, Thomas)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Consent Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join Lawsuit)(Mansell, Gregory)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided, therefore were not issued. (Y,A)
October 15, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (Y,A)
October 15, 2019 Judge Donald C. Nugent assigned to case, (Y,A)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9574381.. Filed by Christopher Bolyard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Signed Consents to Participate, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Mansell, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bolyard et al v. Shiva Shakti Two Corporation, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Sheppard
Represented By: Carrie J. Dyer
Represented By: Gregory R. Mansell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meranda Wilder
Represented By: Carrie J. Dyer
Represented By: Gregory R. Mansell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Bolyard
Represented By: Carrie J. Dyer
Represented By: Gregory R. Mansell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jelanne Shukry
Represented By: Carrie J. Dyer
Represented By: Gregory R. Mansell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey Hundley
Represented By: Carrie J. Dyer
Represented By: Gregory R. Mansell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Paschall
Represented By: Carrie J. Dyer
Represented By: Gregory R. Mansell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nehal Petal
Represented By: Michael K. Rieke
Represented By: Thomas M. Horwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shiva Shakti Two Corporation
Represented By: Michael K. Rieke
Represented By: Thomas M. Horwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hetal Patel
Represented By: Michael K. Rieke
Represented By: Thomas M. Horwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?