Baldwin v. Lockheed Martin Corporation, et al.
Plaintiff: Heidi M. Baldwin, Executrix of the Estate of Dorothy R. Grossholz, Deceased and Heidi M. Baldwin
Defendant: Square D Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Ford Motor Company, The Boeing Company and its Boeing Integrated Defense Systems Division as Successor-in-Interest to Rockwell International Corp.'s Defense and Aerospace Division and North American Aviation, United Technologies Corporation, The Boeing Company, Successor in Interest and/or Liability to the Douglas Aircraft Company, Rockwell Automation, As Successor-in-Interest to Rockwell International Corp.'s Defense and Aerospace Division and North American Aviation, Genuine Parts Company, Honeywell International, Inc., Northrop Grumman Corporation, Rockwell Automation, Inc., Successor-in-interest to Allen-Bradley Co., Curtis-Wright Corporation, Ericsson, Inc., General Electric Corporation, Rexnord Corporation Stearns Division, FCA US LLC and its Alfa Romeo Division, Westinghouse Electric Corporation, aka Viacom, Pneumo Abex Corporation, Volkswagaen Group of America, Inc., The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co., ArvinMeritor, Inc., BMW of North America, LLC, Peugeot, S.A., Eaton Corporation, The Boeing Company, and its Defense, Space and Security Business Unit, Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Boeing Company, FCA US LLC, Rockwell Automation, Schneider Electric U.S.A., Inc. LLC, Viacom, John Does, Rockwell Automation, Inc. and Rexnord Industries, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02407
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Meritor, Inc. for ArvinMeritor, Inc. filed by ArvinMeritor, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-02400-PAB, 1:19-cv-02407-PAB(Alexandersen, Kevin)
December 6, 2019 Filing 35 Attorney Appearance by Kevin C. Alexandersen , Daniel J. Michalec and Brooke L. Hamilton filed by on behalf of ArvinMeritor, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-02400-PAB, 1:19-cv-02407-PAB(Alexandersen, Kevin)
November 8, 2019 Filing 34 Motion for leave to Amend Answer filed by Defendant Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Answer, #2 Exhibit B - Entry of Appearance and Short Form Answer)Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-02400-PAB, 1:19-cv-02407-PAB(Patton, Edward)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Order The complaint in the above captioned case and Case No. 1:19-cv-02407 Baldwin v. Lockheed Martin Corporation, et al., involve common issues of fact and law. In accordance with Rule 42(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court exercises its discretion to consolidate the above captioned case with Case No. 1:19-cv-02400 in the interest of convenience of the parties and economy in judicial administration. All future filings shall be made in Case No. 1:19-cv-02400. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 11/1/2019. (L,Ja)
October 31, 2019 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by United Technologies Corporation. (Finer, Daniel)
October 31, 2019 Filing 31 Attorney Appearance by Daniel M. Finer filed by on behalf of United Technologies Corporation. (Finer, Daniel)
October 31, 2019 Filing 30 Motion for leave to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Boeing Company. (Attachments: #1 Pleading Separate Answer of Defendant the Boeing Company)(O'Connell, Matthew)
October 31, 2019 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Rexnord Corporation for Rexnord Corporation Stearns Division filed by Rexnord Corporation Stearns Division. (O'Connell, Matthew)
October 31, 2019 Filing 28 Separate Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Rexnord Corporation Stearns Division. (O'Connell, Matthew)
October 31, 2019 Filing 27 Attorney Appearance by Matthew C. O'Connell and Nathan F. Studeny filed by on behalf of Rexnord Corporation Stearns Division. (O'Connell, Matthew)
October 31, 2019 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Eaton Corporation PLC for Eaton Corporation filed by Eaton Corporation. (Studeny, Nathan)
October 31, 2019 Filing 25 Attorney Appearance by Nathan F. Studeny and James L. McCrystal filed by on behalf of Eaton Corporation. (Studeny, Nathan)
October 31, 2019 Filing 24 Separate Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand to Plaintiff's Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and Answer to all Past, Pending or Future Cross-Claims filed by Eaton Corporation. (Studeny, Nathan)
October 31, 2019 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson for Ericsson, Inc. filed by Ericsson, Inc.. (Lyons, James)
October 29, 2019 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case, Judge Christopher A. Boyko terminated. (Y,A)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order of Reassignment. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to Judge Pamela A. Barker as related to Case No. 1:19cv2400 for all further proceedings. Judges Christopher A. Boyko and Pamela A. Barker on 10/29/2019. (D, I)
October 25, 2019 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate GE Capital Equity, Other Affiliate GE Capital Australia Funding Pty. Ltd., Other Affiliate GE Capital Canada Funding Company, Other Affiliate GE Capital, Other Affiliate GE Capital European Funding, Other Affiliate GE Capital Franchise Finance Corporation, Other Affiliate GE Capital International Funding Company, Other Affiliate GE Capital UK Funding, Other Affiliate GE Capital Treasury Services (U.S.) LLC, Other Affiliate Security Capital Group Incorporated, Other Affiliate SUSA Partnership, L.P. for General Electric Corporation filed by General Electric Corporation. (Doran, Perry)
October 25, 2019 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Westinghouse Electric Corporation. (Doran, Perry)
October 24, 2019 Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case, Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr terminated. (B,R)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order of Recusal. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another judge. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 10/24/2019. (R,Sh)
October 22, 2019 Filing 18 Answer to Complaint , Present and Future Cross Claims and Third Party Claims (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Square D Company. (Novak, Jenifer)
October 22, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate Schneider Electric Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Schneider Electric Industries, SAS, Other Affiliate Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Other Affiliate Schneider Electric Holding Amerique du Nord, Other Affiliate Schneider Electric SE for Square D Company filed by Square D Company. (Novak, Jenifer)
October 22, 2019 Filing 16 Attorney Appearance by Jenifer E. Novak filed by on behalf of Square D Company. (Novak, Jenifer)
October 22, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Genuine Parts Company. (Emerson, Julian)
October 22, 2019 Filing 14 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand And to Any Cross-Claims Filed or to be Filed, filed by Genuine Parts Company. (Emerson, Julian)
October 22, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Pneumo Abex Corporation. (Winkler, Ryan)
October 22, 2019 Filing 12 Attorney Appearance by Ryan T. Winkler filed by on behalf of Pneumo Abex Corporation. (Winkler, Ryan)
October 22, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Rockwell Automation. (Holder, Sarena)
October 22, 2019 Filing 10 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Rockwell Automation. (Holder, Sarena)
October 22, 2019 Filing 9 Attorney Appearance by Sarena M. Holder filed by on behalf of Rockwell Automation. (Holder, Sarena)
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Rockwell Automation, Inc.. (Holder, Sarena)
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Rockwell Automation, Inc.. (Holder, Sarena)
October 22, 2019 Filing 6 Attorney Appearance by Sarena M. Holder filed by on behalf of Rockwell Automation, Inc.. Related document(s) #1 .(Holder, Sarena)
October 21, 2019 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, Judge James S. Gwin terminated. (B,R)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order of Recusal signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 10/21/2019. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another judge. (S,KM)
October 17, 2019 Notice to Attorney Daniel M. Finer. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (O,K)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (B,R)
October 16, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (B,R)
October 16, 2019 Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case, (B,R)
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 Supplement to Notice of Removal - Civil Cover Sheet filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Patton, Edward)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Patton, Edward)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV19921269 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9575851.. Filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Baldwin Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 Plaintiff's Responses to First Amended CDR, #3 Exhibit 3 Plaintiff's Preliminary Product Identification and Work History Disclosure, #4 Exhibit 4 State Court docket) (Patton, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baldwin v. Lockheed Martin Corporation, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Square D Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation
Represented By: Edward O. Patton
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Embleton
Represented By: Samuel R. Martillotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Susan Squire Box
Represented By: Patrick M. Hanley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boeing Company and its Boeing Integrated Defense Systems Division as Successor-in-Interest to Rockwell International Corp.'s Defense and Aerospace Division and North American Aviation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Technologies Corporation
Represented By: Daniel M. Finer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boeing Company, Successor in Interest and/or Liability to the Douglas Aircraft Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Automation, As Successor-in-Interest to Rockwell International Corp.'s Defense and Aerospace Division and North American Aviation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Represented By: Julian T. Emerson
Represented By: Thomas R. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Steven G. Blackmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrop Grumman Corporation
Represented By: Matthew T. Norman
Represented By: Robert R. Terbrack, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Automation, Inc., Successor-in-interest to Allen-Bradley Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis-Wright Corporation
Represented By: Nathan F. Studeny
Represented By: Matthew C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ericsson, Inc.
Represented By: James M. Lyons, Jr.
Represented By: Tiffany L. Poirier
Represented By: R. Brian Borla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Corporation
Represented By: Richard D. Schuster
Represented By: Perry W. Doran, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rexnord Corporation Stearns Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC and its Alfa Romeo Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation, aka Viacom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex Corporation
Represented By: Ryan T. Winkler
Represented By: Christopher J. Caryl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkswagaen Group of America, Inc.
Represented By: Nathan F. Studeny
Represented By: Matthew C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co.
Represented By: Richard D. Schuster
Represented By: Perry W. Doran, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ArvinMeritor, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J. Michalec
Represented By: Brooke L. Hamilton
Represented By: Kevin C. Alexandersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW of North America, LLC
Represented By: Nathan F. Studeny
Represented By: Matthew C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peugeot, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Represented By: Nathan F. Studeny
Represented By: James L. McCrystal, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boeing Company, and its Defense, Space and Security Business Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: Richard D. Schuster
Represented By: Perry W. Doran, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boeing Company
Represented By: Nathan F. Studeny
Represented By: Matthew C. O'Connell
Represented By: Matthew C. O'Connell,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Automation
Represented By: Sarena M. Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider Electric U.S.A., Inc. LLC
Represented By: Jenifer E. Novak
Represented By: Colleen C. Murnane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom
Represented By: Richard D. Schuster
Represented By: Perry W. Doran, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Automation, Inc.
Represented By: Sarena M. Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rexnord Industries, LLC
Represented By: Nathan F. Studeny
Represented By: Matthew C. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidi M. Baldwin, Executrix of the Estate of Dorothy R. Grossholz, Deceased
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidi M. Baldwin
Represented By: John M. Murphy
Represented By: Joyce Chambers Reichard
Represented By: Brian P. Kelley
Represented By: Shawn M. Acton
Represented By: Brian R. Herberth
Represented By: Edward J. Kelley, III
Represented By: William D. Mason, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan J. Cavanaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?