Bailey v. Erdos
Petitioner: Anthony Bailey and Gerald A West
Respondent: Warden Ronald Erdos
Case Number: 1:2019cv02409
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Remark by Clerk: This case was assigned and processed without the filing of a Civil Cover Sheet, which is required by Local Rule 3.13(a). Copy of #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), #7 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order and blank civil cover sheet mailed to Anthony Bailey #332-116, Southern Ohio Correctional Facility, P.O. Box 45699, Lucasville, OH 45699-0001 on 10/16/2019. (M,TL)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (M,TL)
October 16, 2019 Notice to Attorney General of 2254 case transferred to Northern District of Ohio from Southern District of Ohio. (M,TL)
October 16, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (M,TL)
October 16, 2019 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (M,TL)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Ohio Southern. Case number 1:19-cv-00862. Electronic file, transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 16, 2019 Case transferred to Northern District of Ohio - Eastern Division. Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (bjc) [Transferred from ohsd on 10/16/2019.]
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF TRANSFER - it is hereby ORDERED that this action be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio, Eastern Division, for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 10/16/2019. (bjc)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) [Transferred from ohsd on 10/16/2019.]
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Petitioner Anthony Bailey re #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, Exhibits to the Petition (bjc) [Transferred from ohsd on 10/16/2019.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Anthony Bailey. (cb) [Transferred from ohsd on 10/16/2019.]
October 11, 2019 Notice of Correction re: #1 Filed in Error Please Disregard. Filed Wrong Docket Entry Type. Will File as Correct Docket Entry. (cb) [Transferred from ohsd on 10/16/2019.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 100CIN037832. (cb) [Transferred from ohsd on 10/16/2019.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 [FORMER DOC. 1 - PLEASE DISREGARD, FILED IN ERROR.] COMPLAINT against Warden, Southern Ohio Correctional Facility, filed by Anthony Bailey. (cb) Modified to restrict to court users only on 10/11/2019 (cb). Modified docket text on 10/15/2019 (eh). [Transferred from ohsd on 10/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey v. Erdos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gerald A West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Ronald Erdos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?