Cheffen v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Patricia Cheffen
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv02412
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Christopher A Boyko
Referring Judge: George J Limbert
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service by U.S. Marshal executed upon Commissioner of the Social Security Administration c/o US Attorney via personal service on 11/1/2019; c/o US Attorney General via FedEx on 11/4/19; c/o Regional Chief Counsel via FedEx on 11/4/19 filed on behalf of Patricia Cheffen. Related document(s) #7 . (M,TL)
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 Original Summonses, Complaints, and Magistrate Consent Forms issued to U.S. Marshal for service upon Commissioner of the Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 USM-285) (S,AA)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order: Defendant is to file a certified copy of the transcript of the administrative proceedings and answer within 60 days from the date of service of the complaint; within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and answer, plaintiff must file a brief; within 30 days of the filing of plaintiff's brief, defendant may file a brief in support of the Commissioner's decision; if plaintiff chooses to respond to defendant's brief, plaintiff shall file a reply brief within 14 days from the filing of defendant's brief; further, plaintiff's counsel shall immediately fax or email the U.S. Attorney's Office, Northern District of Ohio, the case name, case number, and plaintiff's social security number, and shall file a certificate, confirming that such notice has been sent. Signed by Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert on 10/29/2019. (S,AA)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (S,AA)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order: granting plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Related Doc #2 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert on 10/29/2019.(S,AA)
October 16, 2019 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 10/16/2019. (L,MI)
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (L,MI)
October 16, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (L,MI)
October 16, 2019 Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case. (L,MI)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Patricia Cheffen. (Gillissie, Rebecca)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of the Social Security Administration.. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Patricia Cheffen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for US Attorney General, #3 Summons for Asst. US Attorney, #4 Summons for Social Security Adm., #5 USM-285 for US Attorney General, #6 USM-285 for Asst. US Attorney, #7 USM-285 for Social Security Adm.) (Gillissie, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cheffen v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Cheffen
Represented By: Rebecca R. Gillissie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Represented By: Ruchi Vikram Asher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?