Morris v. Wise, et al.
Plaintiff: Clayton Morris
Defendant: Holton-Wise Property Group, James Wise and Holton-Wise Property Group LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02467
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Donald C Nugent
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Holton-Wise Property Group LLC. (Lane, Stephanie)
December 19, 2019 Filing 23 Brief In Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by All Defendants. Related document(s) #17 , #22 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--NYT Article SEptember 2019, #2 Exhibit B--Indy News Article June 2019, #3 Exhibit C--Natali Morris Blog, #4 Exhibit D--Morris Residency Filing ILL District Court, #5 Exhibit E--Whalen Indictment, #6 Exhibit F--Indy Article re NJ Criminal Probe, #7 Exhibit G--Morris Demand to Destroy Tapes, #8 Appendix A--Sedgewick Decision, #9 Appendix B--Taggert Decision, #10 Appendix C--PA Long Arm Statute) (Lane, Stephanie)
December 19, 2019 Filing 22 Motion to dismiss , Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Holton-Wise Property Group, Holton-Wise Property Group LLC, James Wise. Related document(s) #17 . (Lane, Stephanie)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] denying as moot Defendant's Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim (Related Doc #10 ). Amended Complaint filed 12/5/2019. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 12/13/2019. (M,S)
December 13, 2019 Filing 21 Minutes of proceedings before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Case Management Conference held on 12/13/2019. Case is assigned to the standard track. Non-Expert Discovery due by 6/1/2020. IMPORTANT: Status Conference set for 3/3/2020 at 09:00 AM in Chambers 15A before Judge Donald C. Nugent. (Court Reporter: None.) Time: 30 minutes. (M,S)
December 11, 2019 Filing 20 Affidavit of Service by personal service executed upon Holton-Wise Property Group LLC on 12/10/2019, filed on behalf of Clayton Morris (Laser, Christa)
December 6, 2019 Filing 19 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Holton-Wise Property Group LLC. (W,CM)
December 5, 2019 Filing 18 Supplement to Amended complaint - Verification of Amended Complaint and Exhibits A-F, filed by Clayton Morris. Related document(s) #17 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (preview of video with title), #2 Exhibit B (email blast), #3 Exhibit C (Morris T-shirt), #4 Exhibit D (YouTube Copyright compl), #5 Exhibit E (Counter Notice), #6 Exhibit F (Biggerpockets Wise Reply))(Laser, Christa) Modified on 12/19/2019 - attorney contacted regarding lack of case caption and signature block on document(J,G).
December 5, 2019 Filing 17 First Amended complaint against James Wise and adding new party defendant(s) The Holton-Wise Property Group LLC. Filed by Clayton Morris. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Laser, Christa)
November 29, 2019 Filing 16 Statement of Compliance filed by All Defendants. (Lane, Stephanie)
November 27, 2019 Filing 15 Preservation Statement filed by Clayton Morris. (Laser, Christa)
November 25, 2019 Filing 14 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Clayton Morris. (Laser, Christa)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Christa J. Laser for Clayton Morris. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #13 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 11/21/2019. (M,S)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Louis W. Tompros for Clayton Morris. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #12 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 11/21/2019. (M,S)
November 19, 2019 Filing 13 Motion for attorney Christa J. Laser to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9635600, filed by Plaintiff Clayton Morris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Laser Declaration)(Jones, Katharine)
November 19, 2019 Filing 12 Motion for attorney Louis W. Tompros to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9635578, filed by Plaintiff Clayton Morris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Tompros Declaration)(Jones, Katharine)
November 18, 2019 Filing 11 Marginal Entry Order denying as moot Defendants' #7 Motion for Extension of Time until 12/13/2019 to Answer inasmuch as Defendants filed #10 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim and other grounds on 11/14/2019. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 11/18/2019. (M,S)
November 14, 2019 Filing 10 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim and other grounds filed by Holton-Wise Property Group, James Wise. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Ex A--NYT Article, #3 Exhibit Ex B--Ohio Secretary of State Registration, #4 Exhibit Ex C--Indy News Article, #5 Exhibit D--Official District Court Filing by Plaintiff in District of Indiana, #6 Exhibit Blog entry of Natali Morris, #7 Appendix App A--Sedgwick Case Decision, #8 Appendix App B--PA Long Arm Statute)(Lane, Stephanie)
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 Reply in support of #7 Motion for extension of time until 12/13/2019 to answer filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--NYT Article September 2019, #2 Exhibit B--Indy News Article June 2019, #3 Exhibit C--Morris Court Filing Southern District Indiana)(Lane, Stephanie)
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 Opposition to #7 Motion for extension of time until 12/13/2019 to answer filed by Clayton Morris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email Correspondence)(Jones, Katharine)
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 Motion for extension of time until 12/13/2019 to answer filed by Holton-Wise Property Group, James Wise. (Lane, Stephanie)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 Attorney Appearance by Stephanie J. Lane filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Lane, Stephanie)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 12/13/2019 at 10:45 AM at Chambers 15A before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 11/1/2019. (M,S)
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 Affidavit of Service by personal service executed upon Holton-Wise Property Group on 10/24/2019; James Wise on 10/24/2019, filed on behalf of Clayton Morris (Related document(s) #3 ) (Jones, Katharine)
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Holton-Wise Property Group, James Wise. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (Y,A)
October 22, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (Y,A)
October 22, 2019 Judge Donald C. Nugent assigned to case, (Y,A)
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright (AO121) filed by Clayton Morris. (Jones, Katharine)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $400, Receipt number 0647-9587575. Filed by Clayton Morris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A (preview of video with title), #4 Exhibit B (email blast), #5 Exhibit C (Morris T-shirt), #6 Exhibit D (YouTube Copyright compl), #7 Exhibit E (Counter Notice), #8 Exhibit F (Biggerpockets Wise Reply)) (Jones, Katharine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris v. Wise, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clayton Morris
Represented By: Katharine Szczepanik Jones
Represented By: Christa J. Laser
Represented By: Louis W. Tompros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holton-Wise Property Group
Represented By: Stephanie J. Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Wise
Represented By: Stephanie J. Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holton-Wise Property Group LLC
Represented By: Stephanie J. Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?