Shanahan v. KeyBank
Plaintiff: Daniel Shanahan, LeVora Addison, Alejandro Solano, Laurie Kielbania, Michael Alagich and Jamie Serow
Defendant: KeyBank
Case Number: 1:2019cv02477
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Referring Judge: James S Gwin
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Judgment Entry: For the reasons set forth in the contemporaneously filed Final Order Approving Settlement, Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Final Certification of the Settlement Class and Final Approval of the Class and Collective Action Settlement, Service Awards, Cy Pres Recipient, and Attorneys' Fees and Costs (Doc. No. #39 ) is GRANTED. The Settlement Agreement is hereby APPROVED as it is a fair and reasonable resolution of a bona fide dispute under federal and state law. The parties are to bear their respective attorneys' fees and costs except as provided in the Settlement Agreement. The Court retains jurisdiction over this action for the purpose of enforcing the settlement. This case is dismissed with prejudice. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 3/16/2021. (L,Ja)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 FINAL ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT: The Court approves Class Counsel's request for reimbursement of $5,655 in out-of-pocket costs to be paid from the Gross Settlement Fund. The Court finds that the requested reimbursement is for expenses that were incidental and necessary to the representation of Plaintiffs and the Settlement Class Members. The Court approves the payment of $42,000.00 out of the Global Settlement Fund to A.B. Data, Ltd. for its fees and costs as the Settlements third-party administrator. The Court dismisses this case with prejudice and directs the Clerk of the Court to enter this Final Order and Judgment immediately. As requested by the parties in the Settlement Agreement, the Court retains jurisdiction over the construction, interpretation, implementation, and enforcement of the Settlement and over the administration of settlement benefits. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 3/16/2021. (L,Ja)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] The Court has reviewed and hereby approves the Revised Notices of Settlement Approval (Doc. No. #44 ) submitted by the parties on March 12, 2021. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 3/16/2021. (L,Ja)
March 12, 2021 Filing 44 Notice of Filing Revised Notices of Final Settlement Approval filed by LeVora Addison, Michael Alagich, Laurie Kielbania, Jamie Serow, Daniel Shanahan, Alejandro Solano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Revised Notice to Class Members, #2 Exhibit B - Redlined Notice to Class Members, #3 Exhibit C - Revised Notice to Collective Members, #4 Exhibit D - Redlined Notice to Collective Members)(Swartz, Justin)
March 12, 2021 Filing 43 Minutes of proceedings before Judge Pamela A. Barker. Fairness hearing on March 12, 2021. Class members were provided notice of the hearing and were permitted, along with members of the public, to participate yet no class members participated and/or raised an objection to the settlement. Counsel discussed the fairness and reasonableness of the settlement. At the conclusion of the hearing, the Court announced that it would take the matter under advisement pending the submission of revised Notices of Final Settlement and the Court's review thereof. (Court Reporter: Sarah Nageotte.)Time: 35 minutes.Related document(s) #39 . (L,Ja)
March 12, 2021 Filing 42 Proposed Order filed by Daniel Shanahan. Related document(s) #39 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Redlined)(Swidler, Justin)
March 12, 2021 Minutes of proceedings[non-document] before Judge Pamela A. Barker on 3/11/2021. Telephone conference conducted. Participating on behalf of Plaintiffs were Justin Schwartz and Justin Swidler. Participating on behalf of Defendant was John Gerak. The Court and counsel discussed the three issues raised in this Court's March 11, 2021 Order. Consistent with this discussion, counsel for Plaintiffs will submit revised proposed Notices and a revised Proposed Order. The parties will have the opportunity at the Final Approval Hearing to further discuss and address the issues raised in the March 11, 2021 Order and discussed during the telephone conference (Court Reporter: None.)Time: 25 minutes. (L,Ja)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Order: The parties should be prepared to address the issues set forth in this Order during the March 12, 2021 Final Approval Hearing. Should the parties wish to discuss any of these issues with the Court prior to the hearing, they are encouraged to jointly contact Chambers at (216) 357-7240 to arrange a telephone conference. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 3/11/2021. (L,Ja)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's Motion to attend by telephone (Related Doc #40 ). The Court will provide Plaintiff's counsel, via email, instructions for accessing the conference call. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 3/9/2021.(L,Ja)
March 8, 2021 Filing 40 Unopposed Motion to attend Hearing by telephone filed by Plaintiff Daniel Shanahan. Related document(s) #37 . (Shavitz, Gregg)
February 18, 2021 Filing 39 Unopposed Motion for class certification (for settlement purposes), and final approval of class and collective action settlement, service awards, cy pres recipient, attorney's fees and costs filed by LeVora Addison, Michael Alagich, Laurie Kielbania, Jamie Serow, Daniel Shanahan, Alejandro Solano. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Declaration of Justin M. Swartz, Esq., #3 Proposed Order)(Miller, Matthew)
February 18, 2021 Filing 38 Unopposed Motion for leave to exceed page limitations for Memorandum in support of Motion for Final Approval of Settlement filed by LeVora Addison, Michael Alagich, Laurie Kielbania, Jamie Serow, Daniel Shanahan, Alejandro Solano. (Miller, Matthew)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for leave to exceed page limitations for Memorandum in support of Motion for Final Approval of Settlement (Related Doc #38 ). Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 2/18/2021.(L,Ja)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Order on preliminary approval of class action settlement, conditional certification of the settlement class. The Final Approval Hearing will be held on 3/12/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 16A before Judge Pamela A. Barker. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 12/3/2020. (L,Ja)
December 1, 2020 Filing 36 Notice of Filing Revised Documents pursuant to the Court's November 18, 2020 Order filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Revised Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit B, Revised Proposed Class Notice)(Miller, Matthew)
November 18, 2020 Minutes of proceedings[non-document] before Judge Pamela A. Barker. Telephone conference call held. Participating on behalf of Plaintiffs were Attorneys Matthew A. Miller and Hannah Cole-Chu, and participating on behalf of Defendant was Attorney John Gerak. The Court discussed with counsel for the parties questions it had associated with the Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, Conditional Certification of the Settlement Class, Appointment of Plaintiffs' Counsel as Class Counsel, and Approval of the Notice and Class Action Settlement Procedure (Doc. No. #35 ), and exhibits attached thereto, including the Settlement Agreement, Proposed Class Action Notice, and Proposed Order. Based upon the questions posed and responses thereto by counsel for the parties, the Court instructed counsel as follows. By December 1, 2020, counsel for the parties are to file a revised Proposed Order that incorporates: 1.) an estimate of the reasonable costs and expenses they anticipate will be incurred; 2.) a more detailed explanation of how and when the 82 currently identified members of the FLSA collective will opt-in; 3.) the identities of the four individuals who, in addition to the six named plaintiffs, will apply for a service award of $10,000 and the bases for same; 4.) clarification that Plaintiffs' counsel will be submitting all timely submitted objections to the court; and 5.) a more thorough discussion about the Plaintiffs claims, the procedural background, the fairness of the proposed settlement, and the Rule 23 factors. Also, by December 1, 2020, counsel for the parties are to submit a revised Proposed Class Notice that includes the estimate of reasonable costs and expenses, and the amount of the service award for each of ten individuals who provided service in obtaining the settlement. Time: 40 minutes. (L,Ja)
November 13, 2020 IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] of Status Conference set for 11/18/2020 at 09:00 AM to be held telephonically before Judge Pamela A. Barker. The Court will provide counsel, via email, instructions for accessing the conference call. (L,Ja)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to exceed page limitations (Related Doc #34 ). Approved by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 11/9/2020.(S,SR)
November 6, 2020 Filing 35 Unopposed Motion for class certification (for settlement purposes), approval of class action settlement, appointment of Plaintiffs' Counsel as class counsel, and approval of proposed notice and class action settlement procedure filed by LeVora Addison, Michael Alagich, Laurie Kielbania, Jamie Serow, Daniel Shanahan, Alejandro Solano. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Declaration of Justin M. Swartz, Esq., #3 Proposed Order)(Miller, Matthew)
November 6, 2020 Filing 34 Unopposed Motion for leave to exceed page limitations for memorandum in support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement filed by LeVora Addison, Michael Alagich, Laurie Kielbania, Jamie Serow, Daniel Shanahan, Alejandro Solano. (Miller, Matthew)
November 6, 2020 Filing 33 Motion for attorney Justin M. Swartz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10401942, filed by LeVora Addison, Michael Alagich, Laurie Kielbania, Jamie Serow, Daniel Shanahan, Alejandro Solano. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin M. Swartz)(Swartz, Justin)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Plaintiffs' Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Justin M. Swartz for Michael Alagich, Laurie Kielbania, Jamie Serow, Daniel Shanahan and Alejandro Solano. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #33 ). Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 11/6/2020.(L,Ja)
November 5, 2020 Filing 32 Unopposed Motion for attorney Gregg I. Shavitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10399893, filed by LeVora Addison, Michael Alagich, Laurie Kielbania, Jamie Serow, Daniel Shanahan, Alejandro Solano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Gregg I. Shavitz in Support of Unopposed Motion for Pro Hac Vice)(Shavitz, Gregg)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiffs' Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Gregg I. Shavitz for LeVora Addison, Michael Alagich, Laurie Kielbania, Jamie Serow, Daniel Shanahan and Alejandro Solano. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #32 ). Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 11/5/2020.(L,Ja)
October 30, 2020 Filing 31 Letter on Behalf of the Parties Requesting One Week Extension to File Motion for Preliminary Approval of the Settlement filed by LeVora Addison, Michael Alagich, Laurie Kielbania, Jamie Serow, Daniel Shanahan, Alejandro Solano. Related document(s) #30 . (Miller, Matthew)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #31 Letter on Behalf of the Parties Requesting One Week Extension to File Motion for Preliminary Approval of the Settlement. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 10/30/2020. (L,Ja)
October 28, 2020 Filing 30 Minutes of proceedings before Judge Pamela A. Barker. Counsel for the parties confirmed what they represented in their status letter to the Court filed on October 26, 2020, specifically that the parties have reached a settlement - and the filing of the Second Amended Complaint was incident to that settlement - and they intend to file a motion seeking preliminary approval of the settlement by Friday, October 30, 2020. Time: 3 minutes. (L,Ja)
October 26, 2020 Filing 29 Letter Providing Joint Status Report filed by LeVora Addison, Daniel Shanahan. (Miller, Matthew)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] By a non-document order issued on October 19, 2020 the Court set a telephone status conference for October 28, 2020 at 2:30 p.m. since the stay of this matter expired on October 15, 2020. In anticipation of the status conference set for October 28, 2020, the parties are ordered to file a joint status report by 4:30 p.m. on October 26, 2020. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 10/21/2020. (L,Ja)
October 20, 2020 Filing 28 Second Amended complaint against KeyBank and adding new party plaintiff(s) Michael Alagich, Jamie Serow, Alejandro Solano, and Laurie Kielbania. Filed by Daniel Shanahan, LeVora Addison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - proposed Second Amended Complaint) (Miller, Matthew)
October 19, 2020 IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] of Status Conference set for 10/28/2020 at 2:30 PM to be held telephonically before Judge Pamela A. Barker. The Court will provide counsel, via email, instructions for accessing the conference call. (L,Ja)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Marginal Entry Order: Stipulation to Withdraw Motion to Compel Arbitration Without Prejudice is approved. (Related Documents #26 and #16 ). Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 9/3/2020. (L,Ja)
September 3, 2020 Filing 26 Stipulation to Withdraw Motion to Compel Arbitration Without Prejudice filed by KeyBank. Related Doc. #16 (Thrush, Corey)
August 27, 2020 Filing 25 Minutes of proceedings before Judge Pamela A. Barker. Telephone status conference held. Participating on behalf of Plaintiffs were Attorneys Matthew Miller and Justin Swidler, and participating on behalf of Defendant was Attorney John Gerak. The Court discussed with counsel for the parties their Joint Motion for Extension of Time until 10/15/2020 to Stay Proceedings filed on 8/24/2020 ("the Joint Motion") (Doc. No. #24 ), which constitutes their third request for an extension of the stay of proceedings previously granted. Counsel for the parties more fully apprised the Court of the bases of their request, and that they were working diligently to effectuate the tentative resolution reached at the mediation on July 8, 2020. The Court advised the parties that for good cause shown, their Joint Motion would be granted, and it is hereby GRANTED. The Court requested that counsel for the parties evaluate the potential of a stipulation being filed whereby Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss First Amended Complaint and Stay Discovery Until Motion to Compel is resolved filed on December 6, 2019 (Doc. No. #16 ) could be dismissed without prejudice and refiled if the tentative resolution is not finally effectuated. Counsel for the parties are advised to apprise the Court of their positions on this issue by September 4, 2020. Time: 10 minutes. (L,Ja)
August 25, 2020 IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] of Telephone Conference set for 8/27/2020 at 02:30 PM to be held telephonically before Judge Pamela A. Barker. The Court will provide counsel, via email, instructions for accessing the conference call. (L,Ja)
August 24, 2020 Filing 24 Joint Motion for extension of time until 10/15/2020 to Stay Proceedings filed by LeVora Addison, Daniel Shanahan. (Miller, Matthew)
August 10, 2020 Filing 23 Joint Motion for extension of time until August 24, 2020 to Stay Proceedings filed by Defendant KeyBank. (Gerak, John)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #23 Joint Motion for extension of time until August 24, 2020 to Stay Proceedings. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 8/10/2020.(L,Ja)
July 24, 2020 Filing 22 Joint Motion to extend stay of proceedings an additional ten days until 8/10/2020 filed by Defendant KeyBank. (Thrush, Corey)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #22 Joint Motion to extend stay of proceedings an additional ten days until 8/10/2020. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 7/24/2020.(L,Ja)
April 9, 2020 Filing 21 Joint Motion to stay Proceedings Pending Mediation filed by Defendant KeyBank. (Thrush, Corey)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Joint Motion to stay Proceedings Pending Mediation (Related Doc #21 ). Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 4/9/2020.(L,Ja)
March 27, 2020 Filing 20 Notice of Filing Consent Form filed by Daniel Shanahan. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Miller, Matthew)
February 28, 2020 Filing 19 Notice of filing consent form filed by Daniel Shanahan. (Attachments: #1 Consent form)(Miller, Matthew)
February 3, 2020 LAST NOTICE: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. In order to complete our final transition to NextGen, CM/ECF will be offline starting at 12:00 noon on Friday, February 7, 2020, through 11:59 p.m. Sunday, February 9, 2020. Pursuant to General Order 2020-02, we have established an email box, nextgenfilings@ohnd.uscourts.gov, for submitting documents to be filed during this period.Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. Step one was to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your OHND e-filing account in the NextGen CM/ECF system on or after February 10, 2020. # Linking Instructions. You will be unable to e-file until the accounts are linked. If you have any additional questions, please call the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI)
January 10, 2020 IMPORTANT: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. Information regarding NextGen can be found # on the court's website.Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a multi-step process. Step one is to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Currently, attorneys within a firm may share a PACER account. This will not be allowed with NextGen. Each attorney must have their own upgraded PACER account. If you are using a shared PACER account, register for a new PACER account by clicking # here.If you have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014, no further action is required at this time. If neither applies, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account. If this is not done, you will be unable to e-file after February 10, 2020. Instructions for linking your PACER account to your CM/ECF account will be sent in February. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6854 or the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] Granting the defendant's Motion to stay (Related Doc #18 ). Judge Pamela A. Barker on 12/31/2019.(W,RA)
December 30, 2019 Filing 18 Joint Motion to stay (Extend Stay of Proceedings) filed by Defendant KeyBank. (Thrush, Corey)
December 6, 2019 Filing 17 Joint Motion to stay Proceedings filed by Defendant KeyBank. (Gerak, John)
December 6, 2019 Filing 16 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss First Amended Complaint and Stay Discovery Until Motion to Compel is Resolved filed by Defendant KeyBank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Jessika Poldruhi re Shanahan, #2 Exhibit Affidaivt of Jessika Poldruhi re Addison)(Gerak, John)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Joint Motion to stay proceedings until 1/6/2020. (Related Doc #17 ). Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 12/6/2019.(L,Ja)
December 5, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Filing Consents to Join Lawsuit filed by Daniel Shanahan. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Miller, Matthew)
December 2, 2019 Filing 14 First Amended Individual, Collective, and Class Action Civil Complaint against KeyBank and adding new party plaintiff(s) LeVora Addison. Filed by Daniel Shanahan, LeVora Addison. (Miller, Matthew)
December 2, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Filing Consents to Join Lawsuit filed by Daniel Shanahan. (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms)(Miller, Matthew)
November 26, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Filing Consents to Join Lawsuit filed by Daniel Shanahan. (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms)(Miller, Matthew)
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 Motion for attorney Manali Arora, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9648627, filed by Plaintiff Daniel Shanahan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Manali Arora, Esq., #2 Proposed Order)(Miller, Matthew)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Manali Arora for Daniel Shanahan. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #11 ). Signed by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 11/26/2019.(W,RA)
November 15, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Filing Consents to Join Lawsuit filed by Daniel Shanahan. (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms)(Miller, Matthew)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order GRANTING joint stipulation to set deadlines to respond.. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 11/13/2019. Plaintiff will file his opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss and Stay Discovery Until Motion to Compel #5 is Resolved on or before December 12, 2019; and Defendant will file its reply brief on or before December 26, 2019.(L,Ja)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Stipulation to Set Deadlines to Respond filed by Daniel Shanahan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Related document(s) #5 .(Miller, Matthew)
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 Attorney Appearance by Corey N. Thrush filed by on behalf of KeyBank. (Thrush, Corey)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 Motion for attorney Justin L. Swidler, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9623292, filed by Plaintiff Daniel Shanahan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Justin L. Swidler, Esq., #2 Proposed Order)(Miller, Matthew)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Plaintiff's Motion for appearance pro hac vice by Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #6 ). Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 11/12/2019.(L,Ja)
October 30, 2019 Filing 5 Motion to dismiss and Stay Discovery Until Motion to Compel is Resolved filed by Defendant KeyBank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Jessika Poldruhi)(Gerak, John)
October 28, 2019 Notice to Attorney Justin L. Swidler. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (O,K)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order of Recusal signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 10/25/2019. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another judge (S,KM)
October 25, 2019 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case, Judge James S. Gwin terminated. (B,R)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Plaintiff's Motion for appearance pro hac vice by Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #2 ). Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 10/25/2019.(L,Ja)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon KeyBank. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (S,AN)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 Motion for attorney Matthew D. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 14660118397, filed by Plaintiff Daniel Shanahan. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(S,AN)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint and class action with jury demand against KeyBank. Filing fee paid $400.00. Receipt # 14660118368. Filed by Daniel Shanahan. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (S,AN)
October 23, 2019 Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case. (S,AN)
October 23, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (S,AN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shanahan v. KeyBank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Shanahan
Represented By: Matthew D. Miller
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Manali Arora
Represented By: Justin M. Swartz
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LeVora Addison
Represented By: Matthew D. Miller
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Manali Arora
Represented By: Justin M. Swartz
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandro Solano
Represented By: Matthew D. Miller
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Manali Arora
Represented By: Justin M. Swartz
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Kielbania
Represented By: Matthew D. Miller
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Manali Arora
Represented By: Justin M. Swartz
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Alagich
Represented By: Matthew D. Miller
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Manali Arora
Represented By: Justin M. Swartz
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Serow
Represented By: Matthew D. Miller
Represented By: Justin L. Swidler
Represented By: Manali Arora
Represented By: Justin M. Swartz
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KeyBank
Represented By: John Gerak
Represented By: Corey N. Thrush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?