Nautica Entertainment, LLC v. Allied Debt Collection of Virginia, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nautica Entertainment, LLC
Defendant: Robert W. Jennings, Allied Debt Collection of Virginia, LLC and Michael Zarrelli
Case Number: 1:2019cv02524
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 16 Opposition to #9 Motion to dismiss filed by Nautica Entertainment, LLC. (Levasseur, Eric)
December 9, 2019 Filing 15 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (R,Sh)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 2/6/2020 at 03:00 PM at Chambers 17A before Judge Solomon Oliver Jr. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 12/9/2019. (R,Sh)
December 5, 2019 Filing 13 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Robert W. Jennings placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: ordinary mail. (Y,A)
December 5, 2019 Filing 12 Request to Clerk for service upon Robert W. Jennings by Ordinary Mail. filed by Nautica Entertainment, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Mailing)(Levasseur, Eric)
December 2, 2019 Filing 11 Return of Service by Clerk unexecuted upon Robert W. Jennings. Service attempted by certified mail filed on behalf of Nautica Entertainment, LLC Related document(s) #2 . (J,G)
November 21, 2019 Filing 10 Joint Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Allied Debt Collection of Virginia, LLC, Robert W. Jennings, Michael Zarrelli. (Milligan, Patrick)
November 21, 2019 Filing 9 Motion to dismiss filed by Allied Debt Collection of Virginia, LLC, Robert W. Jennings, Michael Zarrelli. Related document(s) #1 . (Milligan, Patrick)
November 21, 2019 Filing 8 Attorney Appearance by Patrick J. Milligan filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Milligan, Patrick)
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Michael Zarrelli placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: ordinary mail. (J,G)
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 Request to Clerk for service upon Michael Zarrelli by Ordinary Mail. filed by Nautica Entertainment, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Mailing)(Levasseur, Eric)
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service by Clerk unexecuted upon Michael Zarrelli. Service attempted by certified mail filed on behalf of Nautica Entertainment, LLC Related document(s) #2 . (J,G)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Allied Debt Collection of Virginia, LLC on 11/1/2019, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of Nautica Entertainment, LLC Related document(s) #2 . (W,CM)
October 29, 2019 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Allied Debt Collection of Virginia, LLC, receipt #70181830000061324303, Robert W. Jennings, receipt #70181830000061321050, and Michael Zarrelli, receipt #70181830000061324280 placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (Y,A)
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Nautica Entertainment, LLC. (Levasseur, Eric)
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Allied Debt Collection of Virginia, LLC, Robert W. Jennings, Michael Zarrelli. (Attachments: #1 Summons R. Jennings, #2 Summons M. Zarrelli, #3 Magistrate Consent Form) (B,R)
October 29, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (B,R)
October 29, 2019 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, (B,R)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Allied Debt Collection of Virginia, LLC, Robert W. Jennings, Michael Zarrelli. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9598192.. Filed by Nautica Entertainment, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Assignment for Value of LLC Claims, #2 Exhibit B - Voluntary Petition, #3 Exhibit C - Sale Objection, #4 Exhibit D - Amended Statement of Financial Affairs, #5 Exhibit E - Sale Order, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons Allied Debt Collection, #8 Summons Robert Jennings Summons, #9 Summons Michael Zarrelli Summons) (Levasseur, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nautica Entertainment, LLC v. Allied Debt Collection of Virginia, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W. Jennings
Represented By: Patrick J. Milligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Debt Collection of Virginia, LLC
Represented By: Patrick J. Milligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Zarrelli
Represented By: Patrick J. Milligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nautica Entertainment, LLC
Represented By: Eric B. Levasseur
Represented By: Dennis R. Rose
Represented By: Anna L. Gecht
Represented By: Rocco I. Debitetto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?