Blue v. State of Ohio, et al.
Petitioner: Melvin J. Blue
Respondent: Adult Parole Authority and State of Ohio
Case Number: 1:2019cv02531
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James G Carr
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Petitioner Melvin J. Blue. Related document(s) #3 . (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Envelope)(L,MI)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Petitioner Melvin J. Blue. Related document(s) #1 . (Y,A)
November 4, 2019 Copy of #3 Order, mailed to Melvin J. Blue #27138, 9896 Murry- Ridge Road, Elyria, OH 44055 on 11/4/2019. (D,JJ)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order: Within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, petitioner shall either (1) pay the filing fee of $5.00, or (2) complete and file the application to proceed in forma pauperis attached to this Order. Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 11/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Application to proceed without prepayment of fees and affidavit). (D,JJ)
October 29, 2019 Remark by Clerk: This case was assigned and processed without the filing of the second page of the Civil Cover Sheet, which is required by Local Rule 3.13(a). Copy of #2 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254) and a blank civil cover sheet mailed to Melvin J. Blue at 9896 Murry-Ridge Road, Elyria, OH 44055 on 10/29/19. Related document(s) #2 , #1 . (Y,A)
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (Y,A)
October 29, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (Y,A)
October 29, 2019 Judge James G. Carr assigned to case, (Y,A)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 Petition under 28 USC 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a person in state custody. Filing fee not paid. Filed by Melvin J. Blue. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Y,A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blue v. State of Ohio, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Adult Parole Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Ohio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Melvin J. Blue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?