Dahiwala et al v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: Briteskies LLC and Sagar Pareshkumar Dahiwala
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director CSC Kathy A. Baran, Director Kathy A. Baran and Acting Director Kenneth Cuccinelli
Case Number: 1:2019cv02568
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Christopher A Boyko
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Case Management Conference with telephonic conference to be held on 2/19/20 at 11:00 a.m. before Judge Christopher A. Boyko. This Court requires the participation of lead counsel. Counsel for plaintiff is to set up the call by calling Chambers with all counsel on the line at 216-357-7151 or providing call-in information to all counsel and the Court. Parties shall be available by phone, if needed. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 12/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties Planning Meeting, #2 Magistrate Consent Package)(S,HR)
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service by Certified mail executed upon All Defendants filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons to Cuccinelli, #2 Exhibit B - Summons to Baran, #3 Exhibit C - Summons to USCIS, #4 Exhibit D - Summons to AG Barr, #5 Exhibit E - Summons to USA Clerk ND OH)(Halliday, Brian)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by All Plaintiffs. (Halliday, Brian)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon United States Attorney General, Office of the U.S. Attorney for the Northern District of Ohio, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kathy A. Baran and Kenneth Cuccinelli (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (L,MI)
November 4, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (L,MI)
November 4, 2019 Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case. (L,MI)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint for declaratory and injunctive relief and review of agency action under the administrative procedure act against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9608243. Filed by Briteskies LLC and Sagar Pareshkumar Dahiwala. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons US AG, #3 Summons USA NDOH, #4 Summons USCIS, #5 Summons Baran, #6 Summons Cuccinelli, #7 Exh. A - USCIS Denial) (Halliday, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dahiwala et al v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Briteskies LLC
Represented By: Brian J. Halliday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sagar Pareshkumar Dahiwala
Represented By: Brian J. Halliday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director CSC Kathy A. Baran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Kathy A. Baran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Kenneth Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?