International Medical Education Group, LLC v. Furst
Plaintiff: International Medical Education Group, LLC
Defendant: Lucas Evan Furst
Case Number: 1:2019cv02694
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James S Gwin
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 IMPORTANT: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. Information regarding NextGen can be found # on the court's website.Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a multi-step process. Step one is to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Currently, attorneys within a firm may share a PACER account. This will not be allowed with NextGen. Each attorney must have their own upgraded PACER account. If you are using a shared PACER account, register for a new PACER account by clicking # here.If you have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014, no further action is required at this time. If neither applies, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account. If this is not done, you will be unable to e-file after February 10, 2020. Instructions for linking your PACER account to your CM/ECF account will be sent in February. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6854 or the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI)
January 9, 2020 Filing 10 Reply in support of #3 Motion to remand to State Court filed by International Medical Education Group, LLC. (Hicks, Todd)
December 27, 2019 Filing 9 Opposition to #3 Motion to remand to State Court filed by Lucas Evan Furst. (McIntyre, Robert)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 12/20/2019 granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by Chad F. Clement. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #8 )(S,KM)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 12/20/2019 granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Collin M. Jayne. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #7 )(S,KM)
December 19, 2019 Filing 8 Motion for attorney Chad F. Clement to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 14660119822, filed by Defendant Lucas Evan Furst. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (J,G)
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 Motion for attorney Collin M. Jayne to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 14660119821, filed by Defendant Lucas Evan Furst. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (J,G)
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 Attorney Appearance by Todd C. Hicks Leo Spellacy, Jr. filed by on behalf of International Medical Education Group, LLC. (Hicks, Todd) Modified text on 12/23/2019 (S,SR).
December 10, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Consent Package issued on behalf of Judge James S. Gwin on 12/10/2019. (S,KM)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 12/10/2019 setting a case management conference on 1/28/2020 at 10:00 AM in Chambers 18A. IMPORTANT: The parties are advised to carefully read this Order. The Court requires the attendance of (1) all parties, (2) lead counsel and (3) a representative with full authority for settlement purposes. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1. Parties' Planning Meeting Report, #2 Appendix 2. Local Rule 30.1)(S,KM)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 Motion to remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff International Medical Education Group, LLC. (Smearman, R.)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (J,G)
November 15, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (J,G)
November 15, 2019 Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case. (J,G)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV19923556 Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9631384.. Filed by Lucas Evan Furst. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Complaint, #2 Exhibit B, Answer, #3 Exhibit C, Notice, #4 Exhibit D, Motion to Vacate, #5 Exhibit E, Notice of Appearance, #6 Exhibit F, Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (McIntyre, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Medical Education Group, LLC v. Furst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Medical Education Group, LLC
Represented By: R. Eric Smearman
Represented By: Todd C. Hicks
Represented By: Leo M. Spellacy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucas Evan Furst
Represented By: Benjamin D. Carnahan
Represented By: Robert W. McIntyre
Represented By: Collin M. Jayne
Represented By: Chad F. Clement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?