Ranallo v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Christopher Ranallo
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv02714
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Referring Judge: James R Knepp
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 IMPORTANT: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. Information regarding NextGen can be found # on the court's website.Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a multi-step process. Step one is to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Currently, attorneys within a firm may share a PACER account. This will not be allowed with NextGen. Each attorney must have their own upgraded PACER account. If you are using a shared PACER account, register for a new PACER account by clicking # here.If you have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014, no further action is required at this time. If neither applies, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account. If this is not done, you will be unable to e-file after February 10, 2020. Instructions for linking your PACER account to your CM/ECF account will be sent in February. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6854 or the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI)
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by FedEx Delivery Service executed upon Social Secuirty Administration, Office of Regional Chief Counsel on 11/26/2019 filed on behalf of Christopher Ranallo. Related document(s) #1 , #5 . (M,L)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by FedEx executed upon Commissioner of Social Security through the U.S. Attorney on 11/25/2019 and the U.S. Attorney General on 11/25/2019 filed on behalf of Christopher Ranallo. Related document(s) #5 . (R,Ke) Modified service information on 11/27/2019 (M,L).
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Defendant is granted a maximum of 60 days after the complaint has been served to file an answer and transcript. Within 30 days of the filing of the answer and transcript, Plaintiff shall file its Brief on the Merits. In the event Plaintiff's brief is not filed within 30 days of the answer, case may be subject to dismissal for want of prosecution. Defendant shall file its Brief on the Merits within 30 days thereafter. Plaintiff's Reply Brief, if any, shall be filed within 14 days of filing of Defendant's Brief. Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II on 11/21/2019. (R,Ke)
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 Original Summons issued to U. S. Marshal for service upon Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 USM-285) (R,Ke)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order granting Plaintiff's Motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Related Doc #2 ). Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II on 11/21/2019.(R,Ke)
November 19, 2019 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge John R. Adams on 11/19/2019. (L,MI)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (L,MI)
November 19, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (L,MI)
November 19, 2019 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (L,MI)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Christopher Ranallo. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Appendix Financial statements in support of IFP)(Margolius, Marcia)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Christopher Ranallo. (Attachments: #1 Summons Attorney General, #2 Summons Regional Chief Counsel SSA, #3 Summons US Attorney, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 USM-285 US Attorney, #6 USM-285 Attorney General, #7 USM-285 Regional Chief Counsel SSA) (Margolius, Marcia) .

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ranallo v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Ranallo
Represented By: Marcia W. Margolius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Represented By: Lisa Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?