Scarso Enterprises, Inc. et al v. Honor Yoga Management, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Scarso Enterprises, Inc. and Rinette Scarso
Defendant: BodeTree, LLC, John Doe(s), Maria Parrella-Turco, Honor Yoga Management, LLC and Matthew Ankrum
Case Number: 1:2019cv02927
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James S Gwin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 2/10/2020 setting a case management conference on 4/1/2020 at 09:00 AM at Chambers 18A before Judge James S. Gwin.IMPORTANT: The parties are advised to carefully read this Order. The Court requires the attendance of (1) all parties, (2) lead counsel and (3) a representative with full authority for settlement purposes. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1. Parties' Planning Meeting Report, #2 Appendix 2. Local Rule 30.1)(S,KM)
February 5, 2020 Filing 19 Reply in support of #14 Motion to Stay Action and for Related Relief filed by Honor Yoga Management, LLC. (Hulme, Roy)
February 3, 2020 LAST NOTICE: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. In order to complete our final transition to NextGen, CM/ECF will be offline starting at 12:00 noon on Friday, February 7, 2020, through 11:59 p.m. Sunday, February 9, 2020. Pursuant to General Order 2020-02, we have established an email box, nextgenfilings@ohnd.uscourts.gov, for submitting documents to be filed during this period.Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. Step one was to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your OHND e-filing account in the NextGen CM/ECF system on or after February 10, 2020. # Linking Instructions. You will be unable to e-file until the accounts are linked. If you have any additional questions, please call the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI)
January 29, 2020 Filing 18 Brief in Opposition to Defendants', Honor Yoga Management, LLC's and Maria Parrella-Turco's, Motion to Stay Action and for Related Relief filed by Rinette Scarso, Scarso Enterprises, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Rinette Scarso) (Julian, Maximilian)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 1/28/2020 granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Marshall Todd Kizner for Honor Yoga Management, LLC and Maria Parrella-Turco. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #17 )(S,KM)
January 27, 2020 Filing 17 Motion for attorney Marshall Todd Kizner to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9745670, filed by Honor Yoga Management, LLC, Maria Parrella-Turco. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Marshall Kizner)(Hulme, Roy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/27/2020: #2 Signed Declaration) (B,R).
January 17, 2020 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Honor Yoga Management, LLC. (Hulme, Roy)
January 16, 2020 Filing 15 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Matthew Ankrum, BodeTree, LLC. (Maluchnik, Crystal)
January 16, 2020 Filing 14 Motion to Stay Action and for Related Relief filed by Honor Yoga Management, LLC, Maria Parrella-Turco. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants Motion to Stay the Case, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Maria Parrella-Turco in Support of Motion to Stay Case, #3 Exhibit A - Development Agreement, #4 Exhibit B - Franchise Agreement, #5 Exhibit C - 11-14-2019 Plaintiffs Letter to Honor Yoga's Counsel, #6 Order Staying Action and for Related Relief)(Hulme, Roy)
January 10, 2020 Filing 13 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production of Documents and Requests for Admission Until Such Time as a Scheduling Order is issued by the Court filed by Honor Yoga Management, LLC, Maria Parrella-Turco. Related document(s) #11 . (Hulme, Roy)
January 10, 2020 IMPORTANT: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. Information regarding NextGen can be found # on the court's website.Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a multi-step process. Step one is to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Currently, attorneys within a firm may share a PACER account. This will not be allowed with NextGen. Each attorney must have their own upgraded PACER account. If you are using a shared PACER account, register for a new PACER account by clicking # here.If you have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014, no further action is required at this time. If neither applies, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account. If this is not done, you will be unable to e-file after February 10, 2020. Instructions for linking your PACER account to your CM/ECF account will be sent in February. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6854 or the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI)
January 10, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by All Plaintiffs. (Julian, Maximilian)
January 9, 2020 Filing 11 Motion for extension of time until such time as a Scheduling Order is issued by the Court to Respond to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production of Documents and Requests for Admission filed by Matthew Ankrum, BodeTree, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: January 8, 2020 email communication between Messrs. Royer and Julian)(Royer, Charles)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 1/8/2020 granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Christoper J. Zirke. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Docs #9 , #10 )(S,KM)
January 7, 2020 Filing 10 Motion to Supplement Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher John Zirke filed by Rinette Scarso, Scarso Enterprises, Inc. Related document(s) #9 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Supplemental Affidavit of Christopher John Zirke)(Julian, Maximilian)
January 2, 2020 Filing 9 Motion for attorney Christopher John Zirke to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9702509, filed by Rinette Scarso, Scarso Enterprises, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Affidavit of Christopher John Zirke)(Julian, Maximilian)
December 31, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney Mark Turner and adding attorney Maximilian A. Julian filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Julian, Maximilian)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 12/30/2019 granting defendants Honor Yoga Management, LLC and Maria Parrella-Turco's #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer until 1/16/2020.(S,KM)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] enter by Judge James S. Gwin on 12/30/2019 granting defendants Matthew Ankrum and BodeTree, LLC #5 Motion for Extension of Time until January 16, 2020 to Move, Plead or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint (S,KM)
December 26, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until January 16, 2020 to answer Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Honor Yoga Management, LLC, Maria Parrella-Turco. (Hulme, Roy)
December 24, 2019 Filing 6 Attorney Appearance by Roy A. Hulme filed by on behalf of Honor Yoga Management, LLC, Maria Parrella-Turco. (Hulme, Roy)
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until January 16, 2020 to Move, Plead or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Matthew Ankrum, BodeTree, LLC. (Janik, Steven)
December 23, 2019 Notice to Attorney Christopher J. Zirke. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (B,R)
December 19, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (B,R)
December 19, 2019 Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case, (B,R)
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 Attorney Appearance by Charles P. Royer filed by on behalf of Matthew Ankrum, BodeTree, LLC. (Royer, Charles)
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by BodeTree, LLC. (Janik, Steven)
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Court of Common Pleas, Cuyahoga County, Ohio, case number CV-19-925274 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9686106.. Filed by Matthew Ankrum, BodeTree, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Filings from Court of Common Pleas, Cuyahoga County, Ohio; Case No: CV-19-925274, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Janik, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scarso Enterprises, Inc. et al v. Honor Yoga Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scarso Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Mark M. Turner
Represented By: Christopher J. Zirke
Represented By: Maximilian A. Julian
Represented By: Cathryn R. Ensign
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rinette Scarso
Represented By: Mark M. Turner
Represented By: Christopher J. Zirke
Represented By: Maximilian A. Julian
Represented By: Cathryn R. Ensign
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BodeTree, LLC
Represented By: Charles P. Royer
Represented By: Crystal L. Maluchnik
Represented By: Steven G. Janik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Parrella-Turco
Represented By: Marshall Todd Kizner
Represented By: Roy A. Hulme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honor Yoga Management, LLC
Represented By: Marshall Todd Kizner
Represented By: Roy A. Hulme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Ankrum
Represented By: Charles P. Royer
Represented By: Crystal L. Maluchnik
Represented By: Steven G. Janik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?