Neely v. DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Betty L Neely
Defendant: XYZ Corporation, DePuy Orthopaedics Inc and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 1:2019dp20011
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey J Helmick(MDL2197)
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Filing 12 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Colorado. Case number 1:18-cv-02701. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 7, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado, 18-cv-02791 NRN, to the Northern District of Ohio, to become part of MDL 2197 by Clerk on 2/7/2019. (evana, ) [Transferred from cod on 2/7/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Status by Plaintiff Betty L Neely (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transfer Order)(Orr, Janice) [Transferred from cod on 2/7/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 9 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter: Telephonic Status Conference held on 1/16/2019. FTR: Courtroom C205. (slibi, ) [Transferred from cod on 2/7/2019.]
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 1/15/2019. Scheduling Conference is converted to a Status Conference and is set for 1/16/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (tsher, ) [Transferred from cod on 2/7/2019.]
November 20, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Betty L Neely. DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. waiver sent on 11/20/2018, answer due 1/22/2019; Johnson & Johnson waiver sent on 11/20/2018, answer due 1/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Waiver of Service by DePuy, #2 Affidavit Waiver of Service by Johnson & Johnson)(Orr, Janice) [Transferred from cod on 2/7/2019.]
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER granting #5 Motion to Stay by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 11/8/2018. Status Report due by 1/11/2019. This matter is STAYED. (tsher, ) [Transferred from cod on 2/7/2019.]
November 7, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay by Plaintiff Betty L Neely. (Orr, Janice) [Transferred from cod on 2/7/2019.]
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Non-Consent Form, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 10/24/2018. Consent/Non-Consent Form due on or before 1/2/2019. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 1/16/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (slibi, ) [Transferred from cod on 2/7/2019.]
October 24, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No Summons Issued. (cmadr, ) [Transferred from cod on 2/7/2019.]
October 23, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, ) [Transferred from cod on 2/7/2019.]
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6359092)Attorney Janice C. Orr added to party Betty L Neely(pty:pla), filed by Betty L Neely. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Orr, Janice) [Transferred from cod on 2/7/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neely v. DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Orthopaedics Inc
Represented By: Susan M. Sharko
Represented By: Kristen L. Mayer
Represented By: Zoha Barkeshli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Susan M. Sharko
Represented By: Kristen L. Mayer
Represented By: Zoha Barkeshli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty L Neely
Represented By: Janice C. Orr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?