MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC . v. Medical Device Business Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Codman & Shurtleff, Inc., MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC and SERIES PMPI
Defendant: Medical Device Business Services, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, DePuy Products, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Services 1, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019dp20048
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey J Helmick(MDL2197)
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 21 Reply to response to #16 filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, SERIES PMPI. (Perdomo, Katherine)
July 9, 2019 Filing 20 Opposition to #16 Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by DePuy Products, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Services 1, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Jessica L. Brennan, Esq., #2 Certificate of Service)(Sharko, Susan)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #19 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time until 7/9/19 to File Response o #16 Motion to Remand. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 7/9/19.(P,R)
July 2, 2019 Filing 19 Motion for extension of time until July 9, 2019 to file response/reply to #16 Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand and Incorporated Memorandum In Support filed by DePuy Products, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Services 1, Inc.. Related document(s) #16 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Sharko, Susan)
June 24, 2019 Filing 18 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Florida Southern. Case number 1:19-cv-22198. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 24, 2019 Civil Case Terminated per DE #17 Conditional Transfer Order. Closing Case. (mc) [Transferred from flsd on 6/24/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 17 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-312) transferring case to the Northern District of Ohio re: MDL 2197 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Jeffrey J. Helmick. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (mc) [Transferred from flsd on 6/24/2019.]
June 18, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Remand by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC. (Perdomo, Katherine) [Transferred from flsd on 6/24/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Services 1, Inc., Medical Device Business Services, Inc. (Kruppa, Andrew) [Transferred from flsd on 6/24/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 9 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney, into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Codman & Shurtleff, Inc.. (Kruppa, Andrew) [Transferred from flsd on 6/24/2019.]
June 7, 2019 Filing 13 Defendant's MOTION to Stay Pending MDL Transfer by Johnson & Johnson. Responses due by 6/21/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kruppa, Andrew) [Transferred from flsd on 6/24/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Filing 12 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC identifying Other Affiliate RD Legal Finance, LLC, Other Affiliate MSP Recovery Services, LLC, Other Affiliate VRM MSP Recovery Partners, LLC for MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC (Perdomo, Katherine) [Transferred from flsd on 6/24/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC (Perdomo, Katherine) [Transferred from flsd on 6/24/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Katherine Perdomo on behalf of MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC. Attorney Katherine Perdomo added to party MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC(pty:pla). (Perdomo, Katherine) [Transferred from flsd on 6/24/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 Clerks Notice to Filer re #8 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. < Shurtleff, Inc.
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Depuy Products, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Services 1, Inc., Medical Device Business Services, Inc. (Kruppa, Andrew) [Transferred from flsd on 6/24/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Pure Bill of Discovery by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Services 1, Inc., Medical Device Business Services, Inc.. Responses due by 6/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kruppa, Andrew) [Transferred from flsd on 6/24/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): MSPA Claims 1, LLC. (Kruppa, Andrew) [Transferred from flsd on 6/24/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (vmz) [Transferred from flsd on 6/24/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Alias Not Added. The Filer failed to add the alias information for the party(ies). The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (vmz) [Transferred from flsd on 6/24/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Parties Not Added. The Filer failed to add all parties associated with the case. Filer is instructed to add the additional parties by filing a Notice of Entry of Parties. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (vmz) [Transferred from flsd on 6/24/2019.]
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (vmz) Modified file date on 5/30/2019 (vmz). [Transferred from flsd on 6/24/2019.]
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint for Pure Bill of Discovery) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11685129, filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Services 1, Inc., Medical Device Business Services, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint - Part 1, #3 Exhibit A - Complaint - Part 2, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F - State Court Docs - Part 1, #9 Exhibit F - State Court Docs - Part 2)(Kruppa, Andrew) [Transferred from flsd on 6/24/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC . v. Medical Device Business Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Codman & Shurtleff, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC
Represented By: Katherine Perdomo
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSPA Claims 1, LLC
Represented By: Katherine Perdomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SERIES PMPI
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Represented By: Katherine Perdomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Device Business Services, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Russell Kruppa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Amanda Elizabeth Preston
Represented By: Susan M. Sharko
Represented By: Andrew Russell Kruppa
Represented By: Kristen L. Mayer
Represented By: Zoha Barkeshli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Products, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Russell Kruppa
Represented By: Susan M. Sharko
Represented By: Kristen L. Mayer
Represented By: Zoha Barkeshli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Services 1, Inc.
Represented By: Amanda Elizabeth Preston
Represented By: Susan M. Sharko
Represented By: Andrew Russell Kruppa
Represented By: Kristen L. Mayer
Represented By: Zoha Barkeshli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?