Casper, WY v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Plaintiff: Casper WY
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt PLC, Insys Therapeutics Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Purdue Frederick Company, Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cardinal Health Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Walmart Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. and Walgreen Company
Case Number: 1:2019op45079
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Filing 6 First Amended complaint against All Defendants and adding new party defendant(s) Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd., Richard S. Sackler, Jonathan D. Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Kathe A. Sackler, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Beverly Sackler, Theresa Sackler, David A. Sackler, Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family, Rhodes Technology, Rhodes Technology Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, Inc., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.,,a/k/a Walgreen Co., Walmart Inc., SpecGx LLC, Par Pharmaceutical Inc., Amneal Pharmaceutical, LLC, West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. Filed by Casper WY. (Ochs, Jason)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Wyoming. Case number 1:19-cv-00024. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 Transfering Case to MDL Panel. CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-80) - 18 action(s) re: pldg. (1 in ALM/2:19-cv-00100, 1 in FLS/0:19-cv-60305, 2 in FLS/0:19-cv-60313, 1 in FLS/0:19-cv-60364, 1 in KYE/0:19-cv-00014, 1 in KYE/2:19-cv-00007, 1 in KYE/6:19-cv-00038, 1 in LAE/2:19-cv-01048, 1 in LAE/2:19-cv-01174, 1 in LAW/5:19-cv-00153, 1 in MD/8:19-cv-00336, 3751 in MDL No. 2804, 1 in MIW/1:19-cv-00094, 1 in MT/4:19-cv-00008, 1 in OHS/2:19-cv-00448, 1 in OKW/5:19-cv-00096, 1 in PAM/3:19-cv-00190, 2 in WVS/5:19-cv-00084, 1 in WY/1:19-cv-00024) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 2/21/2019.Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, ALM/2:19-cv-00100, FLS/0:19-cv-60305, FLS/0:19-cv-60313, FLS/0:19-cv-60364, KYE/0:19-cv-00014, KYE/2:19-cv-00007, KYE/6:19-cv-00038, LAE/2:19-cv-01048, LAE/2:19-cv-01174, LAW/5:19-cv-00153, MD/8:19-cv-00336, MIW/1:19-cv-00094, MT/4:19-cv-00008, OHS/2:19-cv-00448, OKW/5:19-cv-00096, PAM/3:19-cv-00190, WVS/5:19-cv-00084, WY/1:19-cv-00024 (Court Staff, stbd) [Transferred from wyd on 2/22/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 (TEXT-ONLY) MINUTE ORDER TO INVOLVED CLERKS - Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-80) Finalized on 2/21/19. Please see pleading (3 in ALM/2:19-cv-00100, 3 in FLS/0:19-cv-60305, 4 in FLS/0:19-cv-60313, 3 in FLS/0:19-cv-60364, 3 in KYE/0:19-cv-00014, 3 in KYE/2:19-cv-00007, 3 in KYE/6:19-cv-00038, 3 in LAE/2:19-cv-01048, 3 in LAE/2:19-cv-01174, 3 in LAW/5:19-cv-00153, 3 in MD/8:19-cv-00336, 3794 in MDL No. 2804, 3 in MIW/1:19-cv-00094, 3 in MT/4:19-cv-00008, 3 in OHS/2:19-cv-00448, 3 in OKW/5:19-cv-00096, 3 in PAM/3:19-cv-00190, 4 in WVS/5:19-cv-00084, 3 in WY/1:19-cv-00024). As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer. The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the N.D. Ohio for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 2/21/2019. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, ALM/2:19-cv-00100, FLS/0:19-cv-60305, FLS/0:19-cv-60313, FLS/0:19-cv-60364, KYE/0:19-cv-00014, KYE/2:19-cv-00007, KYE/6:19-cv-00038, LAE/2:19-cv-01048, LAE/2:19-cv-01174, LAW/5:19-cv-00153, MD/8:19-cv-00336, MIW/1:19-cv-00094, MT/4:19-cv-00008, OHS/2:19-cv-00448, OKW/5:19-cv-00096, PAM/3:19-cv-00190, WVS/5:19-cv-00084, WY/1:19-cv-00024.(Court Staff, stbd) [Transferred from wyd on 2/22/2019.]
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Defendant Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Allergan PLC, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Insys Therapeutics Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc, Walmart Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc filed by Casper WY. (Attachments: #1 Consent) (Court Staff, stbd) [Transferred from wyd on 2/22/2019.]
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400 receipt #CAS002190), filed by Casper WY (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, stbd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/5/2019: #2 Consent) (Court Staff, stbd). [Transferred from wyd on 2/22/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Casper, WY v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casper WY
Represented By: Jason Edward Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?