County of Hardin v. Endo Health Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: County of Hardin
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Endo International plc, Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. and Purdue Pharma Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019op45241
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Filing 16 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Texas Southern. Case number 4:19-cv-00114. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 3, 2019 Interdistrict transfer to Northern District of Ohio. Case transferred electronically. (lgouadi, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 15 JPML TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to Northern District of Ohio to be included in MDL Docket No. 2804. (lgouadi, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #10 Motion for Reconsideration of Order DenyingRemand.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition to #10 MOTION for Reconsideration of #8 Order,, Set/Clear Flags,, filed by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sibiski, Hannah) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER for Expedited Response re: #10 MOTION for Reconsideration of #8 Order. Response to Motion due by 3/18/2019.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]
March 6, 2019 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER re: #10 MOTION for Reconsideration of #8 Order,, Set/Clear Flags,, filed.(Greenstone, David) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Reconsideration of #8 Order,, Set/Clear Flags, by County of Hardin, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/25/2019. (Greenstone, David) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY in Support of #4 MOTION to Remand, filed by County of Hardin. (Greenstone, David) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - Having considered plaintiff County of Hardins #4 motion to remand and all responses, replies, exhibits, and arguments of counsel thereto, the Court hereby DENIES the plaintiffs motion and STAYS the case pending transfer to the Opiate Litigation MDL No. 2804, Doc. 3475....*** STAYED flag set. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Defendants Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to the Plaintiff's Complaint. The deadline for the defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's Complaint is extend until: 60 days after this case is transferred to the Federal MDL or, if the case is remanded, (2) 5 business days after a remand order issues.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition to #4 MOTION to Remand, filed by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10)(Sibiski, Hannah) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Telephone and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Counsel who filed or removed the action is responsible for placing the conference call and insuring that all parties are on the line. The call shall be placed to (713)250-5613. Telephone Conference set for 3/13/2019 at 08:45 AM before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand by County of Hardin, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Continuation Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - County of Hardin Service, #3 Exhibit B - County of Newton Service, #4 Exhibit C - Remand Orders, #5 Exhibit D - Homestead exemption, #6 Exhibit E - Warranty Deed, #7 Exhibit F - Yarger homestead exemption, #8 Exhibit G - Grayson county petition, #9 Exhibit H - Nueces county petition, #10 Exhibit I - El Paso county petition, #11 Exhibit J - Bellwether Orders, #12 Exhibit K - Order Regarding Remands, #13 Proposed Order)(Carter, Amy) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to the Complaint by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A)(Sibiski, Hannah) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. identifying Endo International plc as Corporate Parent, filed.(Sibiski, Hannah) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 152nd Judicial District Court of Harris County, Texas, case number 2019-00865 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21633888) filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sibiski, Hannah) [Transferred from txsd on 4/15/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Hardin v. Endo Health Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Hardin
Represented By: David C. Greenstone
Represented By: Rebecca Walton
Represented By: Amy M. Carter
Represented By: Paul Dunford Henderson
Represented By: David Dies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Hannah DeMarco Sibiski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Noelle M. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceuticals, Inc
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Hannah DeMarco Sibiski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo International plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Represented By: Noelle M. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Noelle M. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?