City of Alexandria v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al.
Plaintiff: City Of Alexandria
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Purdue Pharma L.P., Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt PLC, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., Insys Therapeutics Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Cardinal Health Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Caremark, L.L.C., Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., OptumRX, Inc., Optum, Inc., Caremark Rx, L.L.C., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Barr Laboratories, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, CVS Health Corporation, Express Scripts, Inc., McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated and Does 1 - 100
Case Number: 1:2019op45246
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Filing 66 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Virginia Eastern. Case number 1:18-cv-01536. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 3, 2019 Filing 65 Certified Copy of Transfer Order Entered by The Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (aott) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
April 1, 2019 Case Reassigned to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III. District Judge Claude M. Hilton no longer assigned to the case. (rban, ) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 64 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 1/18/2019, before Judge Claude M. Hilton, NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Transcript prepared by Casamo & Associates, 703-837-0076. Redaction Request due 3/18/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/17/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/16/2019. (rban, ) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Stay and this case is stayed pending a decision of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (see order for details). Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 1/30/19. (klau, ) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
January 30, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE by City of Alexandria re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Additional Authority) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Conrod, Richard) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
January 29, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated re #22 MOTION to Stay by Moving Defendants filed, #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court of Supplemental Authorities (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 57 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Claude M. Hilton: Motion Hearing held on 1/18/2019. Appearance of Counsel. Matter on for: Plaintiff's #6 Motion to Remand; and Defendants' Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., UnitedHealth Group, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., and Optum, Inc's #22 Motion to Stay. Motions argued and taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: Rebecca Monroe w/Casamo & Associates)(tarm) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #54 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 1/17/19. (klau, ) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #53 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 1/17/19. (klau, ) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #52 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 1/17/19. (klau, ) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #51 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 1/16/19. (klau, ) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Roxanne Feliu Rosado on behalf of Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. (Rosado, Roxanne) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 54 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Cory A. Ward and Certification of Local Counsel W. Bradford Stallard Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6442909. by Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.. (Stallard, William) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 53 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Will Sachse and Certification of Local Counsel W. Bradford Stallard Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6442904. by Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.. (Stallard, William) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 52 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Judy Lee Leone and Certification of Local Counsel W. Bradford Stallard Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6442895. by Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.. (Stallard, William) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 51 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by William Jordan and Certification of Local Counsel Turner Broughton Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6442674. by Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Filing 50 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Re: Supplemental Notice of Removal filed by the Purdue Defendants) filed by City of Alexandria. (Conrod, Richard) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 1/8/19. (klau, ) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #35 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 1/8/19. (klau, ) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 1/8/19. (klau, ) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 1/8/19. (klau, ) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #22 MOTION to Stay by Moving Defendants filed, #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Motion Hearing set for 1/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (klau, ) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #38 Motion to Continue, and the hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and on Moving Defendants' Motion to Stay is continued from January 11, 2019, at 10:00 a.m., to January 18, 2019, at 10:00 a.m.. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 1/8/19. (klau, ) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 44 Opposition to #38 MOTION to Continue Hearing by One Week [CORRECTED] filed by City of Alexandria. (Conrod, Richard) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 43 Opposition to #38 MOTION to Continue Hearing by One Week filed by City of Alexandria. (Conrod, Richard) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Filing 42 Rebuttal Brief/Reply Memorandum in Support re #22 MOTION to Stay by Moving Defendants filed filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc.. (Hedblom, Jacqueline) Modified text on 1/8/2019 (klau, ). [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 1/7/19. (klau, ) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 1/7/19. (klau, ) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Filing 39 Memorandum in Support re #38 MOTION to Continue Hearing by One Week by Moving Defendants filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc.. (Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION to Continue Hearing by One Week by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Filing 37 Response to #23 Notice of Removal, [in Support of] filed by Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.. (Massie, Wade) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Wade W. Massie on behalf of Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. (Massie, Wade) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
January 3, 2019 Filing 35 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven G. Kobre and Certification of Local Counsel Jacqueline C. Hedblom Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6429648. by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc.. (Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
January 3, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #22 MOTION to Stay by Moving Defendants filed. Motion Hearing set for 1/11/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (per CMH Chambers) (klau, ) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
January 3, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan David O'Toole on behalf of Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (O'Toole, Brendan) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
January 2, 2019 Filing 33 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew I. Menchel and Certification of Local Counsel Jacqueline C. Hedblom Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6427301. by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc.. (Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
January 2, 2019 Filing 32 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Adriana Riviere-Badell and Certification of Local Counsel Jacqueline C. Hedblom Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6427296. by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc.. (Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
January 2, 2019 Filing 31 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Julian W. Park and Certification of Local Counsel Jacqueline C. Hedblom Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6427270. by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc.. (Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
January 2, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #22 MOTION to Stay by Moving Defendants filed. Motion Hearing set for 1/4/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (klau, ) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
January 1, 2019 Filing 30 Memorandum in Opposition to Supplemental Notice of Removal Filed By Purdue Defendants and in Support of Motion to Remand to #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #23 Notice of Removal, filed by City of Alexandria. (Conrod, Richard) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
January 1, 2019 Filing 29 Rebuttal Brief re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by City of Alexandria. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Conrod, Richard) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
January 1, 2019 Filing 28 Opposition to #22 MOTION to Stay by Moving Defendants filed filed by City of Alexandria. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Conrod, Richard) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
December 28, 2018 Filing 27 Memorandum in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2- Statement of Interest)(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
December 28, 2018 Filing 26 Notice of Hearing Date re #22 MOTION to Stay by Moving Defendants filed (Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
December 28, 2018 Filing 25 Memorandum in Support re #22 MOTION to Stay by Moving Defendants filed filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Order Granting Extension and Briefing Order, #2 Exhibit 2- Conditional Transfer Order, #3 Exhibit 3- Lac Courte Oreilles Opinion, #4 Exhibit 4- Robinson Rancheria Opinion, #5 Exhibit 5- Commonwealth of Kentucky Opinion, #6 Exhibit 6- City of Portland Opinion, #7 Exhibit 7- County of San Mateo Opinion, #8 Exhibit 8- Combined Orders Granting Stays, #9 Exhibit 9- Noble County Opinion, #10 Exhibit 10- Jefferson County Opinion, #11 Exhibit 11- Proposed Order)(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
December 28, 2018 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc.. (Stallard, William) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
December 28, 2018 Filing 23 Supplemental Notice of Removal re: [1} Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6425042.), filed by The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Complaint)(Stallard, William) Modified on 1/2/2019 to add linkage(klau, ). [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
December 28, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION to Stay by Moving Defendants filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc.. (Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
December 28, 2018 Filing 21 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian David Boone and Certification of Local Counsel Turner A. Broughton Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6424426. by Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
December 28, 2018 Filing 20 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kimberly Kisabeth Chemerinsky and Certification of Local Counsel Turner A. Broughton Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6424240. by Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. ORDERED that the motion for an enlargement of time to respond to plaintiff's motion to remand to state court is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 12/21/2018. (wgar, ) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 18 Memorandum in Support re #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc.. (Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc.. (Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 16 Memorandum in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Notice of Tag-Along, #2 Exhibit B- Conditional Transfer Order, #3 Exhibit C- JPML Rules)(Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Motion Hearing set for 1/11/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (Per CMH chambers) (clar, ) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
December 19, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Motion Hearing set for 1/4/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (clar, ) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
December 18, 2018 Filing 15 Memorandum in Support re #14 MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand filed by City of Alexandria. (Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
December 18, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand by City of Alexandria. (Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
December 18, 2018 Filing 13 Notice of Hearing Date re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
December 17, 2018 Notice of Correction re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court , The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (klau, ) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
December 14, 2018 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Scripts Holding Company. (Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
December 14, 2018 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Scripts, Inc.. (Hedblom, Jacqueline) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
December 14, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Tallent Rogers on behalf of City of Alexandria (Rogers, Lauren) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
December 14, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Hugh O'Donnell on behalf of City of Alexandria (O'Donnell, Patrick) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
December 14, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by William Edgar Spivey on behalf of City of Alexandria (Spivey, William) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
December 14, 2018 Filing 7 Memorandum in Support re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by City of Alexandria. (Conrod, Richard) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
December 14, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by City of Alexandria. (Conrod, Richard) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
December 14, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Johan Conrod, Jr on behalf of City of Alexandria,(Conrod, Richard) Modified on 12/17/2018 to correct party filer (klau, ). [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
December 13, 2018 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (klau, ) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OptumRX, Inc.. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Optum, Inc.. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6404288.), filed by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. (NO ANSWER FILED) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit 1, #8 Exhibit 2)(Broughton, Turner) Modified on 12/13/2018 to add party filer(klau, ). [Transferred from vaed on 4/15/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Alexandria v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Holding Company
Represented By: Roxanne Feliu Rosado
Represented By: Jacqueline Cook Hedblom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: William Bradford Stallard
Represented By: Wade W. Massie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
Represented By: William Bradford Stallard
Represented By: Wade W. Massie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Represented By: William Bradford Stallard
Represented By: Wade W. Massie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumRX, Inc.
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Represented By: Brendan David O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum, Inc.
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Represented By: Brendan David O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark Rx, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barr Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts, Inc.
Represented By: Roxanne Feliu Rosado
Represented By: Jacqueline Cook Hedblom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Represented By: Brendan David O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 - 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City Of Alexandria
Represented By: Patrick Hugh O'Donnell
Represented By: Richard Johan Conrod, Jr.
Represented By: Grant Edward Morris
Represented By: William Edgar Spivey
Represented By: Lauren Tallent Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?