Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc., Beverly Sackler, Richard S. Sackler, Purdue Pharma L.P., CVS RX Services, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mylan Institutional, Inc., Insys Therapeutics Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Walmart Inc., McKesson Specialty Distribution, LLC, Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Cardinal Health Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Theresa Sackler, Mallinckrodt Enterprises Holdings, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Associated Pharmacies Inc, Keysource Medical, Inc., David A. Sackler, Rite Aid of New York, Inc., Stuart D. Baker, Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., H.D. Smith LLC, CVS TN Distribution Center, LLC, Pennsylvania CVS Pharmacy, LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., McKesson Corporation, Wal-Mart Stores East L.P., Walgreen Eastern Co. Inc., Rhodes Technologies Inc., Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Allergan Finance LLC, Masters Pharmaceutical, Inc., CVS Indiana L.L.C., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Qualitest Pharmaceuticals, Endo Generics Holding, Inc., Indivior Inc., Allergan U.S.A., Inc., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Par Pharmaceutical Inc., Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC, Kathe A. Sackler, Rite Aid of Maryland, West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., McKesson Specialty Care Distribution Corporation, SpecGX LLC, Walgreen Co., Jonathan D. Sackler, McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., John Doe, John Does, or John Doe Corporation, Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family, DEPOMED, INC., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Purdue Pharma Inc., Sandoz Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P. and Anda Inc
Case Number: 1:2019op45325
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 65 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC waiver sent on 5/19/2019, answer due 7/18/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
July 1, 2019 Filing 64 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC waiver sent on 5/19/2019, answer due 7/18/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
July 1, 2019 Filing 63 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. waiver sent on 5/19/2019, answer due 7/18/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
July 1, 2019 Filing 62 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. waiver sent on 5/19/2019, answer due 7/18/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
June 30, 2019 Filing 61 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. Walgreen Co. waiver sent on 5/19/2019, answer due 7/18/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
June 30, 2019 Filing 60 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. Walgreen Eastern Co. Inc. waiver sent on 5/19/2019, answer due 7/18/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
June 26, 2019 Filing 59 Stipulated Service Acknowledged by Sackler Defendants & Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family on 6/25/19 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
June 23, 2019 Filing 58 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. Associated Pharmacies Inc waiver sent on 5/17/2019, answer due 7/16/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
June 23, 2019 Filing 57 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 5/19/2019, answer due 7/18/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
June 23, 2019 Filing 56 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. Anda Inc waiver sent on 5/19/2019, answer due 7/18/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
June 23, 2019 Filing 55 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 5/19/2019, answer due 7/18/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
June 23, 2019 Filing 54 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. Mylan Institutional, Inc. waiver sent on 5/19/2019, answer due 7/18/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
June 23, 2019 Filing 53 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. CVS Indiana L.L.C. waiver sent on 6/14/2019, answer due 8/13/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
June 23, 2019 Filing 52 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. CVS Pharmacy Inc. waiver sent on 6/14/2019, answer due 8/13/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
June 23, 2019 Filing 51 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. CVS RX Services, Inc. waiver sent on 6/14/2019, answer due 8/13/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
June 23, 2019 Filing 50 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. CVS TN Distribution Center, LLC waiver sent on 6/14/2019, answer due 8/13/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
June 23, 2019 Filing 49 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. Pennsylvania CVS Pharmacy, LLC waiver sent on 6/14/2019, answer due 8/13/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
June 23, 2019 Filing 48 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. Rite Aid of Maryland waiver sent on 5/19/2019, answer due 7/18/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
June 23, 2019 Filing 47 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc. waiver sent on 5/17/2019, answer due 7/16/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
June 23, 2019 Filing 46 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. Par Pharmaceutical Inc. waiver sent on 5/17/2019, answer due 7/16/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
June 23, 2019 Filing 45 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. Endo Health Solutions Inc. waiver sent on 5/17/2019, answer due 7/16/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
June 23, 2019 Filing 44 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 5/17/2019, answer due 7/16/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
June 23, 2019 Filing 43 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC waiver sent on 5/17/2019, answer due 7/16/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
June 23, 2019 Filing 42 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. Mallinckrodt LLC waiver sent on 5/17/2019, answer due 7/16/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
June 23, 2019 Filing 41 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. SpecGX LLC waiver sent on 5/17/2019, answer due 7/16/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
June 23, 2019 Filing 40 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc waiver sent on 5/17/2019, answer due 7/16/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
June 23, 2019 Filing 39 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. Mallinckrodt Enterprises Holdings, Inc. waiver sent on 5/17/2019, answer due 7/16/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
June 9, 2019 Filing 38 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. Purdue Pharma L.P. waiver sent on 5/17/2019, answer due 7/16/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
June 9, 2019 Filing 37 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. Purdue Pharma Inc. waiver sent on 5/17/2019, answer due 7/16/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
June 9, 2019 Filing 36 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. waiver sent on 5/17/2019, answer due 7/16/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
June 9, 2019 Filing 35 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. The P.F. Laboratories, Inc. waiver sent on 5/17/2019, answer due 7/16/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
June 9, 2019 Filing 34 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc. waiver sent on 5/19/2019, answer due 7/18/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
June 9, 2019 Filing 33 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. McKesson Corporation waiver sent on 5/19/2019, answer due 7/18/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
June 9, 2019 Filing 32 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. McKesson Specialty Care Distribution Corporation waiver sent on 5/19/2019, answer due 7/18/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
June 9, 2019 Filing 31 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. McKesson Specialty Distribution, LLC waiver sent on 5/19/2019, answer due 7/18/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
June 2, 2019 Filing 30 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation waiver sent on 5/19/2019, answer due 7/18/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
June 2, 2019 Filing 29 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. Keysource Medical, Inc. waiver sent on 5/19/2019, answer due 7/18/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
June 2, 2019 Filing 28 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. H.D. Smith LLC waiver sent on 5/19/2019, answer due 7/18/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
June 2, 2019 Filing 27 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. Cardinal Health 110, LLC waiver sent on 5/19/2019, answer due 7/18/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
June 2, 2019 Filing 26 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. Cardinal Health Inc. waiver sent on 5/17/2019, answer due 7/16/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
June 2, 2019 Filing 25 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. Allergan Finance LLC waiver sent on 5/17/2019, answer due 7/16/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
June 2, 2019 Filing 24 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. Allergan PLC waiver sent on 5/17/2019, answer due 7/16/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
June 2, 2019 Filing 23 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. Allergan U.S.A., Inc. waiver sent on 5/17/2019, answer due 7/16/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
May 24, 2019 Filing 22 Stipulated Service Acknowledged by Defendant Stuart D. Baker on 5/23/19 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
May 24, 2019 Filing 21 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. Actavis Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 5/17/2019, answer due 7/16/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
May 24, 2019 Filing 20 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. Actavis LLC waiver sent on 5/17/2019, answer due 7/16/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
May 24, 2019 Filing 19 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. Watson Laboratories Inc. waiver sent on 5/17/2019, answer due 7/16/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
May 24, 2019 Filing 18 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 5/17/2019, answer due 7/16/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
May 24, 2019 Filing 17 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. Cephalon Inc. waiver sent on 5/17/2019, answer due 7/16/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
May 24, 2019 Filing 16 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 5/17/2019, answer due 7/16/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
May 24, 2019 Filing 15 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P. waiver sent on 5/17/2019, answer due 7/16/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
May 24, 2019 Filing 14 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
May 24, 2019 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. Rhodes Technologies Inc. waiver sent on 5/17/2019, answer due 7/16/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
May 24, 2019 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. Theresa Sackler waiver sent on 5/17/2019, answer due 7/16/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. Ilene Sackler Lefcourt waiver sent on 5/17/2019, answer due 7/16/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. Kathe A. Sackler waiver sent on 5/17/2019, answer due 7/16/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. Mortimer D.A. Sackler waiver sent on 5/17/2019, answer due 7/16/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. DEPOMED, INC. waiver sent on 5/21/2019, answer due 7/22/2019 filed on behalf of Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania (Pearlman, Eva)
May 14, 2019 Filing 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Pennsylvania Middle. Case number 3:19-cv-00698. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-91) TRANSFERRING CASE to Northern District of Ohio MDL-2804 (ao) [Transferred from pamd on 5/14/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 Letter dated May 10, 2019 from Clerk's Office to MDL Panel referring case for consideration; enclosing docket sheet and copy of complaint; (ep) [Transferred from pamd on 5/14/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 (copy) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-91) MDL No. 2804 (ao) [Transferred from pamd on 5/14/2019.]
April 26, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. You are directed to file a written report within 30 days as to whether service has been effected or a waiver of service obtained. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 4/26/19. (jam) [Transferred from pamd on 5/14/2019.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ao) [Transferred from pamd on 5/14/2019.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4741242), filed by Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ao) [Transferred from pamd on 5/14/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS RX Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Institutional, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Specialty Distribution, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Enterprises Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Pharmacies Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keysource Medical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of New York, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart D. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS TN Distribution Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennsylvania CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technologies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Masters Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Indiana L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qualitest Pharmaceuticals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Generics Holding, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indivior Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 110, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Specialty Care Distribution Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan D. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, John Does, or John Doe Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPOMED, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilkes-Barre Township, Pennsylvania
Represented By: Bruce J. Phillips
Represented By: Louis T. Brindisi
Represented By: John Petrone
Represented By: Eva Brindisi Pearlman
Represented By: John C. Cherundolo
Represented By: Robert F. Julian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?