Lovelace Health Systems, Inc. v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Lovelace Health Systems, Inc.
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, McKesson Corporation, Anda, Inc., Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Henry Schein, Inc., Watson Pharmaceutcals, Inc., Allergan PLC, Miami-Luken, Inc., PURDUE PHARMA, L.P., NORAMCO, INC.,, DepoMed Inc, THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTCIALS USA, INC., H.D. Smith LLC, Cephalon, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Cardinal Health Inc., WATSON LABORATORIES, INC.,, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICIA, INC., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.,, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., SpecGX LLC, ACTAVIS LLC,, ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.,, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. and MALLINCKRODT PLC,
Case Number: 1:2019op45458
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 21 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lovelace Health Systems, Inc.. SpecGX LLC waiver sent on 6/24/2019, answer due 8/23/2019 filed on behalf of Lovelace Health Systems, Inc. (Curry, Lauren)
July 24, 2019 Filing 20 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lovelace Health Systems, Inc.. MALLINCKRODT PLC, waiver sent on 6/24/2019, answer due 8/23/2019 filed on behalf of Lovelace Health Systems, Inc. (Curry, Lauren)
July 24, 2019 Filing 19 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lovelace Health Systems, Inc.. Mallinckrodt LLC waiver sent on 6/24/2019, answer due 8/23/2019 filed on behalf of Lovelace Health Systems, Inc. (Curry, Lauren)
July 24, 2019 Filing 18 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lovelace Health Systems, Inc.. Henry Schein, Inc. waiver sent on 6/24/2019, answer due 8/23/2019 filed on behalf of Lovelace Health Systems, Inc. (Curry, Lauren)
July 24, 2019 Filing 17 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lovelace Health Systems, Inc.. H.D. Smith LLC waiver sent on 6/24/2019, answer due 8/23/2019 filed on behalf of Lovelace Health Systems, Inc. (Curry, Lauren)
July 24, 2019 Filing 16 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lovelace Health Systems, Inc.. ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., waiver sent on 6/24/2019, answer due 8/23/2019 filed on behalf of Lovelace Health Systems, Inc. (Curry, Lauren)
July 24, 2019 Filing 15 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lovelace Health Systems, Inc.. ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC., waiver sent on 6/24/2019, answer due 8/23/2019 filed on behalf of Lovelace Health Systems, Inc. (Curry, Lauren)
July 24, 2019 Filing 14 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lovelace Health Systems, Inc.. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation waiver sent on 6/24/2019, answer due 8/23/2019 filed on behalf of Lovelace Health Systems, Inc. (Curry, Lauren)
July 24, 2019 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lovelace Health Systems, Inc.. Allergan PLC waiver sent on 6/24/2019, answer due 8/23/2019 filed on behalf of Lovelace Health Systems, Inc. (Curry, Lauren)
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lovelace Health Systems, Inc.. WATSON LABORATORIES, INC., waiver sent on 6/24/2019, answer due 8/23/2019 filed on behalf of Lovelace Health Systems, Inc. (Curry, Lauren)
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lovelace Health Systems, Inc.. TEVA PHARMACEUTCIALS USA, INC. waiver sent on 6/24/2019, answer due 8/23/2019 filed on behalf of Lovelace Health Systems, Inc. (Curry, Lauren)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lovelace Health Systems, Inc.. PURDUE PHARMA, L.P. waiver sent on 6/24/2019, answer due 8/23/2019 filed on behalf of Lovelace Health Systems, Inc. (Curry, Lauren)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lovelace Health Systems, Inc.. Purdue Pharma Inc waiver sent on 6/24/2019, answer due 8/23/2019 filed on behalf of Lovelace Health Systems, Inc. (Curry, Lauren)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lovelace Health Systems, Inc.. Cephalon, Inc. waiver sent on 6/24/2019, answer due 8/23/2019 filed on behalf of Lovelace Health Systems, Inc. (Curry, Lauren)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lovelace Health Systems, Inc.. Cardinal Health Inc. waiver sent on 6/24/2019, answer due 8/23/2019 filed on behalf of Lovelace Health Systems, Inc. (Curry, Lauren)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lovelace Health Systems, Inc.. Anda, Inc. waiver sent on 6/24/2019, answer due 8/23/2019 filed on behalf of Lovelace Health Systems, Inc. (Curry, Lauren)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lovelace Health Systems, Inc.. ACTAVIS LLC, waiver sent on 6/24/2019, answer due 8/23/2019 filed on behalf of Lovelace Health Systems, Inc. (Curry, Lauren)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lovelace Health Systems, Inc.. Actavis Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 6/24/2019, answer due 8/23/2019 filed on behalf of Lovelace Health Systems, Inc. (Curry, Lauren)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lovelace Health Systems, Inc.. THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC. waiver sent on 6/24/2019, answer due 8/23/2019 filed on behalf of Lovelace Health Systems, Inc. (Curry, Lauren)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by All Plaintiffs. (Curry, Lauren)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9364790.. Filed by Lovelace Health Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Curry, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lovelace Health Systems, Inc. v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceutcals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami-Luken, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PURDUE PHARMA, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORAMCO, INC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DepoMed Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTCIALS USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WATSON LABORATORIES, INC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICIA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS LLC,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MALLINCKRODT PLC,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lovelace Health Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Lauren Z. Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?