City of Guthrie v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Plaintiff: City of Guthrie
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., MD William Valuck, Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., The Harvard Drug Group, L.L.C., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Physicians Total Care Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc., Watson Pharmaceutcals, Inc., Actavis plc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Keysource Medical, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Russell Portenoy, Actavis LLC, Allergan PLC, Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Perry Fine, Amerisourcebergen Corp., Cardinal Health Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Harvey Jenkins, Anda Inc, McKesson Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd., GCP Pharma LLC, Watson Pharma, Inc., Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Morris & Dickson Co LLC, Purdue Pharma Inc. and Lynn Webster
Case Number: 1:2019op45497
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 58 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Oklahoma Western. Case number 5:19-cv-00158. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 14, 2019 Filing 57 TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to District of Ohio Northern for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Dan A Polster. Signed by Clerk of the Panel. (ac) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
May 23, 2019 NOTICE from the Court re #56 Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority. Counsel for plaintiff is DIRECTED, in future filings, to comply with the court's ECF Policies & Procedures Manual, Section II.A.4.a. - "Exhibits... shall be clearly labeled with the appropriate exhibit number.... Do not use alphabetical or alpha-numeric designations for exhibits...." Failure to comply in the future may result in filings being stricken.(llg) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
May 22, 2019 Filing 56 SUPPLEMENT Authority by Guthrie City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memorandum and Order re remand)(Sill, Matthew) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
May 17, 2019 Filing 55 RESPONSE to Motion re #54 MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand (Opposition filed by all Moving Defendants) filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-List of Cases)(Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
May 15, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand by Guthrie City of. (Sill, Matthew) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE (other) by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc re #37 Response in Opposition to Motion (Notice of Supplemental Authority) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Seminole Co Stay Order)(Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #51 Endo Health Solutions Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority. Dfts are DIRECTED to file, within 7 business days, a notice, which attaches the supplemental authority referred to in their motion. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 5/1/2019. (llg) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
April 8, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Memorandum and Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - April 4 JPML Transfer Order)(Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 50 REPLY to Response to Motion re #27 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Amerisourcebergen Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 49 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by The Purdue Frederick Company Inc . (Lamirand, Jennifer) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 48 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Purdue Pharma Inc . (Lamirand, Jennifer) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 47 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Purdue Pharma LP . (Lamirand, Jennifer) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 46 ENTRY of Appearance by Jennifer N Lamirand on behalf of Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc (Lamirand, Jennifer) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 45 ENTRY of Appearance by Joshua D Burns on behalf of Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc (Burns, Joshua) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 44 REPLY by Plaintiff Guthrie City of re #20 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Guthrie City of. (Court, Todd) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #42 Defendant, The Harvard Drug Group, LLC's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 3/18/2019. (llg) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 42 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by The Harvard Drug Group LLC. (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 41 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by The Harvard Drug Group LLC . (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 40 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of The Harvard Drug Group LLC (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 39 RESPONSE to Motion re #27 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Guthrie City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Order Regarding Remands [#130], #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Case Management Order [#232])(Court, Todd) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - CTO-82, #2 Exhibit 2 - Statement of Interest of US, #3 Exhibit 3 - Withdrawal of Order)(Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. The Manufacturer Dfts shall file their answer or other responsive pldg to plf's Complaint 60 days after the later of an entry of: 1) A decision by the JPML granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action, or 2) this court's ruling on any motion to remand this action to Logan County District Court, Okla. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 3/8/2019. (llg) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 35 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to file Responsive Pleadings by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil- Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Ridgeway, Michael) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 34 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil- Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Ridgeway, Michael) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 33 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael W Ridgeway on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil- Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc (Ridgeway, Michael) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 32 ENTRY of Appearance by John H Sparks on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil- Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc (Sparks, John) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
March 6, 2019 Filing 31 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Amerisourcebergen Corp Amended. (Huntsman, Susan) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #28 McKesson Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc and AmerisourceBergen Corporation's Unopposed Joint Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 2/27/2019. (llg) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Filing 29 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Curran, Jeffrey) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
February 26, 2019 Filing 28 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by Amerisourcebergen Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart) Modified on 2/27/2019 (llg). [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Filing 27 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by Amerisourcebergen Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - CTO, #2 Exhibit 2 - Wis. Stay Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Cal. Stay Order, #4 Exhibit 4 - Ky. Stay Order, #5 Exhibit 5 - 6 Cty. Transfer Order, #6 Exhibit 6 - Cherokee Nation Transfer Order, #7 Exhibit 7 - Delaware OK Stay Order, #8 Exhibit 8 - Pawnee OK Stay Order, #9 Exhibit 9 - Osage OK Stay Order, #10 Exhibit 10 - Portland ME Stay Order, #11 Exhibit 11 - EDVA Stay Order, #12 Exhibit 12 - WDVA Stay Order, #13 Exhibit 13 - Cal. Stay Order 2, #14 Exhibit 14 - Ill. Stay Order 1, #15 Exhibit 15 - Fla. Deferral Order, #16 Exhibit 16 - Ariz. Partial Stay Order)(Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #22 Anda Defendants' Unopposed Joint Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 2/25/2019. (llg) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #11 Defendant Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 2/25/2019. (llg) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying #21 City of Guthrie's Motion for Expedited Briefing. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 2/25/2019. (llg) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Expedite Briefing filed by Amerisourcebergen Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 22 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-State Court Motion for Enlargement of Time)(Curran, Jeffrey) Modified on 2/25/2019 (llg). [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Expedite Briefing by Guthrie City of. (Court, Todd) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Guthrie City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order - Trotter v. Smith et al., #2 Exhibit 2 - Order - Adams v. Wyeth)(Court, Todd) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
February 21, 2019 SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Logan County, case number CJ-19-8 filed by McKesson Corp. (SEE DOC. NO. 19 FOR IMAGE.)(llg) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE (other) by McKesson Corp Supplemental Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Docket, #2 Exhibit Petition, #3 Exhibit Summonses, #4 Exhibit Denial, #5 Exhibit Entry, #6 Exhibit Entry, #7 Exhibit Motion, #8 Exhibit Order, #9 Exhibit Entry, #10 Exhibit Entry, #11 Exhibit Motion, #12 Exhibit Entry, #13 Exhibit Motion, #14 Exhibit Motion, #15 Exhibit Order, #16 Exhibit Order, #17 Exhibit Authorities)(Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey A Curran on behalf of Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc (Curran, Jeffrey) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc . (Merkley, Nicholas) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas V Merkley on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc (Merkley, Nicholas) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Ashley E Quinn on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc (Quinn, Ashley) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Kaylee P Davis-Maddy on behalf of McKesson Corp (Davis-Maddy, Kaylee) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by McKesson Corp . (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Stuart D Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corp (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Filing 11 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,, by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Riddles, D) Modified on 2/25/2019 (llg). [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Raymond E Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Riddles, D) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by D Todd Riddles on behalf of Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc (Riddles, D) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Amerisourcebergen Corp . (Huntsman, Susan) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Susan E Huntsman on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Corp (Huntsman, Susan) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by D Michael McBride, III on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Corp (McBride, D) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Cardinal Health Inc . (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health Inc (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
February 20, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2867345. (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Logan County, case number CJ-19-8 filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - JPML Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Service Packet, #3 Exhibit 3 - Petition, #4 Exhibit 4 - Summons to Purdue Pharma L.P, #5 Exhibit 5 - Summons to Purdue Pharma Inc, #6 Exhibit 6 - Summons to The Purdue Frederick Company, #7 Exhibit 7 - Summons to Cephalon, Inc, #8 Exhibit 8 - Summons to Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd, #9 Exhibit 9 - Summons to Teva Pharmaceutials USA, Inc, #10 Exhibit 10 - Summons to Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc, #11 Exhibit 11 - Summons to Johnson & Johnson, #12 Exhibit 12 - Summons to Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc, #13 Exhibit 13 - Summons to Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc, #14 Exhibit 14 - Summons to Endo Health Solutions Inc, #15 Exhibit 15 - Summons to Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, #16 Exhibit 16 - Summons to Allergan PLC, #17 Exhibit 17 - Summons to Actavis PLC, #18 Exhibit 18 - Summons to Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc, #19 Exhibit 19 - Summons to Watson Laboratories, Inc, #20 Exhibit 20 - Summons to Actavis Pharma, Inc, #21 Exhibit 21 - Summons to Watson Pharma, Inc, #22 Exhibit 22 - Summons to Actavis LLC, #23 Exhibit 23 - Summons to Mallinckrodt PLC, #24 Exhibit 24 - Summons to Mallinckrodt LLC, #25 Exhibit 25 - Summons to Insys Therapeutic, Inc, #26 Exhibit 26 - Summons to McKesson Corp, #27 Exhibit 27 - Summons to Cardinal Health, Inc, #28 Exhibit 28 - Summons to AmerisourceBergen Corp, #29 Exhibit 29 - Summons to Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc, #30 Exhibit 30 - Summons to Anda, Inc, #31 Exhibit 31 - Summons to GCP Pharma, LLC, #32 Exhibit 32 - Summons to Keysource Medical, Inc, #33 Exhibit 33 - Summons to Morris & Dickson Co, LLC, #34 Exhibit 34 - Summons to Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc, #35 Exhibit 35 - Summons to The Harvard Drug Group, LLC, #36 Exhibit 36 - Summons to Physicians Total Care, Inc, #37 Exhibit 37 - Summons to William Valuck, M.D., #38 Exhibit 38 - Summons to Harvey Jenkins, M.D, #39 Exhibit 39 - Summons to Russell Portenoy, M.D., #40 Exhibit 40 - Summons to Perry Fine, M.D, #41 Exhibit 41 - Summons to Lynn Webster, M.D, #42 Exhibit 42 - Denial of Allegations by William Valuck DO, #43 Exhibit 43 - EOA Ryan Ray for Cardinal Health Inc, #44 Exhibit 44 - EOA McBride and Huntsman for AmerisourceBergen Corp, #45 Exhibit 45 - Motion for Ext of Time by McKesson, Cardinal Health and AmerisourceBergen, #46 Exhibit 46 - Order granting mtn for ext of time, #47 Exhibit 47 - EOA Campbell and Davis-Maddy for McKesson, #48 Exhibit 48 - EOA Sparks and Ridgeway for Johnson & Johnson, Janssen defendants, #49 Exhibit 49 - Motion for Ext of Time by Manufacturer Defendants, #50 Exhibit 50 - EOA Riddles for Quest Pharmaceuticals, #51 Exhibit 51 - Motion for ext of time by Quest Pharmaceuticals, #52 Exhibit 52 - Motion for Ext of Time by Anda, #53 Exhibit 53 - Order granting ext of time, #54 Exhibit 54 - Order granting motion for ext of time, #55 Exhibit 55 - State Court Docket Sheet, #56 Civil Cover Sheet)(rb) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Guthrie v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By: Michael W. Ridgeway
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD William Valuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Jennifer N. Lamirand
Represented By: Joshua D. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer N. Lamirand
Represented By: Joshua D. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Harvard Drug Group, L.L.C.
Represented By: Ryan A. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physicians Total Care Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas V. Merkley
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceutcals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas V. Merkley
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keysource Medical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Michael W. Ridgeway
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Raymond E. Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Portenoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Nicholas V. Merkley
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: D. Todd Riddles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas V. Merkley
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas V. Merkley
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Fine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Corp.
Represented By: D. Michael McBride, III
Represented By: Susan E. Huntsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: Ryan A. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Raymond E. Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Michael W. Ridgeway
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvey Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corp.
Represented By: Kaylee Davis-Maddy
Represented By: Stuart D. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCP Pharma LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Michael W. Ridgeway
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer N. Lamirand
Represented By: Joshua D. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Guthrie
Represented By: Harrison C. Lujan
Represented By: Todd A. Court
Represented By: Matthew J. Sill
Represented By: Tony G. Puckett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?