Riverton WY v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Plaintiff: Riverton WY
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Insys Therapeutics Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Purdue Frederick Company, Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cardinal Health Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Walgreen Company, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Walmart Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. and Purdue Pharma Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019op45558
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Wyoming. Case number 1:19-cv-00109. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 Transfering Case to MDL Panel. CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-96) - 15 action(s) re: pldg. (1 in MA/1:19-cv-11206, 4582 in MDL No. 2804, 1 in MIW/1:19-cv-00438, 1 in MIW/1:19-cv-00439, 1 in MN/0:19-cv-01483, 1 in MSN/1:19-cv-00106, 1 in MSN/3:19-cv-00115, 1 in MSN/4:19-cv-00086, 1 in MSS/1:19-cv-00304, 1 in NCE/7:19-cv-00104, 1 in NCW/1:19-cv-00176, 1 in NE/8:19-cv-00244, 1 in PAM/4:19-cv-00945, 1 in RI/1:19-cv-00315, 1 in VAE/3:19-cv-00404, 2 in WY/1:19-cv-00109) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 6/20/2019. (Court Staff, ssw) [Transferred from wyd on 6/21/2019.]
June 20, 2019 (TEXT ONLY) MINUTE ORDER - TO INVOLVED CLERKS - Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-96) Finalized on 6/20/19. Please see pleading (5 in MA/1:19-cv-11206, 4683 in MDL No. 2804, 5 in MIW/1:19-cv-00438, 5 in MIW/1:19-cv-00439, 5 in MN/0:19-cv-01483, 5 in MSN/1:19-cv-00106, 5 in MSN/3:19-cv-00115, 5 in MSN/4:19-cv-00086, 5 in MSS/1:19-cv-00304, 5 in NCE/7:19-cv-00104, 5 in NCW/1:19-cv-00176, 5 in NE/8:19-cv-00244, 5 in PAM/4:19-cv-00945, 5 in RI/1:19-cv-00315, 5 in VAE/3:19-cv-00404, 6 in WY/1:19-cv-00109). As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer. The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the N.D. OHIO for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 6/20/2019. (Court Staff, ssw) [Transferred from wyd on 6/21/2019.]
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REINSTATING CTO-96 (re: pldg. (1 in MA/1:19-cv-11206, 4582 in MDL No. 2804, 1 in MIE/2:19-cv-11681, 1 in MIE/2:19-cv-11685, 1 in MIE/2:19-cv-11687, 1 in MIW/1:19-cv-00438, 1 in MIW/1:19-cv-00439, 1 in MN/0:19-cv-01483, 1 in MSN/1:19-cv-00106, 1 in MSN/3:19-cv-00115, 1 in MSN/4:19-cv-00086, 1 in MSS/1:19-cv-00304, 1 in NCE/7:19-cv-00104, 1 in NCW/1:19-cv-00176, 1 in NE/8:19-cv-00244, 1 in PAM/4:19-cv-00945, 1 in RI/1:19-cv-00315, 1 in VAE/3:19-cv-00404, 2 in WY/1:19-cv-00109) ) The stay of the Panel's conditional transfer order designated as CTO-96 filed on 6/12/19 is REINSTATED. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 6/19/2019. (Court Staff, ssw) [Transferred from wyd on 6/21/2019.]
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 (TEXT ONLY) MINUTE ORDER - TO INVOLVED CLERKS - Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-96) Finalized on 6/19/19. Please see pleading (3 in MA/1:19-cv-11206, 4676 in MDL No. 2804, 3 in MIE/2:19-cv-11681, 3 in MIE/2:19-cv-11685, 3 in MIE/2:19-cv-11687, 3 in MIW/1:19-cv-00438, 3 in MIW/1:19-cv-00439, 3 in MN/0:19-cv-01483, 3 in MSN/1:19-cv-00106, 3 in MSN/3:19-cv-00115, 3 in MSN/4:19-cv-00086, 3 in MSS/1:19-cv-00304, 3 in NCE/7:19-cv-00104, 3 in NCW/1:19-cv-00176, 3 in NE/8:19-cv-00244, 3 in PAM/4:19-cv-00945, 3 in RI/1:19-cv-00315, 3 in VAE/3:19-cv-00404, 4 in WY/1:19-cv-00109). As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer. The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the N.D. Ohio for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 6/19/2019.(Court Staff, ssw) [Transferred from wyd on 6/21/2019.]
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-96) - 18 action(s) re: pldg. (1 in MA/1:19-cv-11206, 4582 in MDL No. 2804, 1 in MIE/2:19-cv-11681, 1 in MIE/2:19-cv-11685, 1 in MIE/2:19-cv-11687, 1 in MIW/1:19-cv-00438, 1 in MIW/1:19-cv-00439, 1 in MN/0:19-cv-01483, 1 in MSN/1:19-cv-00106, 1 in MSN/3:19-cv-00115, 1 in MSN/4:19-cv-00086, 1 in MSS/1:19-cv-00304, 1 in NCE/7:19-cv-00104, 1 in NCW/1:19-cv-00176, 1 in NE/8:19-cv-00244, 1 in PAM/4:19-cv-00945, 1 in RI/1:19-cv-00315, 1 in VAE/3:19-cv-00404, 2 in WY/1:19-cv-00109) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 6/19/2019.(Court Staff, ssw) [Transferred from wyd on 6/21/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (no summons issued) with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt #CAS002246), filed by Riverton WY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, skb) Modified on 5/29/2019 (Court Staff, skb). (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/29/2019) (Court Staff, skb). (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/29/2019) (Court Staff, skb). [Transferred from wyd on 6/21/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riverton WY v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riverton WY
Represented By: Jason Edward Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?