City of Claremont, NH v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: City of Claremont, NH
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Michael P. Dipre, Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Eric L. Knight, Actavis LLC, Doe Defendants, Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Christopher Clough, Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Cardinal Health Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Walmart Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Mark Weinreb, CVS Health Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Actavis Inc, Purdue Pharma Inc., Janssen Pharmecuticals, Inc. and Rite-Aid of Maryland, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019op45690
Filed: August 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 60 Attorney Appearance by Joseph L. Ciaccio filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #56 .(Ciaccio, Joseph)
August 5, 2019 Filing 59 Attorney Appearance by Hunter J. Shkolnik filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #55 .(Shkolnik, Hunter)
August 5, 2019 Filing 58 Attorney Appearance by Shayna Erin Sacks filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Sacks, Shayna)
August 5, 2019 Filing 57 Attorney Appearance by Salvatore C. Badala filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Badala, Salvatore)
August 5, 2019 Filing 56 Attorney Appearance by Joseph L. Ciaccio filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Ciaccio, Joseph)
August 5, 2019 Filing 55 Attorney Appearance by Hunter J. Shkolnik filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Shkolnik, Hunter)
August 5, 2019 Filing 54 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New Hampshire. Case number 1:19-cv-00331. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 1, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (vln) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 53 MDL FINAL ORDER re: MDL NO. 2804. Case is transferred to Northern District of Ohio for proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407. (vln) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
August 1, 2019 NOTICE of MDL TRANSFER ORDER. MINUTE ORDER -- TO THE TRANSFEROR JUDGES/CLERKS OF THE ASSOCIATED CASES: This transmittal is for informational purposes only. No action is required at this time.A transfer order has been filed today in this litigation. Rule 2.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, states...An order to transfer or remand pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 shall be effective only upon its filing with the clerk of the transferee district court.You will receive a certified copy of this order from the transferee court along with notification of the newly assigned case number(s) in that district. With the advent of electronic filing, Rule 9.1 of the Panel Rules shall be satisfied upon transmittal of the portion of the file deemed necessary and requested by the transferee court.Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 7/31/2019.Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804 et al. (CMD) (vln) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
July 16, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Stay Order by Insys Therapeutics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stay Order)(Barnard, Deborah) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #32 Motion to Stay. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by District Judge Nancy Torresen.(vln) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 51 PROCEDURAL NOTICE: Due to recusal of NH judges, case referred to the District of Maine. Original filings shall continue to be filed electronically with the Clerk in New Hampshire in accordance with the district Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants, however, are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. No courtesy filings need to be filed in the District of Maine. NOTICE Signed by Erica Jordan, Deputy Clerk. (ej) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Case reassigned to District Judge Nancy Torresen. The new case designation is: 1:19-cv-331-NT. Please show this number with the correct judge designation on all further pleadings. (ej) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 50 CONCURRING ORDER re: #48 Designated Case Order Out. Judge Nancy Torresen assigned to preside over this case. So Ordered by Chief District Judge Jon D. Levy. (ej) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 49 REPLY to Objection to Motion re #32 MOTION to Stay filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Surreply due by 6/10/2019. (Glahn, Wilbur) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 REFERRAL ORDER. All of the judges are recused, case referred to District of Maine. Concurring Order sent. Miscellaneous Deadline set for 6/20/2019. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (ej) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #40 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay Proceedings. Text of Order: Granted. Within 48 hours counsel shall electronically refile the pleading attached to the Motion for Leave to File using the appropriate event in CM/ECF. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Miscellaneous Deadline set for 6/4/2019.(kad) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 47 SURREPLY to Reply to #27 MOTION to Remand filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - MDL 161_0 2018.03.01 Statement of Interest by USA)(Pandolph, William) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #42 Partially Assented to MOTION to Exceed Page Limitations Under Local Rule 7.1(e)(1). Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(kad) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER OF RECUSAL. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER OF RECUSAL. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. (ej) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER OF RECUSAL. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (ej) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER OF RECUSAL. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. (ej) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #41 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to File Sur-Reply and Exceed Page Limits. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Surreply due by 5/24/2019.(kad) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 42 Partially Assented to MOTION to Exceed Page Limitations Under Local Rule 7.1(e)(1) filed by Claremont, NH, City of. Follow up on Objection on 5/30/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Bonsignore, Robert) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
May 15, 2019 Filing 41 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to File Sur-Reply and Exceed Page Limits filed by McKesson Corporation.(Pandolph, William) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay Proceedings filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Follow up on Objection on 5/28/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Reply Memorandum)(Glahn, Wilbur) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #38 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to 60 days from Court Order on motion to remand (Doc 27) or JPML Order on Transfer to MDL No. 2804. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(kad) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory G. Peters on behalf of Eric L. Knight Attorney Gregory G. Peters added to party Eric L. Knight(pty:dft).(Peters, Gregory) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 38 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to 60 days from Court Order on motion to remand (Doc 27) or JPML Order on Transfer to MDL No. 2804 filed by Eric L. Knight.(Chabot, Pierre) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Pierre A. Chabot on behalf of Eric L. Knight Attorney Pierre A. Chabot added to party Eric L. Knight(pty:dft).(Chabot, Pierre) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 36 REPLY to Objection to Motion re #27 MOTION to Remand filed by Claremont, NH, City of. Surreply due by 5/15/2019. (Bonsignore, Robert) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
May 7, 2019 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #32 MOTION to Stay filed by Claremont, NH, City of. Follow up on Reply on 5/14/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Bonsignore, Robert) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 34 OBJECTION to #27 MOTION to Remand filed by McKesson Corporation. Follow up on Reply on 5/13/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Pandolph, William) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 33 OBJECTION to #27 MOTION to Remand filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Follow up on Reply on 5/13/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Glahn, Wilbur) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
May 1, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Stay filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Follow up on Objection on 5/15/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Stay, #2 Exhibit 1 - Transferred and Removed Cases)(Glahn, Wilbur) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #31 Assented to MOTION for Brien T. O'Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Brien T. O'Connor submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 5/13/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(kad) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 31 Assented to MOTION for Brien T. O'Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1806156.) filed by Mallinckrodt LLC.(Bland, Zachary) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William D. Pandolph on behalf of McKesson Corporation Attorney William D. Pandolph added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft).(Pandolph, William) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER re #27 Motion to Remand. Text of Order: Defendants shall respond to the merits of plaintiffs motion to remand (Doc. No. 27) on or before May 6, 2019. Plaintiff may reply on or before May 10, 2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(kad) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 29 OBJECTION to #27 MOTION to Remand (Opposition to Expedited Treatment) filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Follow up on Reply on 5/6/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Glahn, Wilbur) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #26 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to 09/01/2019. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 9/1/2019. (kad) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
April 26, 2019 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error - NO ACTION REQUIRED - re: #28 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Claremont, NH, City of, #27 MOTION to Remand filed by Claremont, NH, City of. Document should have been filed as an attachment to the main document (AP 2.5(a). NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.(kad) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Support re #27 MOTION to Remand filed by Claremont, NH, City of. (Bonsignore, Robert) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Remand filed by Claremont, NH, City of. Follow up on Objection on 5/9/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Bonsignore, Robert) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 26 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to 09/01/2019 filed by Michael P. Dipre, Mark Weinreb.(Pignatelli, Adam) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting Motion for Donna Welch to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that DONNA WELCH submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(vln) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
April 19, 2019 Filing 25 Assented to MOTION for Donna Welch to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1802726.) filed by Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Allergan PLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Donna Welch)(Callaghan, Peter) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting Motion to Extend Time to Answer (or Otherwise Plead) the later of (1) sixty (60) days after the date of any ruling by the JPML regarding transfer of this case to the MDL; or (2) sixty (60) days after the date of any ruling by this Court on a motion to remand, if any such motion is filed. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(vln) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 24 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to [or Otherwise Plead] the later of (1) sixty (60) days after the date of any ruling by the JPML regarding transfer of this case to the MDL; or (2) sixty (60) days after the date of any ruling by this Court on a motion to remand, if any such motion is filed [Filed on behalf of the Distributor Defendants] filed by Amerisourcebergen Corporation.(Kenney, Michele) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 23 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 220-2018-cv-00127, Claremont County Superior Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Record Part 2 of 4, #2 Exhibit State Court Record Part 3 of 4, #3 Exhibit State Court Record Part 4 of 4)(Delaney, Michael) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 22 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to 30 days after the later of: (1) this Courts ruling on any motion to remand; or (2) the JPMLs final decision regarding whether to transfer this case to the Opiate MDL filed by CVS Health Corporation.(Rosenblatt, Arnold) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Filing 21 Disclosure Statement by CVS Health Corporation disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and a merger agreement. (Rosenblatt, Arnold) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to 60 days after the date of any ruling denying MDL transfer or ruling on a motion to remand, if such motion is filed. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(kad) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Filing 20 Disclosure Statement by Mallinckrodt LLC disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Bland, Zachary) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Zachary Davis Bland on behalf of Mallinckrodt LLC Attorney Zachary Davis Bland added to party Mallinckrodt LLC(pty:dft).(Bland, Zachary) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian M. Quirk on behalf of Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Allergan PLC Attorney Brian M. Quirk added to party Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Brian M. Quirk added to party Allergan PLC(pty:dft).(Quirk, Brian) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Filing 17 Disclosure Statement by Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Callaghan, Peter) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement by Allergan PLC disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Callaghan, Peter) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter G. Callaghan on behalf of Allergan PLC, Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Attorney Peter G. Callaghan added to party Allergan PLC(pty:dft), Attorney Peter G. Callaghan added to party Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(pty:dft).(Callaghan, Peter) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Hilliard, Russell) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Russell F. Hilliard on behalf of Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. (Hilliard, Russell) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement by Amerisourcebergen Corporation disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Kenney, Michele) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Deane, W.) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Filing 10 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to 60 days after the date of any ruling denying MDL transfer or ruling on a motion to remand, if such motion is filed filed by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.. Attorney W. Daniel Deane added to party Purdue Pharma Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney W. Daniel Deane added to party Purdue Pharma L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney W. Daniel Deane added to party The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.(pty:dft).(Deane, W.) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement by Walmart, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Sutton, Blake) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER MDL No. 1 re: conditional transfer to Northern District of Ohio. Order is not effective until filed in the transferee court. MDL No. 2804. Miscellaneous Deadline set for 5/3/2019. (bt) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The new case designation is: 1:19-cv-331-AJ. Please show this number with the correct judge designation on all further pleadings. (bt) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(de) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
April 1, 2019 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement by Cardinal Health, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Hawkins, Christopher) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
April 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam B. Pignatelli on behalf of Michael P. Dipre, Mark Weinreb (Pignatelli, Adam) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REGARDING VISITING ATTORNEY: The Local Rules for the District of New Hampshire provide that an attorney may, at the discretion of the court, on motion by a member of our bar, be permitted to practice before this court in a particular action. Any attorney so admitted shall at all times be associated with a member of the bar of this court. Our records indicate that no motions for pro hac vice admission of Mark Cheffo, Esq.; Charles C. Lifland, Esq.; Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr, Esq. have been received. Unless said motions with the required fee are filed within thirty (30) days, the case may be referred to a judicial officer for appropriate action. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. Compliance Deadline set for 5/1/2019. (bt) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
April 1, 2019 NOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmacetica, Inc., Allergan PLC, Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Amerisourcebergen Corporation, CVS Health Corporation, Rite-Aid of Maryland, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walmart, Inc. shall file a disclosure statement by Friday April 8, 2019. Disclosure Statement due 4/8/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (bt) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REGARDING VISITING ATTORNEY: The Local Rules for the District of New Hampshire provide that an attorney may, at the discretion of the court, on motion by a member of our bar, be permitted to practice before this court in a particular action. Any attorney so admitted shall at all times be associated with a member of the bar of this court. Our records indicate that no motions for pro hac vice admission of Donna Welch, Esq.; Brien T. O'Connor, Esq. have been received. Unless said motions with the required fee are filed within thirty (30) days, the case may be referred to a judicial officer for appropriate action. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court.Compliance Deadline set for 5/1/2019. (bt) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
April 1, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (bt) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement by McKesson Corporation disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Joly, Rose) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Removal (Supplemental) by McKesson Corporation. Attorney Rose Marie Joly added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Case Summary, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Documents)(Joly, Rose) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-331-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Delaney, Michael) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Sullivan Superior Court, case number 220-2018-cv-00127 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1792620) filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc.. Answer Follow Up on 4/18/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 4/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons, Complaint and Other Process, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Delaney, Michael) [Transferred from nhd on 8/5/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Claremont, NH v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Rose Marie Joly
Represented By: William D. Pandolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael P. Dipre
Represented By: Adam B. Pignatelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: W. Daniel Deane
Represented By: Mark S. Cheffo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Zachary Davis Bland
Represented By: Brien T. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Deborah E. Barnard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Represented By: Brian M. Quirk
Represented By: Peter G. Callaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Michael A. Delaney
Represented By: Wilbur A. Glahn, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric L. Knight
Represented By: Pierre A. Chabot
Represented By: Gregory G. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Clough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Represented By: W. Daniel Deane
Represented By: Mark S. Cheffo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: Christopher D. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Michael A. Delaney
Represented By: Wilbur A. Glahn, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Blake M. Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Weinreb
Represented By: Adam B. Pignatelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Arnold Rosenblatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Represented By: Michele E. Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Brian M. Quirk
Represented By: Peter G. Callaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Represented By: Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr
Represented By: Russell F. Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Inc
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By: W. Daniel Deane
Represented By: Mark S. Cheffo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmecuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite-Aid of Maryland, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Claremont, NH
Represented By: Joseph L. Ciaccio
Represented By: Shayna Erin Sacks
Represented By: Robert J. Bonsignore
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?