Midwest City City of v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Plaintiff: Midwest City City of
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Reagan Nichols, MD William Valuck, Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, The, Physicians Total Care Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc., Watson Pharmaceutcals, Inc., Actavis plc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Allergan PLC, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Perry Fine, Amerisourcebergen Corp., Cardinal Health Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Harvey Jenkins, Keysource Medical, Inc., Anda Inc, McKesson Corp., GCP Pharma LLC, Watson Pharma, Inc., Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis LLC, Morris & Dickson Co LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Purdue Pharma Inc. and Lynn Webster
Case Number: 1:2019op45709
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 59 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Oklahoma Western. Case number 5:19-cv-00345. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 1, 2019 Filing 58 TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to District of Ohio Northern for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Dan A Polster. Signed by Clerk of the Panel. (nv) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kaylee P Davis-Maddy (Davis-Maddy, Kaylee) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 56 REPLY to Response to Motion re #49 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Amerisourcebergen Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Hearing Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Transfer Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Alameda CA Stay Order)(Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
June 19, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY by Insys Therapeutic Inc and Imposition of Automatic Stay (Pierce, Amy) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
June 14, 2019 Filing 54 RESPONSE to Motion re #49 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Midwest City City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Order Regarding Remands [#130], #2 Exhibit 2-Case Management Order [#232])(Court, Todd) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 53 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Reagan Nichols.(Wiggins, John) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 52 ENTRY of Appearance by Erin A Renegar on behalf of Reagan Nichols (Renegar, Erin) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 51 ENTRY of Appearance by John E Wiggins on behalf of Reagan Nichols (Wiggins, John) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 50 REPLY by Plaintiff Midwest City City of re #43 MOTION to Remand filed by Midwest City City of. (Court, Todd) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 49 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by Amerisourcebergen Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ada Stay Order, #2 Exhibit Seminole Stay Order, #3 Exhibit Osage Stay Order, #4 Exhibit Pawnee stay Order, #5 Exhibit Delaware Stay Order, #6 Exhibit CTO, #7 Exhibit Wis. Stay Order, #8 Exhibit Cal. Stay Order, #9 Exhibit Ky. Stay Order, #10 Exhibit 6 County Transfer Order, #11 Exhibit County Transfer Order, #12 Exhibit Portland Stay Order, #13 Exhibit EDVA Stay Order, #14 Exhibit WDVA Stay Order, #15 Exhibit Cal. Stay Order, #16 Exhibit Ill. Stay Order, #17 Exhibit Fla. Deferral Order)(Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 48 RESPONSE in Opposition re #43 MOTION to Remand filed by McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CTO, #2 Exhibit Statement of Interest, #3 Exhibit Withdrawal of Order)(Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 47 RESPONSE in Opposition re #43 MOTION to Remand filed by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Sparks, John) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
May 22, 2019 Filing 46 SUPPLEMENT Authority by Midwest City City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memorandum and Order re remand)(Sill, Matthew) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
May 22, 2019 Filing 45 RESPONSE in Opposition re #44 MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand filed by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sparks, John) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
May 15, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand by Midwest City City of. (Sill, Matthew) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
May 3, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION to Remand by Midwest City City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order - Trotter v. Smith et al., #2 Exhibit 2 - Order - Adams v. Wyeth)(Court, Todd) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #41 defendants McKesson Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., The Harvard Drug Group, LLC and AmerisourceBergen Corporation's unopposed joint motion for extension of deadline...defendants shall file their answer or other responsive pleading to plaintiff's complaint not later than 45 days following the later of the final determination of any motion to remand or transfer this action to the MDL Panel. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 04/30/2019. (lam) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 41 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Petition by Amerisourcebergen Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
April 26, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE (other) by McKesson Corp Supplemental Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Docket, #2 Exhibit Petition, #3 Exhibit Entry, #4 Exhibit Entry, #5 Exhibit Motion, #6 Exhibit Motion, #7 Exhibit Entry, #8 Exhibit Order, #9 Exhibit Entry, #10 Exhibit Entry, #11 Exhibit Notice of Notice, #12 Exhibit Authorities)(Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
April 26, 2019 Filing 39 ENTRY of Appearance by Kaylee P Davis-Maddy on behalf of McKesson Corp (Davis-Maddy, Kaylee) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 38 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by The Purdue Frederick Company . (Lamirand, Jennifer) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 37 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Purdue Pharma Inc . (Lamirand, Jennifer) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 36 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Purdue Pharma LP . (Lamirand, Jennifer) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 35 ENTRY of Appearance by Jennifer N Lamirand on behalf of The Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP (Lamirand, Jennifer) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 34 ENTRY of Appearance by Joshua D Burns on behalf of The Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP (Burns, Joshua) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 33 ENTRY of Appearance by Sanford C Coats on behalf of The Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP (Coats, Sanford) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 32 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc . (Quinn, Ashley) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 31 ENTRY of Appearance by Ashley E Quinn on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc (Quinn, Ashley) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 30 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas V Merkley on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc (Merkley, Nicholas) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 29 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by McKesson Corp . (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 28 ENTRY of Appearance by Stuart D Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corp (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting defendants Anda, Inc., and Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.s' #22 unopposed motion for extension of deadline; defendant shall file its answer or other responsive pleading to plaintiff's complaint not later than 45 days following the later of the final determination of any motion to remand or transfer this action to the MDL Panel. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 4/22/2019. (cla) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting defendant Allergan Finance, LLC, f/k/a Actavis, Inc., f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s #23 unopposed motion for extension of deadline; defendant shall file its answer or other responsive pleading to plaintiff's complaint not later than 45 days following the later of the final determination of any motion to remand or transfer this action to the MDL Panel. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 4/22/2019. (cla) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 25 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 24 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Health Solutions Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 23 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Watson Pharmaceutical Inc. (Johnson, William) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 22 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Petition by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Curran, Jeffrey) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 21 ENTRY of Appearance by Elizabeth A Price on behalf of Watson Pharmaceutical Inc (Price, Elizabeth) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 20 ENTRY of Appearance by William A Johnson on behalf of Watson Pharmaceutical Inc (Johnson, William) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 19 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Curran, Jeffrey) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Raymond E Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey A Curran on behalf of Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc (Curran, Jeffrey) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
April 19, 2019 Filing 16 Receipt for Money Received from Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc in the amount of $400.00, receipt number OKW500073510 regarding #1 Notice of Removal: Case Payment/Filing Fee. (kmt) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 defendant Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s unopposed motion for extension of deadline...defendant shall file its answer or other responsive pleading to plaintiff's complaint not later than 45 days following the later of the final determination of any motion to remand or transfer this action to the MDL Panel. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 04/18/2019. (lam) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 14 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Riddles, D) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Riddles, D) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by D Todd Riddles on behalf of Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc (Riddles, D) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Sparks, John) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by John H Sparks on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc (Sparks, John) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael W Ridgeway on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc (Ridgeway, Michael) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by D Michael McBride, III on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Corp (McBride, D) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Amerisourcebergen Corp . (Huntsman, Susan) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Susan E Huntsman on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Corp (Huntsman, Susan) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Harvard Drug Group LLC The . (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Cardinal Health Inc . (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Harvard Drug Group LLC The (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health Inc (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oklahoma County District Court, case number CJ-2019-1596 filed by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - MDL 2804 Doc 328 - Dec 5 2017 Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - J&J and Janssen Service Packet, #3 Exhibit 3 - Petition, #4 Exhibit 4 - EoA - D. Todd Riddles on behalf of Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc, #5 Exhibit 5 - EoA - Stuart D. Campbell & Kaylee Davis-Maddy for McKesson Corp., #6 Exhibit 6 -MEoT - McKesson, Cardinal, Harvard Drug Group, #7 Exhibit 7 - MEoT Quest Pharmaceuticals, #8 Exhibit 8 - EoA - D. Michael McBride & Susan Huntsman for Amerisourcebergan Corp., #9 Exhibit 9 -EoA - Ryan A. Ray for Cardinal Health, #10 Exhibit 10 -EoA - Ryan A. Ray for The Harvard Drug Group, LLC, #11 Exhibit 11 - Order Granting Defs.' MEoT, #12 Exhibit 12 - Docket Sheet - Oklahoma County, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(nv) [Transferred from okwd on 8/22/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Midwest City City of v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By: Michael W. Ridgeway
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reagan Nichols
Represented By: John E. Wiggins
Represented By: Erin A Renegar
Represented By: Erin A. Renegar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD William Valuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Sanford C. Coats
Represented By: Joshua D. Burns
Represented By: Jennifer N. Lamirand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, The
Represented By: Sanford C. Coats
Represented By: Joshua D. Burns
Represented By: Jennifer N. Lamirand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physicians Total Care Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas V. Merkley
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceutcals, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth A Price
Represented By: William A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Michael W. Ridgeway
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Raymond E. Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Represented By: Nicholas V. Merkley
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvard Drug Group LLC The
Represented By: Ryan A. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: D. Todd Riddles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas V. Merkley
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas V. Merkley
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Fine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Corp.
Represented By: Susan E. Huntsman
Represented By: D. Michael McBride, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: Ryan A. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Raymond E. Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Michael W. Ridgeway
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvey Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keysource Medical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corp.
Represented By: Stuart D. Campbell
Represented By: Kaylee Davis-Maddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCP Pharma LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Michael W. Ridgeway
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Nicholas V. Merkley
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Sanford C. Coats
Represented By: Joshua D. Burns
Represented By: Jennifer N. Lamirand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Midwest City City of
Represented By: Todd A. Court
Represented By: Matthew J. Sill
Represented By: Tony G. Puckett
Represented By: Harrison C. Lujan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?