Chatham County Hospital Authority, Georgia v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Chatham County Hospital Authority, Georgia
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Cardinal Health Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Noramco Inc and Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2019op45725
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 19 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Chatham County Hospital Authority, Georgia. Mallinckrodt PLC waiver sent on 10/24/2019, answer due 12/23/2019 filed on behalf of Chatham County Hospital Authority, Georgia (Tate, Mark)
October 25, 2019 Filing 18 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Chatham County Hospital Authority, Georgia. Mallinckrodt LLC waiver sent on 10/24/2019, answer due 12/23/2019 filed on behalf of Chatham County Hospital Authority, Georgia (Tate, Mark)
October 23, 2019 Filing 17 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Chatham County Hospital Authority, Georgia. Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 10/15/2019, answer due 12/16/2019 filed on behalf of Chatham County Hospital Authority, Georgia (Tate, Mark)
October 22, 2019 Filing 16 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Chatham County Hospital Authority, Georgia. Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 10/4/2019, answer due 12/3/2019 filed on behalf of Chatham County Hospital Authority, Georgia (Tate, Mark)
October 22, 2019 Filing 15 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Chatham County Hospital Authority, Georgia. Endo Health Solutions Inc. waiver sent on 10/4/2019, answer due 12/3/2019 filed on behalf of Chatham County Hospital Authority, Georgia (Tate, Mark)
October 22, 2019 Filing 14 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Chatham County Hospital Authority, Georgia. McKesson Corporation waiver sent on 10/18/2019, answer due 12/17/2019 filed on behalf of Chatham County Hospital Authority, Georgia (Tate, Mark)
October 8, 2019 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Noramco Inc waiver sent on 9/26/2019, answer due 11/25/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Tate, Mark)
October 2, 2019 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Chatham County Hospital Authority, Georgia. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation waiver sent on 10/2/2019, answer due 12/2/2019 filed on behalf of Chatham County Hospital Authority, Georgia (Tate, Mark)
September 27, 2019 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Chatham County Hospital Authority, Georgia. Cardinal Health Inc. waiver sent on 9/26/2019, answer due 11/25/2019 filed on behalf of Chatham County Hospital Authority, Georgia (Tate, Mark)
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Chatham County Hospital Authority, Georgia. Watson Laboratories Inc. waiver sent on 9/24/2019, answer due 11/25/2019 filed on behalf of Chatham County Hospital Authority, Georgia (Tate, Mark)
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Chatham County Hospital Authority, Georgia. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 9/24/2019, answer due 11/25/2019 filed on behalf of Chatham County Hospital Authority, Georgia (Tate, Mark)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Chatham County Hospital Authority, Georgia. Cephalon Inc. waiver sent on 9/24/2019, answer due 11/25/2019 filed on behalf of Chatham County Hospital Authority, Georgia (Tate, Mark)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Chatham County Hospital Authority, Georgia. Actavis Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 9/24/2019, answer due 11/25/2019 filed on behalf of Chatham County Hospital Authority, Georgia (Tate, Mark)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Chatham County Hospital Authority, Georgia. Actavis LLC waiver sent on 9/24/2019, answer due 11/25/2019 filed on behalf of Chatham County Hospital Authority, Georgia (Tate, Mark)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Georgia Southern. Case number 4:19-cv-00159. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-104) MDL No. 2804 to the Northern District of Ohio. (jrb) [Transferred from gasd on 8/27/2019.]
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (evk) [Transferred from gasd on 8/27/2019.]
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Rule 26 Instructions ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 07/05/2019. (evk) [Transferred from gasd on 8/27/2019.]
July 3, 2019 Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number 113J-2635184. (evk) [Transferred from gasd on 8/27/2019.]
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Chatham County Hospital Authority, Georgia against All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(evk) [Transferred from gasd on 8/27/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chatham County Hospital Authority, Georgia v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chatham County Hospital Authority, Georgia
Represented By: Mark A. Tate
Represented By: Steven E. Scheer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?