City of Slidell v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Plaintiff: Slidell City
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Allergan Sales, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc., Actavis Kadian LLC, Indivior, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Smith Drug Company, Mallinckrodt PLC, Actavis Totowa LLC, Insys Therapeutics Inc., Actavis Elizabeth LLC, CVS Orlando FL Distribution, L.L.C, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc., Impax Laboratories, LLC, Cardinal Health Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Purdue Pharma L.P., J M Smith Corporation, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Allergan Finance LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, H.D. Smith LLC, Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, CVS TN DISTRIBUTION, LLC, Cephalon Inc., Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC, Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp., Walmart Inc., Anda Inc, Walgreen Company, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Purdue Frederick Company Inc., Allegran Plc, Sandoz Inc., Noramco Inc, SpecGX LLC, CVS Pharmacy Inc., Amneal Pharmaceutical LLC, CVS Health Corporation, Morris & Dickson Co LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Purdue Pharma Inc., Amneal Pharmaceutical Inc., Acatvias Laboratories, Inc.-Salt Lake City and Allergan USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019op45769
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 29 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Louisiana Eastern. Case number 2:19-cv-11771. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order of MDL Transfer to Northern District of Ohio. MDL case number is 2804. Electronic file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 9/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(mm) [Transferred from laed on 9/3/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 27 Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2804. (mm) [Transferred from laed on 9/3/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: As stated herein, IT IS ORDERED that all proceedings in this case are hereby stayed pending the decision of the Multidistrict Litigation Panel regarding transfer. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 8/8/2019.(mm) [Transferred from laed on 9/3/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, Or Otherwise Respond re #1 Notice of Removal. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 8/7/2019. (mm) [Transferred from laed on 9/3/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, Or Otherwise Respond re #1 Notice of Removal. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 8/7/2019. (mm) [Transferred from laed on 9/3/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 23 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #20 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **Filing attorney did not enter AmerisourceBergen Corporation as a corporate parent(s) at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm) [Transferred from laed on 9/3/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 22 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #21 MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, Or Otherwise Respond re #1 Notice of Removal. **1. Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the District Judge. Clerk took corrective action. 2. Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Clerk modified docket text to reflect 'Exparte'. ** (mm) [Transferred from laed on 9/3/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 21 EXPARTE/CONSENT Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, Or Otherwise Respond re #1 Notice of Removal by H.D. Smith, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Richard Munice Crump added to party H.D. Smith, LLC(pty:dft).(Crump, Richard) Modified text/removed referral on 8/7/2019 (mm). [Transferred from laed on 9/3/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 20 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by H.D. Smith, LLC identifying Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation for H.D. Smith, LLC (Crump, Richard) Modified text/added corporate parent on 8/7/2019 (mm). [Transferred from laed on 9/3/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 19 EXPARTE/CONSENT Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, Or Otherwise Respond re #1 Notice of Removal by J M Smith Corporation, Smith Drug Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brickman, Philip) Modified text on 8/6/2019 (mm). [Transferred from laed on 9/3/2019.]
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the #15 Motion. It is hereby Ordered that LOUISIANA WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY, INC., without waiver of any defenses, shall be granted a 21-day extension of time to file a responsive pleading after a decision by the JPML regarding transfer of this matter to the MDL. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 08/02/2019. (am) [Transferred from laed on 9/3/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 17 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond re #1 Notice of Removal. **1. Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the District Judge. Clerk took corrective action. 2. Filing attorney should have linked document to Document 1. Clerk properly linked document.** (mm) [Transferred from laed on 9/3/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 16 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc. (Perry, S.) [Transferred from laed on 9/3/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 15 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond re #1 Notice of Removal by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Perry, S.) Modified linkage/removed referral on 8/1/2019 (mm). [Transferred from laed on 9/3/2019.]
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal or Otherwise File Responsive Pleadings as to Joining Manufacturing Defendants. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 7/30/2019. (mm) [Transferred from laed on 9/3/2019.]
July 30, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Compliance by Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan Sales, L.L.C., Allergan USA, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 & 3 combined)(Womack, Thomas) [Transferred from laed on 9/3/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 12 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal or Otherwise File Responsive Pleadings as to Joining Manufacturing Defendants by Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rookard, Kelly) [Transferred from laed on 9/3/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Slidell City. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Order)(Leger, Walter) [Transferred from laed on 9/3/2019.]
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to move, answer or otherwise respond re #1 Notice of Removal. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 7/25/2019. (mm) [Transferred from laed on 9/3/2019.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond re #1 Notice of Removal by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Anda, Inc., Cardinal Health Inc, McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Stacey) Modified text on 7/25/2019 (mm). [Transferred from laed on 9/3/2019.]
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond re #1 Notice of Removal. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 7/25/2019. (mm) [Transferred from laed on 9/3/2019.]
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond re #1 Notice of Removal by by Walmart, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, CVS Orlando FL Distribution, LLC, CVS TN Distribution, Inc., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walgreen Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Knight, Kathryn) Modified linkage/filers on 7/24/2019 (mm). [Transferred from laed on 9/3/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Collateral Proceedings by McKesson Corporation . (Williams, Stacey) [Transferred from laed on 9/3/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by McKesson Corporation (Williams, Stacey) [Transferred from laed on 9/3/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF REMOVAL by McKesson Corporation . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Williams, Stacey) Modified text on 7/23/2019 (mm). [Transferred from laed on 9/3/2019.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (ess) [Transferred from laed on 9/3/2019.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan Sales, L.L.C., Allergan USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Allergan PLC (Womack, Thomas) Modified text on 7/22/2019 (clw). [Transferred from laed on 9/3/2019.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Tammany Parish, 22nd JDC, case number 2019-13022 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7762535) filed by Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan Sales, L.L.C., Allergan USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Thomas Mac Dougall Womack added to party Allergan Finance LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Mac Dougall Womack added to party Allergan Sales, L.L.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Mac Dougall Womack added to party Allergan USA, Inc.(pty:dft).(Womack, Thomas) Modified text on 7/22/2019 (clw). [Transferred from laed on 9/3/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Slidell v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Scott R. Wolf
Represented By: Douglas John Moore
Represented By: David W. O'Quinn
Represented By: Stacey Denise Williams
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Dekaris
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Scott R. Wolf
Represented By: W. Michael Adams
Represented By: Stacey Denise Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Sales, LLC
Represented By: Caroline Kay Darwin
Represented By: Thomas MacDougall Womack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Brian Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Kadian LLC
Represented By: Leland G Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Dekaris
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indivior, Inc.
Represented By: Glenn Michael Farnet
Represented By: Karen M. Fontana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: James Alcee Brown
Represented By: A'Dair Ragan Flynt
Represented By: Tyler D. Trew
Represented By: James A. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Drug Company
Represented By: Philip C. Brickman
Represented By: Sidney W. Degan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Represented By: Harry Rosenberg
Represented By: Gregory T. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Totowa LLC
Represented By: Leland G Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Dekaris
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence Bradley Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Elizabeth LLC
Represented By: Leland G Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Dekaris
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Orlando FL Distribution, L.L.C
Represented By: Thomas M. Flanagan
Represented By: Camille E. Gauthier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Represented By: John F. Olinde
Represented By: Peter J. Rotolo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Represented By: Leland G Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Dekaris
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impax Laboratories, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: Franklin J. Foil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Dekaris
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis South Atlantic LLC
Represented By: Leland G Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Dekaris
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Chilcott Company, LLC
Represented By: Leland G Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Dekaris
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Scott R. Wolf
Represented By: Douglas John Moore
Represented By: David W. O'Quinn
Represented By: Stacey Denise Williams
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Leland G Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Dekaris
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Samuel E. Masur
Represented By: Paul Byrd Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J M Smith Corporation
Represented By: Philip C. Brickman
Represented By: Sidney W. Degan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Represented By: Madison Sharko
Represented By: Celeste R. Coco-Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Represented By: Caroline Kay Darwin
Represented By: Thomas MacDougall Womack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Dekaris
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Scott R. Wolf
Represented By: Douglas John Moore
Represented By: David W. O'Quinn
Represented By: Stacey Denise Williams
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith LLC
Represented By: Shelley K. Napolitano
Represented By: Richard Munice Crump
Represented By: Robert E. Dille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
Represented By: Ezra D. Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Harry Rosenberg
Represented By: Gregory T. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS TN DISTRIBUTION, LLC
Represented By: Thomas M. Flanagan
Represented By: Camille E. Gauthier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Represented By: Leland G Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Dekaris
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC
Represented By: Leland G Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Dekaris
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Dekaris
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp.
Represented By: Kelly Cambre Bogart
Represented By: Nicole M. Boyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn Marie Knight
Represented By: James Dalton Courson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Represented By: Craig Douglas Dillard
Represented By: Craig D. Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Company
Represented By: John F. Olinde
Represented By: Peter J. Rotolo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Shelley K. Napolitano
Represented By: Richard Munice Crump
Represented By: Robert E. Dille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
Represented By: Samuel E. Masur
Represented By: Paul Byrd Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allegran Plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Represented By: Harry Rosenberg
Represented By: Gregory T. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Represented By: Thomas M. Flanagan
Represented By: Camille E. Gauthier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceutical LLC
Represented By: John Powers Wolff, III
Represented By: Chad Anthony Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Thomas M. Flanagan
Represented By: Camille E. Gauthier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co LLC
Represented By: Russell R. Dickson
Represented By: Frank H. Spruiell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Samuel E. Masur
Represented By: Paul Byrd Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceutical Inc.
Represented By: John Powers Wolff, III
Represented By: Chad Anthony Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acatvias Laboratories, Inc.-Salt Lake City
Represented By: Leland G Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Dekaris
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Represented By: Caroline Kay Darwin
Represented By: Thomas MacDougall Womack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Slidell City
Represented By: Sarah Perkins Reid
Represented By: Ross Forrest Lagarde
Represented By: Franklin G. Shaw
Represented By: Walter John Leger, Jr.
Represented By: Walter John Leger, III
Represented By: Brigid E. Collins
Represented By: Lawrence E. Abbott
Represented By: Matthew S. Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?