Choctaw County, Alabama v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Choctaw County, Alabama
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Indivior PLC, Purdue Pharma L.P., Indivior, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Allergan PLC, TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Noramco, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019op45770
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 17 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Choctaw County, Alabama. Mallinckrodt LLC waiver sent on 10/18/2019, answer due 12/17/2019 filed on behalf of Choctaw County, Alabama (DeGaris, Annesley)
October 25, 2019 Filing 16 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Choctaw County, Alabama. Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 10/4/2019, answer due 12/3/2019 filed on behalf of Choctaw County, Alabama (DeGaris, Annesley)
October 25, 2019 Filing 15 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Choctaw County, Alabama. Endo Health Solutions, Inc. waiver sent on 10/4/2019, answer due 12/3/2019 filed on behalf of Choctaw County, Alabama (DeGaris, Annesley)
October 25, 2019 Filing 14 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Choctaw County, Alabama. Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 10/15/2019, answer due 12/16/2019 filed on behalf of Choctaw County, Alabama (DeGaris, Annesley)
October 25, 2019 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Choctaw County, Alabama. McKesson Corporation waiver sent on 10/18/2019, answer due 12/17/2019 filed on behalf of Choctaw County, Alabama (DeGaris, Annesley)
October 25, 2019 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Choctaw County, Alabama. Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc waiver sent on 10/18/2019, answer due 12/17/2019 filed on behalf of Choctaw County, Alabama (DeGaris, Annesley)
October 4, 2019 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Choctaw County, Alabama. Noramco, Inc. waiver sent on 9/19/2019, answer due 11/18/2019 filed on behalf of Choctaw County, Alabama (DeGaris, Annesley)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Choctaw County, Alabama. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation waiver sent on 10/2/2019, answer due 12/2/2019 filed on behalf of Choctaw County, Alabama (DeGaris, Annesley)
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Choctaw County, Alabama. Cephalon, Inc. waiver sent on 9/19/2019, answer due 11/18/2019 filed on behalf of Choctaw County, Alabama (DeGaris, Annesley)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Choctaw County, Alabama. Indivior PLC waiver sent on 9/26/2019, answer due 11/25/2019 filed on behalf of Choctaw County, Alabama (DeGaris, Annesley)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Choctaw County, Alabama. Indivior, Inc. waiver sent on 9/26/2019, answer due 11/25/2019 filed on behalf of Choctaw County, Alabama (DeGaris, Annesley)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Choctaw County, Alabama. Watson Laboratories, Inc. waiver sent on 9/19/2019, answer due 11/18/2019 filed on behalf of Choctaw County, Alabama (DeGaris, Annesley)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Choctaw County, Alabama. Actavis LLC waiver sent on 9/19/2019, answer due 11/18/2019 filed on behalf of Choctaw County, Alabama (DeGaris, Annesley)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Choctaw County, Alabama. TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 9/19/2019, answer due 11/18/2019 filed on behalf of Choctaw County, Alabama (DeGaris, Annesley)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Choctaw County, Alabama. Actavis Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 9/19/2019, answer due 11/18/2019 filed on behalf of Choctaw County, Alabama (DeGaris, Annesley)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Choctaw County, Alabama. Cardinal Health, Inc. waiver sent on 9/26/2019, answer due 11/25/2019 filed on behalf of Choctaw County, Alabama (DeGaris, Annesley)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9505808. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 17-md-02804-DAP. Filed by Choctaw County, Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (DeGaris, Annesley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Choctaw County, Alabama v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indivior PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indivior, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Choctaw County, Alabama
Represented By: Annesley H. DeGaris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?