Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe v. Cephalon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe
Defendant: Beverly Sackler, Richard S. Sackler, Sandoz, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Mallinckrodt LLC, Meijer Distribution Inc. #90, Mallinckrodt PLC, Wal-Mart Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Actavis PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Theresa Sackler, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family, Actavis LLC, Allergan PLC, KV Pharmaceutical Company, Cardinal Health, Inc., David A. Sackler, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Amerisourcebergen Corp., Cephalon, Inc., Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Auburn Pharmaceuticals, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Frank W. Kerr, Inc., McKesson Corp., Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Par Pharmaceutical, Kathe A. Sackler, Frank W. Kerr Co., Watson Pharma, Inc., SpecGX LLC, Jonathan D. Sackler, The Harvard Drug Group, LLC, ETHEX CORPORATION, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., CVS Pharmacy, Inc. and Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019op45841
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 20 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe. Mallinckrodt LLC waiver sent on 10/4/2019, answer due 12/3/2019 filed on behalf of Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe (Dolejsi, Holly)
November 15, 2019 Filing 19 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe. SpecGX LLC waiver sent on 10/4/2019, answer due 12/3/2019 filed on behalf of Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe (Dolejsi, Holly)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Stipulation and Order Dismissing Defendant Rite Aid Corporation and Substituting in Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. as a Defendant (Related Doc #17 ). Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 11/8/19.(P,R)
November 6, 2019 Filing 17 Stipulated Motion to substitute party and [PROPOSED] Order Dismissing Defendant Rite Aid Corporation and Substituting in Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. as a Defendant filed by Plaintiff Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe. Related document(s) #1 . (Dolejsi, Holly)
October 31, 2019 Filing 16 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe. Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 10/4/2019, answer due 12/3/2019 filed on behalf of Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe (Dolejsi, Holly)
October 31, 2019 Filing 15 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe. Par Pharmaceutical waiver sent on 10/4/2019, answer due 12/3/2019 filed on behalf of Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe (Dolejsi, Holly)
October 31, 2019 Filing 14 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe. The Harvard Drug Group, LLC waiver sent on 10/22/2019, answer due 12/23/2019 filed on behalf of Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe (Dolejsi, Holly)
October 31, 2019 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe. Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 10/4/2019, answer due 12/3/2019 filed on behalf of Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe (Dolejsi, Holly)
October 31, 2019 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe. Endo Health Solutions Inc. waiver sent on 10/4/2019, answer due 12/3/2019 filed on behalf of Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe (Dolejsi, Holly)
October 31, 2019 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe. CVS Health Corporation waiver sent on 10/4/2019, answer due 12/3/2019 filed on behalf of Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe (Dolejsi, Holly)
October 31, 2019 Filing 10 Original Summons issued to c for service upon ETHEX CORPORATION, KV Pharmaceutical Company. (P,R)
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons for Ethex Corporation and KV Pharmaceutical Company filed by Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe. (Dolejsi, Holly)
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe. Wal-Mart Inc. waiver sent on 10/4/2019, answer due 12/3/2019 filed on behalf of Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe (Dolejsi, Holly)
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe. Watson Laboratories, Inc. waiver sent on 10/4/2019, answer due 12/3/2019 filed on behalf of Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe (Dolejsi, Holly)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 10/4/2019, answer due 12/3/2019 filed on behalf of Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe (Dolejsi, Holly)
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe. Cephalon, Inc. waiver sent on 10/4/2019, answer due 12/3/2019 filed on behalf of Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe (Dolejsi, Holly)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe. Cardinal Health, Inc. waiver sent on 10/4/2019, answer due 12/3/2019 filed on behalf of Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe (Dolejsi, Holly)
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe. Actavis Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 10/4/2019, answer due 12/3/2019; Watson Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 10/4/2019, answer due 12/3/2019 filed on behalf of Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe (Dolejsi, Holly)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe. Actavis LLC waiver sent on 10/4/2019, answer due 12/3/2019 filed on behalf of Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe (Dolejsi, Holly)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Corp., Auburn Pharmaceuticals, CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., ETHEX CORPORATION, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Frank W. Kerr Co., Frank W. Kerr, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, KV Pharmaceutical Company, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corp., Meijer Distribution Inc. #90, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Rite Aid Corporation, Beverly Sackler, David A. Sackler, Jonathan D. Sackler, Kathe A. Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard S. Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Sandoz, Inc., SpecGX LLC, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Harvard Drug Group, LLC, Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family, Wal-Mart Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9557628. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 1:17-md-02804-DAP. Filed by Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Purdon, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe v. Cephalon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meijer Distribution Inc. #90
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KV Pharmaceutical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auburn Pharmaceuticals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank W. Kerr, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank W. Kerr Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan D. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Harvard Drug Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ETHEX CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe
Represented By: Timothy Q. Purdon
Represented By: Holly H. Dolejsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?